This case was last updated from Dallas County District Courts on 09/20/2022 at 20:08:51 (UTC).

CITY OF GARLAND and GARLAND INDEPENDENT SCHOOL DISTRICT vs. HEIRS AND UNKNOWN HEIRS OF CYNTHIA L. FAUGHT et al

Case Summary

On 07/19/2022 CITY OF GARLAND and GARLAND INDEPENDENT SCHOOL DISTRICT filed a Tax - Other Tax lawsuit against HEIRS AND UNKNOWN HEIRS OF CYNTHIA L FAUGHT. This case was filed in Dallas County District Courts, Dallas County Civil District Courts located in Dallas, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is GINSBERG, CARL. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1124

  • Filing Date:

    07/19/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Tax - Other Tax

  • County, State:

    Dallas, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

GINSBERG, CARL

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CITY OF GARLAND and GARLAND INDEPENDENT SCHOOL DISTRICT

Defendants

HEIRS AND UNKNOWN HEIRS OF CYNTHIA L. FAUGHT

FAUGHT, STEVEN BLAKE

Dallas, TX 75238

WORKS, JERRY

Garland, TX 75043

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

REECE, LINDA D.

 

Court Documents

ORIGINAL PETITION - REAL PROPERTY

ORIGINAL PETITION; Comment: REAL PROPERTY

Non Jury Trial

NOTICE OF TRIAL; Comment: PERDUE

COVER LETTER

REQUEST FOR SERVICE; Comment: CITATION 2

CIT - JERRY WORKS

ISSUE CITATION

CIT - STEVEN BLAKE FAUGHT

ISSUE CITATION

EXEC - STEVEN BLAKE FAUGHT

RETURN OF SERVICE; Comment: EXECUTED CITATION - STEVEN BLAKE FAUGHT

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/23/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNon Jury Trial; Judicial Officer: GINSBERG, CARL; Hearing Time: 10:05 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2022
  • FinancialFinancial info for HEIRS AND UNKNOWN HEIRS OF CYNTHIA L. FAUGHT : Transaction Assessment; ; $80.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE; Comment: EXECUTED CITATION - STEVEN BLAKE FAUGHT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2022
  • FinancialFinancial info for HEIRS AND UNKNOWN HEIRS OF CYNTHIA L. FAUGHT : Transaction Assessment; ; $16.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2022
  • DocketCITATION; Served: 07/27/2022; Anticipated Server: CONSTABLE 3; Anticipated Method: Unserved; Anticipated Server: CONSTABLE 2; Anticipated Method: Comment; 2-CIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketISSUE CITATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR SERVICE; Comment: CITATION 2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2022
  • FinancialFinancial info for HEIRS AND UNKNOWN HEIRS OF CYNTHIA L. FAUGHT : Transaction Assessment; ; $350.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2022
  • FinancialFinancial: HEIRS AND UNKNOWN HEIRS OF CYNTHIA L. FAUGHT ; Total Financial Assessment $446.00 ; Total Payments and Credits $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF TRIAL; Comment: PERDUE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORIGINAL PETITION; Comment: REAL PROPERTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2022
  • DocketNEW CASE FILED (OCA) - CIVIL

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer REECE, LINDA D.