This case was last updated from Dallas County District Courts on 07/08/2023 at 19:04:11 (UTC).

BRAD YOUNG, et al vs. MARRIOTT INTERNATIONAL, INC., et al

Case Summary

On 05/11/2023 BRAD YOUNG, filed an Other lawsuit against MARRIOTT INTERNATIONAL, INC ,. This case was filed in Dallas County District Courts, Dallas County Civil District Courts located in Dallas, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is SLAUGHTER, GENA. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******6261

  • Filing Date:

    05/11/2023

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Dallas, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

SLAUGHTER, GENA

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

YOUNG, BRAD

YOUNG, TRACY

Defendants

MARRIOTT INTERNATIONAL, INC.

AIMBRIDGE HOSPITALITY, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

AHMED, M SAMEER

Defendant Attorney

MILLER, MICHAEL A.

 

Court Documents

ORIGINAL PETITION

ORIGINAL PETITION

AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE - EXECUTED CITATION - MARRIOTT INTERNATIONAL INC.

RETURN OF SERVICE; Comment: AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE - EXECUTED CITATION - MARRIOTT INTERNATIONAL INC.

NON-SUIT/DISMISSAL BY PLAINTIFF / PETITIONER

Disposition: Judgment; Judicial Officer; SLAUGHTER, GENA; Judgment Type; NON-SUIT/DISMISSAL BY PLAINTIFF / PETITIONER; Judgment; Total Judgment:; of $0.00; Awarded To:; YOUNG, BRAD, et al; Awarded Against:; MARRIOTT INTERNATIONAL, INC.

PLAINITFF 1ST AMENDED PETITION

AMENDED PETITION; Comment: 1ST

ORIGINAL ANSWER

- GENERAL DENIAL; ORIGINAL ANSWER

NOTICE OF NONSUIT

NOTICE OF NONSUIT

PLAINTIFF'S PROPOSED ORDER OF NONSUIT

NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT; Comment: PLAINTIFF'S PROPOSED ORDER OF NONSUIT

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/28/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DispositionDisposition: Judgment; Judicial Officer: SLAUGHTER, GENA; Judgment Type: NON-SUIT/DISMISSAL BY PLAINTIFF / PETITIONER; Judgment: Total Judgment:; of $0.00: Awarded To:; YOUNG, BRAD, et al: Awarded Against:; MARRIOTT INTERNATIONAL, INC.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/27/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT; Comment: PLAINTIFF'S PROPOSED ORDER OF NONSUIT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/27/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF NONSUIT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/27/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket- GENERAL DENIAL; ORIGINAL ANSWER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/15/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAMENDED PETITION; Comment: 1ST

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/17/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE; Comment: AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE - EXECUTED CITATION - MARRIOTT INTERNATIONAL INC.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/12/2023
  • DocketCITATION; Served: 05/16/2023; Anticipated Server: ESERVE; Anticipated Method: Actual Server; PRIVATE PROCESS SERVER: Returned; 05/17/2023: Comment; MARRIOTT INTERNATIONAL, INC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/11/2023
  • FinancialFinancial info for YOUNG, BRAD : STATE CREDIT; ; $137.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/11/2023
  • FinancialFinancial info for YOUNG, BRAD : CREDIT CARD - TEXFILE (DC); Receipt # 31065-2023-DCLK; Young, Brad $221.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/11/2023
  • FinancialFinancial info for YOUNG, BRAD : Transaction Assessment; ; $358.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/11/2023
  • FinancialFinancial: YOUNG, BRAD ; Total Financial Assessment $358.00 ; Total Payments and Credits $358.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/11/2023
  • DocketISSUE CITATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/11/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORIGINAL PETITION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/11/2023
  • DocketNEW CASE FILED (OCA) - CIVIL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less