This case was last updated from Dallas County District Courts on 07/13/2023 at 23:06:11 (UTC).

DALLAS COUNTY et al vs. ORVILLE ALDRIDGE et al

Case Summary

On 05/31/2023 DALLAS COUNTY filed a Tax - Other Tax lawsuit against ORVILLE ALDRIDGE. This case was filed in Dallas County District Courts, Dallas County Civil District Courts located in Dallas, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is GINSBERG, CARL. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1062

  • Filing Date:

    05/31/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Tax - Other Tax

  • County, State:

    Dallas, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

GINSBERG, CARL

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

DALLAS COUNTY

LANCASTER INDEPENDENT SCHOOL DISTRICT

CITY OF LANCASTER

PARKLAND HOSPITAL DISTRICT

DALLAS COUNTY COMMUNITY COLLEGE DISTRICT N/K/A DALLAS COLLEGE

DALLAS COUNTY SCHOOL EQUALIZATION FUND

Defendants

ALDRIDGE, GLENN

ALDRIDGE, ORVILLE

RAMOS, EVETTE

BARNETT, ROBERT D.

ALDRIDGE SUTTON, MARIE ANNETTE

ALDRIDGE, CHRISTOPHER GLENN

HENRY, JULIE DANE

HENRY, LAURA ELAINE

JUNG, LYN SUE

JUNG, RICHARD WINSTON

6 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LEE, PAMELA POPE

Defendant Attorney

PUYEAR, CHRISTINE LOUISE

 

Court Documents

FOR COST OF ABSTRACT

AFFIDAVIT; Comment: FOR COST OF ABSTRACT

ORDER - APPOINTING AN ATTORNEY AD LITEM

ORDER - APPOINTING AN ATTORNEY AD LITEM

Non Jury Trial

NOTICE OF TRIAL; Comment: PUYEAR (AAL)

ISSUE CITATION BY POSTING - 4 DEF

ISSUE CITATION

NONSIGNED ORDER APPOINTING ATTY AD LITEM

NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT; Comment: ORDER - APPT AAL

AFFIDAVIT CBP-LYN SUE JUNG

AFFIDAVIT; Comment: CBP - LYN SUE JUNG

AFFIDAVIT CBP-GLENN ALRIDGE

AFFIDAVIT; Comment: CBP -GLENN ALDRIDGE

Non Jury Trial

NOTICE OF TRIAL; Comment: LINEBARGER

EDDIE JOE JUNG JR

ISSUE CITATION

CYNDI MICHELLE ALDRIDGE

ISSUE CITATION

MARIE ANNETTE ALDRIDGE SUTTON

ISSUE CITATION

RICHARD WINSTON JUNG

ISSUE CITATION

DEBRA JOYCE HENRY

ISSUE CITATION

JULIE DANE HENRY

ISSUE CITATION

ROBERT D BARNETT

ISSUE CITATION

LAURA ELAINE HENRY

ISSUE CITATION

REQUEST FOR SERVICE

REQUEST FOR SERVICE; Comment: 12 CITATIONS

ORIGINAL PETITION

ORIGINAL PETITION; Comment: - REAL PROPERTY

14 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/27/2024
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNon Jury Trial; Judicial Officer: GINSBERG, CARL; Hearing Time: 10:05 AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/22/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT; Comment: FOR COST OF ABSTRACT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/12/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - APPOINTING AN ATTORNEY AD LITEM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/12/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF TRIAL; Comment: PUYEAR (AAL)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/08/2023
  • FinancialFinancial info for ALDRIDGE, ORVILLE : Transaction Assessment; ; $32.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/08/2023
  • DocketCITATION BY POSTING; Unserved: Anticipated Server; CONSTABLE 1: Anticipated Method; Unserved: Anticipated Server; CONSTABLE 1: Anticipated Method; Unserved: Anticipated Server; CONSTABLE 1: Anticipated Method; Unserved: Anticipated Server; CONSTABLE 1: Anticipated Method; Comment: 4 - CIT BY POSTING

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/08/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketISSUE CITATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/07/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT; Comment: ORDER - APPT AAL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/07/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT; Comment: CBP - LYN SUE JUNG

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/07/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT; Comment: CBP -GLENN ALDRIDGE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 06/06/2023
  • DocketCITATION; Unserved: Anticipated Server; ATTORNEY: Anticipated Method; Unserved: Anticipated Server; PRIVATE PROCESS SERVER: Anticipated Method; Unserved: Anticipated Server; ATTORNEY: Anticipated Method; Unserved: Anticipated Server; ATTORNEY: Anticipated Method; Unserved: Anticipated Server; ATTORNEY: Anticipated Method; Unserved: Anticipated Server; ATTORNEY: Anticipated Method; Unserved: Anticipated Server; ATTORNEY: Anticipated Method; Unserved: Anticipated Server; ATTORNEY: Anticipated Method; Unserved: Anticipated Server; ATTORNEY: Anticipated Method; Unserved: Anticipated Server; ATTORNEY: Anticipated Method; Comment: 9 M/A; 1 TJRC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/06/2023
  • DocketCITATION SOS/COI/COH/HAG; Unserved: Anticipated Server; ATTORNEY: Anticipated Method; Unserved: Anticipated Server; ATTORNEY: Anticipated Method; Comment: 2 M/A; SOS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/06/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF TRIAL; Comment: LINEBARGER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/06/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketISSUE CITATION COMM OF INS OR SOS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/06/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketISSUE CITATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/05/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR SERVICE; Comment: 12 CITATIONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/31/2023
  • FinancialFinancial info for ALDRIDGE, ORVILLE : Transaction Assessment; ; $350.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/31/2023
  • FinancialFinancial: ALDRIDGE, ORVILLE ; Total Financial Assessment $486.00 ; Total Payments and Credits $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/31/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORIGINAL PETITION; Comment: - REAL PROPERTY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/31/2023
  • DocketNEW CASE FILED (OCA) - CIVIL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less