This case was last updated from Dallas County District Courts on 09/18/2023 at 19:20:28 (UTC).

FRANCISCO SIGALA PEREZ, et al vs. ALEXANDRA PENDERGRASS

Case Summary

On 03/28/2023 FRANCISCO SIGALA PEREZ, filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against ALEXANDRA PENDERGRASS. This case was filed in Dallas County District Courts, Dallas County Civil District Courts located in Dallas, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is WHITMORE, BRIDGETT. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4284

  • Filing Date:

    03/28/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Dallas, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

WHITMORE, BRIDGETT

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

SIGALA PEREZ, FRANCISCO

ORTIZ, ALMA

Defendant

PENDERGRASS, ALEXANDRA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SWANSON, BENJAMIN D, ESQ

Defendant Attorneys

IBRAHIM, RABIA

CLARK, MELANIE M

 

Court Documents

ORIGINAL PETITION

ORIGINAL PETITION

ISSUE CITATION - ALEXANDER PENDERGRASS

ISSUE CITATION

JURY DEMAND

JURY DEMAND

REQUEST FOR SERVICE

REQUEST FOR SERVICE

193RD Initial Dismissal Notice

DISMISSAL FOR WANT OF PROSECUTION; Judicial Officer: WHITMORE, BRIDGETT; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM

193RD Initial Dismissal Notice

DISMISSAL FOR WANT OF PROSECUTION; Judicial Officer: WHITMORE, BRIDGETT; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM

EXECUTED CITATION - ALEXANDRA PENDERGRASS

RETURN OF SERVICE; Comment: EXECUTED CITATION - ALEXANDRA PENDERGRASS

DEFENDANT ORIGINAL ANSWER- ALEXANDRA PENDERGRASS

ORIGINAL ANSWER - GENERAL DENIAL

193rd Jury Trial Notice Whitmore

Jury Trial - Civil; Judicial Officer: WHITMORE, BRIDGETT; Hearing Time: 9:30 AM

193rd Jury Trial Notice Whitmore

Jury Trial - Civil; Judicial Officer: WHITMORE, BRIDGETT; Hearing Time: 9:30 AM

PLAINTIFF NOTICE OF SERVICE OF MEDICAL & BILLING AFFIDAVITS

AFFIDAVIT; Comment: PLAINTIFF NOTICE OF SERVICE OF MEDICAL & BILLING AFFIDAVITS

DEFENDANT DSGN & SUBST LEAD CNSL

DESIGNATE LEAD COUNSEL; Comment: DEFENDANT DESGN & SUBST LED CNSL

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/02/2024
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJury Trial - Civil; Judicial Officer: WHITMORE, BRIDGETT; Hearing Time: 9:30 AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/23/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDESIGNATE LEAD COUNSEL; Comment: DEFENDANT DESGN & SUBST LED CNSL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/05/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT; Comment: PLAINTIFF NOTICE OF SERVICE OF MEDICAL & BILLING AFFIDAVITS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDISMISSAL FOR WANT OF PROSECUTION; Judicial Officer: WHITMORE, BRIDGETT; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Cancel Reason: BY COURT ADMINISTRATOR

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/05/2023
  • DocketVACATION LETTER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/05/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORIGINAL ANSWER - GENERAL DENIAL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/13/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE; Comment: EXECUTED CITATION - ALEXANDRA PENDERGRASS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/06/2023
  • DocketCITATION; Served: 04/11/2023; Anticipated Server: ESERVE; Anticipated Method: Actual Server; OUT OF COUNTY: Returned; 04/13/2023: Comment; ALEXANDRA PENDERGRASS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/05/2023
  • FinancialFinancial info for SIGALA PEREZ, FRANCISCO : STATE CREDIT; ; $137.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/05/2023
  • FinancialFinancial info for SIGALA PEREZ, FRANCISCO : CREDIT CARD - TEXFILE (DC); Receipt # 21807-2023-DCLK; SIGALA PEREZ, FRANCISCO $231.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/05/2023
  • FinancialFinancial info for SIGALA PEREZ, FRANCISCO : Transaction Assessment; ; $368.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/05/2023
  • FinancialFinancial: SIGALA PEREZ, FRANCISCO ; Total Financial Assessment $368.00 ; Total Payments and Credits $368.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/28/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR SERVICE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/28/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJURY DEMAND

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/28/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketISSUE CITATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/28/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORIGINAL PETITION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/28/2023
  • DocketNEW CASE FILED (OCA) - CIVIL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less