This case was last updated from Dallas County District Courts on 12/03/2023 at 19:08:34 (UTC).

THOMAS BRADFORD vs. NOEL THOMAS MAYFIELD, et al

Case Summary

On 09/05/2023 THOMAS BRADFORD filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against NOEL THOMAS MAYFIELD,. This case was filed in Dallas County District Courts, Dallas County Civil District Courts located in Dallas, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is WYSOCKI, ASHLEY. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4231

  • Filing Date:

    09/05/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Dallas, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

WYSOCKI, ASHLEY

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BRADFORD, THOMAS

Defendants

MAYFIELD, NOEL THOMAS

KRISPY KREME TEXAS, LLC

RYDER TRUCK RENTAL, INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SIDDIQUI, OMER

Defendant Attorney

DAILEY, L SCOT

 

Court Documents

PLAINTIFF'S ORIGINAL PETITION

ORIGINAL PETITION

REQUEST FOR CITATION

REQUEST FOR SERVICE

ISSUE CITATION - 3. RYDER TRUCK RENTAL, INC.

ISSUE CITATION

ISSUE CITATION - 2. KRISPY KREME TEXAS, LLC

ISSUE CITATION

ISSUE CITATION - 1. NOEL THOMAS MAYFIELD, JR.

ISSUE CITATION

ORIGINAL ANSWER

JURY DEMAND; Comment: DEFENDANT RYDER TRUCK RENTAL, INC.S ORIGINAL ANSWER

JURY DEMAND

JURY DEMAND

DEF (KRISPY KREME TX) ORIGINAL ANSWER

ORIGINAL ANSWER - GENERAL DENIAL

EXECUTED CITATION - KRISPY KREME TEXAS, LLC

RETURN OF SERVICE; Comment: EXECUTED CITATION - KRISPY KREME TEXAS, LLC

162nd SCHEDULING CONF HEARING NOTICE

Scheduling Conference; Judicial Officer: WYSOCKI, ASHLEY; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM

162nd SCHEDULING CONF HEARING NOTICE

Scheduling Conference; Judicial Officer: WYSOCKI, ASHLEY; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM

162nd SCHEDULING CONF HEARING NOTICE

Scheduling Conference; Judicial Officer: WYSOCKI, ASHLEY; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM

162nd SCHEDULING CONF HEARING NOTICE

Scheduling Conference; Judicial Officer: WYSOCKI, ASHLEY; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

12/08/2023
View Court Documents

DocketScheduling Conference; Judicial Officer: WYSOCKI, ASHLEY; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/21/2023

DocketRETURN OF SERVICE; Comment: AFIDAVIT OF SERVICE- EXECUTED CITATION - RYDER TRUCK RENTAL, INC.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/03/2023
View Court Documents

DocketRETURN OF SERVICE; Comment: EXECUTED CITATION - KRISPY KREME TEXAS, LLC

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/03/2023
View Court Documents

DocketORIGINAL ANSWER - GENERAL DENIAL

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/23/2023
View Court Documents

Docket- GENERAL DENIAL; ORIGINAL ANSWER

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/23/2023
View Court Documents

DocketJURY DEMAND

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/10/2023

DocketCITATION; Served: 11/03/2023; Anticipated Server: ESERVE; Anticipated Method: Actual Server; OUT OF COUNTY: Returned; 11/21/2023: Comment; RYDER TRUCK RENTAL, INC.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/10/2023

DocketCITATION; Served: 10/03/2023; Anticipated Server: ESERVE; Anticipated Method: Actual Server; OUT OF COUNTY: Returned; 11/03/2023: Comment; KRISPY KREME TEXAS, LLC

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/10/2023

DocketCITATION; Unserved: Anticipated Server; ESERVE: Anticipated Method; Comment: NOEL THOMAS MAYFIELD, JR.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/06/2023
View Court Documents

DocketISSUE CITATION

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/05/2023
View Court Documents

DocketREQUEST FOR SERVICE

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/05/2023
View Court Documents

DocketORIGINAL PETITION

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/05/2023

DocketNEW CASE FILED (OCA) - CIVIL

[+] Read More [-] Read Less