This case was last updated from Dallas County District Courts on 12/04/2022 at 22:13:09 (UTC).

CITY OF GARLAND AND GARLAND INDEPENDENT SCHOOL DISTRICT vs. HEIRS AND UNKNOWN HEIRS OF VELMA LOU DRURY et al

Case Summary

On 09/06/2022 CITY OF GARLAND AND GARLAND INDEPENDENT SCHOOL DISTRICT filed a Tax - Other Tax lawsuit against HEIRS AND UNKNOWN HEIRS OF VELMA LOU DRURY. This case was filed in Dallas County District Courts, Dallas County Civil District Courts located in Dallas, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is GINSBERG, CARL. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1327

  • Filing Date:

    09/06/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Tax - Other Tax

  • County, State:

    Dallas, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

GINSBERG, CARL

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

CITY OF GARLAND

GARLAND INDEPENDENT SCHOOL DISTRICT

Defendants

HEIRS AND UNKNOWN HEIRS OF VELMA LOU DRURY

HEIRS AND UNKNOWN HEIRS OF KATHY EILEEN SAUNDERS

HEIRS AND UNKNOWN HEIRS OF PEGGY DRURY

DRURY, JOHNNY BRYANT

DRURY, MIKE

SAUNDERS, JUSTIN

SAUNDERS, JARROD

SAUNDERS, JOEL

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

REECE, LINDA D.

 

Court Documents

ORIGINAL PETITION

ORIGINAL PETITION; Comment: - REAL PROPERTY

Non Jury Trial

NOTICE OF TRIAL; Comment: PERDUE

COVER LETTER

REQUEST FOR SERVICE; Comment: CITATIONS 5

CIT - JUSTIN SAUNDERS

ISSUE CITATION

CIT - JOEL SAUNDERS

ISSUE CITATION

CIT - MIKE DRURY

ISSUE CITATION

CIT - JOHNNY BRYANT DRURY

ISSUE CITATION

CIT - JARROD SAUNDERS

ISSUE CITATION

EXEC - JOEL SAUNDERS

RETURN OF SERVICE; Comment: EXECUTED CITATION - JOEL SAUNDERS

EXEC - DRURY, MIKE - CITATION

RETURN OF SERVICE; Comment: EXECUTED CITATION - MIKE DRURY

UNEX - SAUNDERS, JARROD - CITATION

RETURN OF SERVICE; Comment: UNEXECUTED CITATION - JARROD SAUNDERS

JOHNNY BRYANT DRURY EXEC

RETURN OF SERVICE; Comment: EXECUTED CITATION - JOHNNY BRYANT DRURY

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/13/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNon Jury Trial; Judicial Officer: GINSBERG, CARL; Hearing Time: 10:05 AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE; Comment: EXECUTED CITATION - JOHNNY BRYANT DRURY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/05/2022
  • FinancialFinancial info for HEIRS AND UNKNOWN HEIRS OF VELMA LOU DRURY : Transaction Assessment; ; $80.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/05/2022
  • FinancialFinancial info for HEIRS AND UNKNOWN HEIRS OF VELMA LOU DRURY : Transaction Assessment; ; $80.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE; Comment: UNEXECUTED CITATION - JARROD SAUNDERS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE; Comment: EXECUTED CITATION - MIKE DRURY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE; Comment: EXECUTED CITATION - JOEL SAUNDERS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/08/2022
  • FinancialFinancial info for HEIRS AND UNKNOWN HEIRS OF VELMA LOU DRURY : Transaction Assessment; ; $40.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/08/2022
  • DocketCITATION; Served: 10/25/2022; Anticipated Server: ATTORNEY; Anticipated Method: Served; 09/29/2022: Anticipated Server; CONSTABLE 2: Anticipated Method; Unserved: Anticipated Server; CONSTABLE 2: Anticipated Method; Return Unserved: 10/05/2022; Anticipated Server: CONSTABLE 3; Anticipated Method: Served; 09/13/2022: Anticipated Server; ATTORNEY: Anticipated Method; Comment: 5-CIT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketISSUE CITATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/07/2022
  • FinancialFinancial info for HEIRS AND UNKNOWN HEIRS OF VELMA LOU DRURY : Transaction Assessment; ; $350.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/07/2022
  • FinancialFinancial: HEIRS AND UNKNOWN HEIRS OF VELMA LOU DRURY ; Total Financial Assessment $550.00 ; Total Payments and Credits $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR SERVICE; Comment: CITATIONS 5

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF TRIAL; Comment: PERDUE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORIGINAL PETITION; Comment: - REAL PROPERTY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/06/2022
  • DocketNEW CASE FILED (OCA) - CIVIL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where GARLAND INDEPENDENT SCHOOL DISTRICT is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer REECE, LINDA D.