This case was last updated from Dallas County District Courts on 11/14/2022 at 01:31:28 (UTC).

CITY OF GARLAND and GARLAND INDEPENDENT SCHOOL DISTRICT vs. HEIRS AND UNKNOWN HEIRS OF STEPHEN STEPOWAY et al

Case Summary

On 09/22/2022 CITY OF GARLAND and GARLAND INDEPENDENT SCHOOL DISTRICT filed a Tax - Other Tax lawsuit against HEIRS AND UNKNOWN HEIRS OF STEPHEN STEPOWAY. This case was filed in Dallas County District Courts, Dallas County Civil District Courts located in Dallas, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is GINSBERG, CARL. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1442

  • Filing Date:

    09/22/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Tax - Other Tax

  • County, State:

    Dallas, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

GINSBERG, CARL

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CITY OF GARLAND and GARLAND INDEPENDENT SCHOOL DISTRICT

Defendants

HEIRS AND UNKNOWN HEIRS OF STEPHEN STEPOWAY

REGIONS BANK (IN REM ONLY)

5858 West Northwest Highway

Dallas, TX 75225

MIDLAND FUNDING LLC (IN REM ONLY)

DISCOVER FINANCIAL SERVICES INSURANCE AGENCY, INC. (IN REM ONLY)

1999 Bryan Street, Suite 900

Dallas, TX 75201

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

REECE, LINDA D.

Defendant Attorney

JENNINGS, WILLIAM

 

Court Documents

REAL PROPERTY

ORIGINAL PETITION; Comment: REAL PROPERTY

Non Jury Trial

NOTICE OF TRIAL; Comment: PERDUE

COVER LETTER

REQUEST FOR SERVICE; Comment: CITATION 3

CIT - DISCOVER FINANCIAL

ISSUE CITATION

CIT - REGIONS BANK

ISSUE CITATION

CIT - MIDLAND FUNDING

ISSUE CITATION

EXEC - MIDLAND FUNDING LLC

RETURN OF SERVICE; Comment: EXECUTED CITATION - MIDLAND FUNDING LLC

ORIGNAL ANSWER -GENERAL DENIAL

ORIGINAL ANSWER - GENERAL DENIAL

Non Jury Trial

NOTICE OF TRIAL; Comment: JENNINGS

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/21/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNon Jury Trial; Judicial Officer: GINSBERG, CARL; Hearing Time: 10:05 AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF TRIAL; Comment: JENNINGS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORIGINAL ANSWER - GENERAL DENIAL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE; Comment: EXECUTED CITATION - MIDLAND FUNDING LLC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/27/2022
  • FinancialFinancial info for HEIRS AND UNKNOWN HEIRS OF STEPHEN STEPOWAY : Transaction Assessment; ; $24.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/27/2022
  • DocketCITATION; Unserved: Anticipated Server; CONSTABLE 5: Anticipated Method; Served: 10/05/2022; Anticipated Server: ATTORNEY; Anticipated Method: Unserved; Anticipated Server: CONSTABLE 1; Anticipated Method: Comment; 3-CIT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketISSUE CITATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR SERVICE; Comment: CITATION 3

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF TRIAL; Comment: PERDUE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/22/2022
  • FinancialFinancial info for HEIRS AND UNKNOWN HEIRS OF STEPHEN STEPOWAY : Transaction Assessment; ; $350.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/22/2022
  • FinancialFinancial: HEIRS AND UNKNOWN HEIRS OF STEPHEN STEPOWAY ; Total Financial Assessment $374.00 ; Total Payments and Credits $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORIGINAL PETITION; Comment: REAL PROPERTY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/22/2022
  • DocketNEW CASE FILED (OCA) - CIVIL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Regions Bank is a litigant

Latest cases where Midland Funding, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer JENNINGS, WILLIAM