This case was last updated from Dallas County District Courts on 11/30/2023 at 04:07:09 (UTC).

DALLAS COUNTY, et al vs. RODNEY SCHROEDER DBA GK STEEL FABRICATION, LLC

Case Summary

On 09/07/2023 DALLAS COUNTY, filed a Tax - Other Tax lawsuit against RODNEY SCHROEDER DBA GK STEEL FABRICATION, LLC. This case was filed in Dallas County District Courts, Dallas County Civil District Courts located in Dallas, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is GINSBERG, CARL. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1514

  • Filing Date:

    09/07/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Tax - Other Tax

  • County, State:

    Dallas, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

GINSBERG, CARL

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

DALLAS COUNTY

CITY OF DUNCANVILLE

DUNCANVILLE INDEPENDENT SCHOOL DISTRICT

DALLAS COUNTY SCHOOL EQUALIZATION FUND

DALLAS COUNTY COMMUNITY COLLEGE DISTRICT

PARKLAND HOSPITAL DISTRICT

Defendant

RODNEY SCHROEDER DBA GK STEEL FABRICATION, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ATKINS, ASHLY STEELE

 

Court Documents

APPLICATION FOR TAX WARRANT

ORIGINAL PETITION; Comment: APPLICATION FOR TAX WARRANT

COVER LETTER

CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE; Comment: COVER LETTER

PROPOSED TAX WARRANT AND RETURN

NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT; Comment: PROPOSED TAX WARRANT AND RETURN

ORDER - TAX WARRANT

ORDER - TAX WARRANT

ORDER - TAX WARRANT

ORDER - TAX WARRANT

NOTICE OF OTHER INTERESTED PARTIES

MISCELLANOUS EVENT; Comment: NOTICE OF OTHER INTERESTED PARTIES

EXECUTED TAX WARRANT

RETURN OF SERVICE; Comment: EXECUTED TAX WARRANT

NOTE - CLERKS

NOTE - CLERKS; Comment: EXCESS FUNDS

 

Docket Entries

10/25/2023
View Court Documents

DocketNOTE - CLERKS; Comment: EXCESS FUNDS

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/02/2023
View Court Documents

DocketRETURN OF SERVICE; Comment: EXECUTED TAX WARRANT

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/13/2023
View Court Documents

DocketMISCELLANOUS EVENT; Comment: NOTICE OF OTHER INTERESTED PARTIES

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/07/2023
View Court Documents

DocketORDER - TAX WARRANT

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/07/2023
View Court Documents

DocketNON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT; Comment: PROPOSED TAX WARRANT AND RETURN

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/07/2023
View Court Documents

DocketCORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE; Comment: COVER LETTER

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/07/2023
View Court Documents

DocketORIGINAL PETITION; Comment: APPLICATION FOR TAX WARRANT

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/07/2023

DocketNEW CASE FILED (OCA) - CIVIL

[+] Read More [-] Read Less