This case was last updated from Dallas County District Courts on 08/28/2022 at 19:00:37 (UTC).

CITY OF GARLAND AND GARLAND INDEPENDENT SCHOOL DISTRICT vs. GEORGE SHENGSHI DAI et al

Case Summary

On 07/01/2022 CITY OF GARLAND AND GARLAND INDEPENDENT SCHOOL DISTRICT filed a Tax - Other Tax lawsuit against GEORGE SHENGSHI DAI. This case was filed in Dallas County District Courts, Dallas County Civil District Courts located in Dallas, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is GINSBERG, CARL. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1073

  • Filing Date:

    07/01/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Tax - Other Tax

  • County, State:

    Dallas, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

GINSBERG, CARL

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CITY OF GARLAND and GARLAND INDEPENDENT SCHOOL DISTRICT

Defendants

DAI, GEORGE SHENGSHI

LIU, SHU YING

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

REECE, LINDA D.

 

Court Documents

ORIGINAL PETITION

ORIGINAL PETITION; Comment: - REAL PROPERTY

Non Jury Trial

NOTICE OF TRIAL; Comment: PERDUE

COVER SHEET

REQUEST FOR SERVICE; Comment: CITATION 2

CIT - SHU YING LIU

ISSUE CITATION

CIT - GEORGE SHENGSHI DAI

ISSUE CITATION

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/10/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNon Jury Trial; Judicial Officer: GINSBERG, CARL; Hearing Time: 10:05 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2022
  • FinancialFinancial info for DAI, GEORGE SHENGSHI : Transaction Assessment; ; $16.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2022
  • DocketCITATION; Unserved: Anticipated Server; ATTORNEY: Anticipated Method; Unserved: Anticipated Server; ATTORNEY: Anticipated Method; Comment: 2-M/A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketISSUE CITATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR SERVICE; Comment: CITATION 2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF TRIAL; Comment: PERDUE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2022
  • FinancialFinancial info for DAI, GEORGE SHENGSHI : Transaction Assessment; ; $350.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2022
  • FinancialFinancial: DAI, GEORGE SHENGSHI ; Total Financial Assessment $366.00 ; Total Payments and Credits $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORIGINAL PETITION; Comment: - REAL PROPERTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2022
  • DocketNEW CASE FILED (OCA) - CIVIL

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer REECE, LINDA D.