This case was last updated from Dallas County District Courts on 07/28/2022 at 18:03:29 (UTC).

CITY OF GARLAND and GARLAND INDEPENDENT SCHOOL DISTRICT vs. GUILLERMO BALLEZA et al

Case Summary

On 06/30/2022 CITY OF GARLAND and GARLAND INDEPENDENT SCHOOL DISTRICT filed a Tax - Other Tax lawsuit against GUILLERMO BALLEZA. This case was filed in Dallas County District Courts, Dallas County Civil District Courts located in Dallas, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is GINSBERG, CARL. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1056

  • Filing Date:

    06/30/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Tax - Other Tax

  • County, State:

    Dallas, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

GINSBERG, CARL

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CITY OF GARLAND and GARLAND INDEPENDENT SCHOOL DISTRICT

Defendants

BALLEZA, GUILLERMO

Garland, TX 75041-1954

AXS HOMES LLC (IN REM ONLY)

222 E Buckingham Road

Garland, TX 75040

PNC BANK, NATIONAL ASSOCIATION AS SUCCESSOR BY MERGER TO BBVA COMPASS BANK F/K/A COMPASS BANK (IN REM ONLY)

222 Delaware Avenue

Wilmington, DE 19801

CASTILLO, MARIBEL

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

REECE, LINDA D.

 

Court Documents

REAL PROPERTY

ORIGINAL PETITION; Comment: REAL PROPERTY

WAIVER OF CITATION- AXS HOMES

WAIVER; Comment: WAIVER OF CITATION - AXS HOMES

Non Jury Trial

NOTICE OF TRIAL; Comment: PERDUE

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/10/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNon Jury Trial; Judicial Officer: GINSBERG, CARL; Hearing Time: 10:05 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF TRIAL; Comment: PERDUE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWAIVER; Comment: WAIVER OF CITATION - AXS HOMES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2022
  • FinancialFinancial info for BALLEZA, GUILLERMO : Transaction Assessment; ; $350.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2022
  • FinancialFinancial: BALLEZA, GUILLERMO ; Total Financial Assessment $350.00 ; Total Payments and Credits $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORIGINAL PETITION; Comment: REAL PROPERTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2022
  • DocketNEW CASE FILED (OCA) - CIVIL

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PNC Bank, N.A. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer REECE, LINDA D.