This case was last updated from Dallas County Texas Courts on 09/18/2022 at 20:21:07 (UTC).

CITY OF DALLAS, TEXAS vs.THE ROYAL KINGSQUEST, LLC, A TEXAS LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANYThe Royal Kingsquest, LLC, TEXAS MEZZANINE FUND, INC., DALLAS COUNTY, ET AL

Case Summary

On 07/20/2022 CITY OF DALLAS, TEXAS filed a Property - Eminent Domain lawsuit against THE ROYAL KINGSQUEST, LLC, A TEXAS LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANYThe Royal Kingsquest, LLC, TEXAS MEZZANINE FUND, INC , DALLAS COUNTY. This case was filed in Dallas County Texas Courts, Dallas County Texas Courts At Law located in Dallas, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is ROSALES, PAULA. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********44-D

  • Filing Date:

    07/20/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Eminent Domain

  • County, State:

    Dallas, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

ROSALES, PAULA

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CITY OF DALLAS, TEXAS

Defendants

THE ROYAL KINGSQUEST, LLC, A TEXAS LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANYThe Royal Kingsquest, LLC

9201 N. Central Expressway, Fourth Floorurth Floor

Dallas, TX 75231

TEXAS MEZZANINE FUND, INC.

2919 Commerce Street, Suite 616

Dallas, TX 75201

DALLAS COUNTY, ET AL

2777 N. Stemmons Freeway, Suite 1000

Dallas, TX 75207

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GUNTER, CHRISTOPHER C

 

Court Documents

STATEMENT IN CONDEMNATION

ORIGINAL PETITION; Comment: STATEMENT IN CONDEMNATION

FIRST AMENDED STATEMENT IN CONDEMNATION

AMENDED PETITION; Comment: FIRST AMENDED STATEMENT IN CONDEMNATION

9-7-22 LETTER TO THE COURT

CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE; Comment: 9-7-22 LETTER TO THE COURT

PROPOSED ORDER APPOINTING SPECIAL COMMISSIONERS

PROPOSED ORDER; Comment: PROPOSED ORDER APPOINTING SPECIAL COMMISSIONERS

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROPOSED ORDER; Comment: PROPOSED ORDER APPOINTING SPECIAL COMMISSIONERS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE; Comment: 9-7-22 LETTER TO THE COURT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAMENDED PETITION; Comment: FIRST AMENDED STATEMENT IN CONDEMNATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2022
  • FinancialFinancial info for CITY OF DALLAS, TEXAS : STATE CREDIT; ; $137.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2022
  • FinancialFinancial info for CITY OF DALLAS, TEXAS : CREDIT CARD - TEXFILE (CC); Receipt # CV-2022-06864; CITY OF DALLAS, TEXAS $213.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2022
  • FinancialFinancial info for CITY OF DALLAS, TEXAS : Transaction Assessment; ; $350.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2022
  • FinancialFinancial: CITY OF DALLAS, TEXAS ; Total Financial Assessment $350.00 ; Total Payments and Credits $350.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORIGINAL PETITION; Comment: STATEMENT IN CONDEMNATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2022
  • DocketNEW CASE FILED (OCA)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where TEXAS MEZZANINE FUND INC is a litigant

Latest cases where DALLAS COUNTY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer GUNTER, CHRISTOPHER C