This case was last updated from Dallas County District Courts on 03/12/2023 at 17:08:16 (UTC).

DALLAS COUNTY et al vs. ALFREDO GOMEZ et al

Case Summary

On 02/23/2023 DALLAS COUNTY filed a Tax - Other Tax lawsuit against ALFREDO GOMEZ. This case was filed in Dallas County District Courts, Dallas County Civil District Courts located in Dallas, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is GINSBERG, CARL. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0322

  • Filing Date:

    02/23/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Tax - Other Tax

  • County, State:

    Dallas, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

GINSBERG, CARL

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

DALLAS COUNTY

DALLAS INDEPENDENT SCHOOL DISTRICT

CITY OF DALLAS

PARKLAND HOSPITAL DISTRICT

DALLAS COLLEGE

DALLAS COUNTY SCHOOL EQUALIZATION FUND

Defendants

GOMEZ, ALFREDO

DOLORES GOMEZ A/K/A DOLORES SANTOYA

CITIBANK, NATIONAL ASSOCIATION AS SUCCESSOR TO DEPARTMENT STORES NATIONAL BANK

CROWN ASSET MANAGEMENT, LLC

ENTERPRISE COMMUNITY PARTNERS, INC. F/K/A THE ENTERPRISE FOUNDATION, INC.

FEDERAL HOME LOAN MORTGAGE CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ATKINS, ASHLY STEELE

 

Court Documents

- REAL PROPERTY

ORIGINAL PETITION; Comment: - REAL PROPERTY

Non Jury Trial

NOTICE OF TRIAL; Comment: LINEBARGER

REQUEST FOR SERVICE

REQUEST FOR SERVICE; Comment: ISSUE CITATION -6

ALFREDO GOMEZ - CITATION

ISSUE CITATION

DOLRES GOMEZ - CITATION

ISSUE CITATION

CITIBANK N.A -CITATION

ISSUE CITATION

CROWN ASSETT MANAGMENT LLC - CITATION

ISSUE CITATION

ENTERPRISE COMMUNITY PARTNERS INC - CITATION

ISSUE CITATION

FEDERAL HOME LOAN MORTGAGE CORP CITATION

ISSUE CITATION

AFFIDAVIT FOR COST OF ABSTRACT

AFFIDAVIT; Comment: FOR COST OF ABSTRACT

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/27/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNon Jury Trial; Judicial Officer: GINSBERG, CARL; Hearing Time: 10:05 AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/03/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT; Comment: FOR COST OF ABSTRACT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/28/2023
  • FinancialFinancial info for GOMEZ, ALFREDO : Transaction Assessment; ; $48.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/28/2023
  • DocketCITATION; Unserved: Anticipated Server; PRIVATE PROCESS SERVER: Anticipated Method; Unserved: Anticipated Server; PRIVATE PROCESS SERVER: Anticipated Method; Unserved: Anticipated Server; ATTORNEY: Anticipated Method; Unserved: Anticipated Server; PRIVATE PROCESS SERVER: Anticipated Method; Unserved: Anticipated Server; PRIVATE PROCESS SERVER: Anticipated Method; Unserved: Anticipated Server; PRIVATE PROCESS SERVER: Anticipated Method; Comment: 5 TJRCS & 1 M/A

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/28/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketISSUE CITATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/27/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR SERVICE; Comment: ISSUE CITATION -6

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF TRIAL; Comment: LINEBARGER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2023
  • FinancialFinancial info for GOMEZ, ALFREDO : Transaction Assessment; ; $350.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2023
  • FinancialFinancial: GOMEZ, ALFREDO ; Total Financial Assessment $398.00 ; Total Payments and Credits $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORIGINAL PETITION; Comment: - REAL PROPERTY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2023
  • DocketNEW CASE FILED (OCA) - CIVIL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less