This case was last updated from Dallas County District Courts on 11/28/2023 at 17:24:32 (UTC).

DALLAS COUNTY et al vs. MARIA NIVIA VEGA CALDERON, A/K/A MA. NIVIA VEGA CALDERON et al

Case Summary

On 07/11/2023 DALLAS COUNTY filed a Tax - Other Tax lawsuit against MARIA NIVIA VEGA CALDERON, A/K/A MA NIVIA VEGA CALDERON. This case was filed in Dallas County District Courts, Dallas County Civil District Courts located in Dallas, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is GINSBERG, CARL. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1317

  • Filing Date:

    07/11/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Tax - Other Tax

  • County, State:

    Dallas, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

GINSBERG, CARL

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

DALLAS COUNTY

DALLAS INDEPENDENT SCHOOL DISTRICT

CITY OF DALLAS

PARKLAND HOSPITAL DISTRICT

DALLAS COUNTY COMMUNITY COLLEGE DISTRICT N/K/A DALLAS COLLEGE

DALLAS COUNTY SCHOOL EQUALIZATION FUND

Defendants

VEGA CALDERON, MARIA NIVIA

SANCHEZ VEGA, DANIEL

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ATKINS, ASHLY STEELE

 

Court Documents

ORIGINAL PETITION

ORIGINAL PETITION; Comment: - REAL PROPERTY

Non Jury Trial

NOTICE OF TRIAL; Comment: PLAINTIFF

ORIGINAL PETITION

ORIGINAL PETITION; Comment: - REAL PROPERTY

Non Jury Trial

NOTICE OF TRIAL; Comment: PLAINTIFF

REQUEST FOR SERVICE

REQUEST FOR SERVICE; Comment: ISSUE CITATIONS -2

MARIA NIVIA VEGA CALDERON - CITATION

REQUEST FOR SERVICE; Comment: ISSUE CITATIONS -2

DANIEL SANCHEZ VEGA - CITATION

REQUEST FOR SERVICE; Comment: ISSUE CITATIONS -2

FOR COST OF ABSTRACT

AFFIDAVIT; Comment: FOR COST OF ABSTRACT

UNEXECUTED CITATION - DANIEL SANCHEZ VEGA

RETURN OF SERVICE; Comment: UNEXECUTED CITATION - DANIEL SANCHEZ VEGA

UNEXECUTED CITATION - MARIA NIVIA VEGA CALDERON A/K/A MA. NIVIA VEGA CALDERON

RETURN OF SERVICE; Comment: UNEXECUTED CITATION - MARIA NIVIA VEGA CALDERON A/K/A MA. NIVIA VEGA CALDERON

 

Docket Entries

04/15/2024
View Court Documents

DocketNon Jury Trial; Judicial Officer: GINSBERG, CARL; Hearing Time: 10:05 AM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/05/2023
View Court Documents

DocketRETURN OF SERVICE; Comment: UNEXECUTED CITATION - MARIA NIVIA VEGA CALDERON A/K/A MA. NIVIA VEGA CALDERON

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/05/2023
View Court Documents

DocketRETURN OF SERVICE; Comment: UNEXECUTED CITATION - DANIEL SANCHEZ VEGA

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/22/2023
View Court Documents

DocketAFFIDAVIT; Comment: FOR COST OF ABSTRACT

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/18/2023

DocketCITATION; Return Unserved: 10/05/2023; Anticipated Server: PRIVATE PROCESS SERVER; Anticipated Method: Return Unserved; 10/05/2023: Anticipated Server; PRIVATE PROCESS SERVER: Anticipated Method; Comment: 2 TJJRC

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/18/2023
View Court Documents

DocketISSUE CITATION

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/17/2023
View Court Documents

DocketREQUEST FOR SERVICE; Comment: ISSUE CITATIONS -2

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/11/2023
View Court Documents

DocketNOTICE OF TRIAL; Comment: PLAINTIFF

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/11/2023
View Court Documents

DocketORIGINAL PETITION; Comment: - REAL PROPERTY

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/11/2023

DocketNEW CASE FILED (OCA) - CIVIL

[+] Read More [-] Read Less