This case was last updated from Dallas County Texas Courts on 08/12/2022 at 02:30:16 (UTC).

CHELSEA WENDELL vs.CPT COMMUNITY OWNER, LLC, TANGENTIAL SERVICES, INC.

Case Summary

On 06/01/2022 CHELSEA WENDELL filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against CPT COMMUNITY OWNER, LLC, TANGENTIAL SERVICES, INC. This case was filed in Dallas County Texas Courts, Dallas County Texas Courts At Law located in Dallas, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is ROSALES, PAULA. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********30-D

  • Filing Date:

    06/01/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Dallas, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

ROSALES, PAULA

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

WENDELL, CHELSEA

Defendants

CPT COMMUNITY OWNER, LLC

206 E. 9Th Street, Suite 1300

Austin, TX 78701

TANGENTIAL SERVICES, INC.

650 E. State Highway 121, Suite 202

Lewisville, TX 75057

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SERCELY, MATTHEW D

Defendant Attorneys

PEAVLER, DONNA C

WILKINS, GREG C

 

Court Documents

PLAINTIFF S ORIGINAL PETITION

ORIGINAL PETITION

CITATION 2012

ISSUE CITATION; Comment: ESERVE# 65037538

CITATION 2012

ISSUE CITATION; Comment: ESERVE# 65037538

TANGENTIAL SERVICE INC

RETURN OF SERVICE; Comment: TANGENTIAL SERVICE INC

3 CCL#4 Y LETTER

DISMISSAL HEARING; Judicial Officer: ROSALES, PAULA; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM

ORIGINAL ANSWER - GENERAL DENIAL

ORIGINAL ANSWER - GENERAL DENIAL

JURY DEMAND

JURY DEMAND

OBJECTION

OBJECTION

CPT COMMUNITY OWNER, LLC

RETURN OF SERVICE; Comment: CPT COMMUNITY OWNER, LLC

DEFENDANT CPT COMMUNITY OWNER, LLC S ORIGINAL ANSWER

ORIGINAL ANSWER - GENERAL DENIAL; Comment: DEFENDANT CPT COMMUNITY OWNER, LLC S ORIGINAL ANSWER

PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF FILING AND INTENT TO USE

NOTICE OF FILING; Comment: PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF FILING AND INTENT TO USE

CERTIFICATE

- WRITTEN DISCOVERY; CERTIFICATE

DEFENDANT TANGENTIAL SERVICES, INC. S CERTIFICATE OF WRITTEN DISCOVERY

CERTIFICATE - WRITTEN DISCOVERY; Comment: DEFENDANT TANGENTIAL SERVICES, INC. S CERTIFICATE OF WRITTEN DISCOVERY

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE - WRITTEN DISCOVERY; Comment: DEFENDANT TANGENTIAL SERVICES, INC. S CERTIFICATE OF WRITTEN DISCOVERY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket- WRITTEN DISCOVERY; CERTIFICATE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING; Comment: PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF FILING AND INTENT TO USE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORIGINAL ANSWER - GENERAL DENIAL; Comment: DEFENDANT CPT COMMUNITY OWNER, LLC S ORIGINAL ANSWER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE; Comment: CPT COMMUNITY OWNER, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOBJECTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJURY DEMAND

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORIGINAL ANSWER - GENERAL DENIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE; Comment: TANGENTIAL SERVICE INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2022
  • FinancialFinancial info for WENDELL, CHELSEA : STATE CREDIT; ; $137.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2022
  • FinancialFinancial info for WENDELL, CHELSEA : CREDIT CARD - TEXFILE (CC); Receipt # CV-2022-05060; WENDELL, CHELSEA $229.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2022
  • FinancialFinancial info for WENDELL, CHELSEA : Transaction Assessment; ; $366.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2022
  • FinancialFinancial: WENDELL, CHELSEA ; Total Financial Assessment $366.00 ; Total Payments and Credits $366.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2022
  • DocketCITATION (SERVICE); Served: 06/03/2022; Anticipated Server: ATTORNEY; Anticipated Method: Actual Server; PRIVATE PROCESS SERVER: Returned; 06/06/2022: Comment; TANGENTIAL SERVICES, INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2022
  • DocketCITATION (SERVICE); Served: 06/02/2022; Anticipated Server: ATTORNEY; Anticipated Method: Actual Server; PRIVATE PROCESS SERVER: Returned; 06/28/2022: Comment; CPT COMMUNITY OWNER, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketISSUE CITATION; Comment: ESERVE# 65037538

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORIGINAL PETITION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2022
  • DocketNEW CASE FILED (OCA)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CPT Community Owner LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer WILKINS, GREG CHRISTOPHER

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Donna C Peavler