This case was last updated from Dallas County District Courts on 12/05/2022 at 01:36:58 (UTC).

CINCINNATI INSURANCE COMPANY vs. MERA MARIAH KUJAN

Case Summary

On 09/26/2022 CINCINNATI INSURANCE COMPANY filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against MERA MARIAH KUJAN. This case was filed in Dallas County District Courts, Dallas County Civil District Courts located in Dallas, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is WILLIAMS, STACI. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3528

  • Filing Date:

    09/26/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Dallas, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

WILLIAMS, STACI

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CINCINNATI INSURANCE COMPANY

24165 Ih-10 W. Suite 217-418, San

Antonio, TX 78257

Defendant

KUJAN, MERA MARIAH

Worth, TX 76137

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

NOACK, CAROLYN J

 

Court Documents

ORIGINAL PETITION

ORIGINAL PETITION

REQUEST FOR SERVICE - CITATION

CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE; Comment: REQUEST FOR SERVICE - CITATION

ISSUE CITATION - MERA MARIAH KUJAN

ISSUE CITATION

101st Dismissal Letter - 2017

DISMISSAL FOR WANT OF PROSECUTION; Judicial Officer: WILLIAMS, STACI; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM

101st Dismissal Letter - 2017

DISMISSAL FOR WANT OF PROSECUTION; Judicial Officer: WILLIAMS, STACI; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM

101st DWOP2021Remote

DISMISSAL FOR WANT OF PROSECUTION; Judicial Officer: WILLIAMS, STACI; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM

101st DWOP2021Remote

DISMISSAL FOR WANT OF PROSECUTION; Judicial Officer: WILLIAMS, STACI; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDISMISSAL FOR WANT OF PROSECUTION; Judicial Officer: WILLIAMS, STACI; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/05/2022
  • DocketCITATION; Unserved: Anticipated Server; ESERVE: Anticipated Method; Comment: MERA MARIAH KUJAN

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/01/2022
  • FinancialFinancial info for CINCINNATI INSURANCE COMPANY : CREDIT CARD - TEXFILE (DC); Receipt # 62449-2022-DCLK; CINCINNATI INSURANCE COMPANY $8.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/01/2022
  • FinancialFinancial info for CINCINNATI INSURANCE COMPANY : Transaction Assessment; ; $8.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketISSUE CITATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE; Comment: REQUEST FOR SERVICE - CITATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/28/2022
  • FinancialFinancial info for CINCINNATI INSURANCE COMPANY : STATE CREDIT; ; $137.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/28/2022
  • FinancialFinancial info for CINCINNATI INSURANCE COMPANY : CREDIT CARD - TEXFILE (DC); Receipt # 61554-2022-DCLK; CINCINNATI INSURANCE COMPANY $213.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/28/2022
  • FinancialFinancial info for CINCINNATI INSURANCE COMPANY : Transaction Assessment; ; $350.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/28/2022
  • FinancialFinancial: CINCINNATI INSURANCE COMPANY ; Total Financial Assessment $358.00 ; Total Payments and Credits $358.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORIGINAL PETITION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/26/2022
  • DocketNEW CASE FILED (OCA) - CIVIL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CINCINNATI INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Carolyn J. Noack