This case was last updated from Dallas County District Courts on 11/23/2023 at 06:01:53 (UTC).

DALLAS COUNTY et al vs. DEBORAH L. RICHARDS et al

Case Summary

On 05/19/2023 DALLAS COUNTY filed a Tax - Other Tax lawsuit against DEBORAH L RICHARDS. This case was filed in Dallas County District Courts, Dallas County Civil District Courts located in Dallas, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is GINSBERG, CARL. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0944

  • Filing Date:

    05/19/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Tax - Other Tax

  • County, State:

    Dallas, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

GINSBERG, CARL

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

DALLAS COUNTY

GRAND PRAIRIE INDEPENDENT SCHOOL DISTRICT

CITY OF GRAND PRAIRIE

PARKLAND HOSPITAL DISTRICT

DALLAS COUNTY COMMUNITY COLLEGE DISTRICT N/K/A DALLAS COLLEGE

DALLAS COUNTY SCHOOL EQUALIZATION FUND

Defendants

RICHARDS, DEBORAH L.

RICHARDS, JAMES GREGORY, Jr

STATE OF TEXAS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ATKINS, ASHLY STEELE

Defendant Attorney

GRIGGS, WILLIAM

 

Court Documents

ORIGINAL PETITION

ORIGINAL PETITION; Comment: - REAL PROPERTY

Non Jury Trial

NOTICE OF TRIAL; Comment: LINEBARGER

REQUEST FOR SERVICE

REQUEST FOR SERVICE; Comment: CITATION - 2

JAMES GREGORY RICHARDS, JR.

ISSUE CITATION

STATE OF TEXAS

ISSUE CITATION

FOR COST OF ABSTRACT

AFFIDAVIT; Comment: FOR COST OF ABSTRACT

MOTION TO APPOINT ATTORNEY AD LITEM

MOTION - ATTORNEY AD LITEM

PROPOSED ORDER APPOINTING ATTY AD LITEM

NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT; Comment: PROPOSED ORDER APPOINTING ATTY AD LITEM

FOR CIT BY POSTING - DEBORAH L. RICHARDS

AFFIDAVIT; Comment: FOR CIT BY POSTING - DEBORAH L. RICHARDS

ISSUE CITATION BY POSTING - 1

ISSUE CITATION

ORDER - APPOINTING AN ATTORNEY AD LITEM

ORDER - APPOINTING AN ATTORNEY AD LITEM

Non Jury Trial

NOTICE OF TRIAL; Comment: GRIGGS (AAL)

JAMES GREGORY RICHARDS JR -UNEXECUTED CITATION

RETURN OF SERVICE; Comment: UNEXECUTED CITATION - JAMES GREGORY RICHARDS JR

EXECUTED CITATION - STATE OF TEXAS (CSD)

RETURN OF SERVICE; Comment: EXECUTED CITATION - STATE OF TEXAS (CSD)

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

02/19/2024
View Court Documents

DocketNon Jury Trial; Judicial Officer: GINSBERG, CARL; Hearing Time: 10:05 AM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/17/2023
View Court Documents

DocketRETURN OF SERVICE; Comment: EXECUTED CITATION - STATE OF TEXAS (CSD)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/03/2023
View Court Documents

DocketRETURN OF SERVICE; Comment: UNEXECUTED CITATION - JAMES GREGORY RICHARDS JR

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/26/2023

DocketRETURN OF SERVICE; Comment: EXECUTED CITATION BY POSTING - DEBORAH L. RICHARDS

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/07/2023
View Court Documents

DocketNOTICE OF TRIAL; Comment: GRIGGS (AAL)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/06/2023

DocketCITATION BY POSTING; Served: 07/24/2023; Anticipated Server: CONSTABLE 1; Anticipated Method: Comment; 1 - CIT BY POSTING

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/06/2023
View Court Documents

DocketORDER - APPOINTING AN ATTORNEY AD LITEM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/06/2023
View Court Documents

DocketISSUE CITATION

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/02/2023
View Court Documents

DocketAFFIDAVIT; Comment: FOR CIT BY POSTING - DEBORAH L. RICHARDS

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/02/2023
View Court Documents

DocketNON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT; Comment: PROPOSED ORDER APPOINTING ATTY AD LITEM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/02/2023
View Court Documents

DocketMOTION - ATTORNEY AD LITEM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/02/2023
View Court Documents

DocketAFFIDAVIT; Comment: FOR COST OF ABSTRACT

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/24/2023

DocketCITATION; Return Unserved: 08/03/2023; Anticipated Server: PRIVATE PROCESS SERVER; Anticipated Method: Comment; 1 - TJRC

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/24/2023

DocketCITATION; Served: 08/03/2023; Anticipated Server: ATTORNEY; Anticipated Method: Comment; 1 - M/A

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/24/2023
View Court Documents

DocketISSUE CITATION

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/22/2023
View Court Documents

DocketREQUEST FOR SERVICE; Comment: CITATION - 2

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/22/2023
View Court Documents

DocketNOTICE OF TRIAL; Comment: LINEBARGER

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/19/2023
View Court Documents

DocketORIGINAL PETITION; Comment: - REAL PROPERTY

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/19/2023

DocketNEW CASE FILED (OCA) - CIVIL

[+] Read More [-] Read Less