This case was last updated from Dallas County District Courts on 06/14/2023 at 17:08:04 (UTC).

DALLAS COUNTY et al vs. C. L. JONES A/K/A C.L. JONES SR. et al

Case Summary

On 05/17/2023 DALLAS COUNTY filed a Tax - Other Tax lawsuit against C L JONES A/K/A C L JONES SR. This case was filed in Dallas County District Courts, Dallas County Civil District Courts located in Dallas, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is GINSBERG, CARL. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0924

  • Filing Date:

    05/17/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Tax - Other Tax

  • County, State:

    Dallas, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

GINSBERG, CARL

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

DALLAS COUNTY

DALLAS INDEPENDENT SCHOOL DISTRICT

CITY OF DALLAS

PARKLAND HOSPITAL DISTRICT

DALLAS COUNTY COMMUNITY COLLEGE DISTRICT N/K/A DALLAS COLLEGE

DALLAS COUNTY SCHOOL EQUALIZATION FUND

Defendants

C. L. JONES A/K/A C.L. JONES SR.

JONES, JUANITA

JONES, CLIFTON LEE

JONES, MIRIAM FRANCIS

JONES, ALVIS RAY

JONES, LOYCE BERNARD

JONES, C. L., Jr

JONES, JANICE MARIE

JONES, ALANA DENISE

JONES, BRIAN CLIFTON

THE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA

SUMRALL & BONDY, P.C.

THE STATE OF TEXAS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ATKINS, ASHLY STEELE

Defendant Attorney

YATES, JEFFREY ALBERT

 

Court Documents

Non Jury Trial

NOTICE OF TRIAL; Comment: LINEBARGER

- REAL PROPERTY

ORIGINAL PETITION; Comment: - REAL PROPERTY

ISSUE CITATION BY POSTING - 4

ISSUE CITATION

Non Jury Trial

NOTICE OF TRIAL; Comment: YATES (AAL)

ORDER - APPOINTING AN ATTORNEY AD LITEM

ORDER - APPOINTING AN ATTORNEY AD LITEM

FOR COST OF ABSTRACT

AFFIDAVIT; Comment: FOR COST OF ABSTRACT

FOR CIT BY POSTING - CLIFTON LEE JONES

AFFIDAVIT; Comment: FOR CIT BY POSTING - CLIFTON LEE JONES

FOR CIT BY POSTING - MIRIAM FRANCIS JONES

AFFIDAVIT; Comment: FOR CIT BY POSTING - MIRIAM FRANCIS JONES

FOR CIT BY POSTING - JUANITA JONES

AFFIDAVIT; Comment: FOR CIT BY POSTING - JUANITA JONES

FOR CIT BY POSTING - C.L. JONES

AFFIDAVIT; Comment: FOR CIT BY POSTING - C.L. JONES

PROPOSED ORDER APPOINTING ATTY AD LITEM

NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT; Comment: PROPOSED ORDER APPOINTING ATTY AD LITEM

MOTION TO APPOINT ATTORNEY AD LITEM

MOTION - ATTORNEY AD LITEM

STATE OF TEXAS

ISSUE CITATION

BRIAN CLIFTON JONES

ISSUE CITATION

SUMRALL & BONDY PC

ISSUE CITATION

C.L. JONES JR.

ISSUE CITATION

ALVIS RAY JONES

ISSUE CITATION

ALANA DENISE JONES

ISSUE CITATION

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/14/2024
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNon Jury Trial; Judicial Officer: GINSBERG, CARL; Hearing Time: 10:05 AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/06/2023
  • FinancialFinancial info for C. L. JONES A/K/A C.L. JONES SR. : Transaction Assessment; ; $32.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/06/2023
  • DocketCITATION BY POSTING; Unserved: Anticipated Server; CONSTABLE 1: Anticipated Method; Unserved: Anticipated Server; CONSTABLE 1: Anticipated Method; Unserved: Anticipated Server; CONSTABLE 1: Anticipated Method; Unserved: Anticipated Server; CONSTABLE 1: Anticipated Method; Comment: 4 - CIT BY POSTING

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/06/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketISSUE CITATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/06/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF TRIAL; Comment: YATES (AAL)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/05/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - APPOINTING AN ATTORNEY AD LITEM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/01/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT; Comment: FOR COST OF ABSTRACT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/31/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT; Comment: FOR CIT BY POSTING - CLIFTON LEE JONES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/31/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT; Comment: FOR CIT BY POSTING - MIRIAM FRANCIS JONES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/31/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT; Comment: FOR CIT BY POSTING - JUANITA JONES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
18 More Docket Entries
  • 05/30/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketISSUE CITATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/30/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketISSUE CITATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/30/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketISSUE CITATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/30/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketISSUE CITATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/25/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR SERVICE; Comment: CITATION 9

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/17/2023
  • FinancialFinancial info for C. L. JONES A/K/A C.L. JONES SR. : Transaction Assessment; ; $350.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/17/2023
  • FinancialFinancial: C. L. JONES A/K/A C.L. JONES SR. ; Total Financial Assessment $454.00 ; Total Payments and Credits $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/17/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF TRIAL; Comment: LINEBARGER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/17/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORIGINAL PETITION; Comment: - REAL PROPERTY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/17/2023
  • DocketNEW CASE FILED (OCA) - CIVIL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less