This case was last updated from Dallas County District Courts on 11/14/2023 at 03:15:41 (UTC).

DALLAS COUNTY et al vs. MILES CASA, LLC et al

Case Summary

On 09/14/2023 DALLAS COUNTY filed a Tax - Other Tax lawsuit against MILES CASA, LLC. This case was filed in Dallas County District Courts, Dallas County Civil District Courts located in Dallas, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is GINSBERG, CARL. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1577

  • Filing Date:

    09/14/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Tax - Other Tax

  • County, State:

    Dallas, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

GINSBERG, CARL

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

DALLAS COUNTY

DALLAS INDEPENDENT SCHOOL DISTRICT

CITY OF DALLAS

PARKLAND HOSPITAL DISTRICT

DALLAS COLLEGE

DALLAS COUNTY SCHOOL EQUALIZATION FUND

Defendants

MILES CASA, LLC

INTRUST BANK, INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ATKINS, ASHLY STEELE

 

Court Documents

ORIGINAL PETITION

ORIGINAL PETITION; Comment: - REAL PROPERTY

Non Jury Trial

NOTICE OF TRIAL; Comment: LINEBARGER

Non Jury Trial

NOTICE OF TRIAL; Comment: LINEBARGER

AFFIDAVIT COST OF ABSTRACT

AFFIDAVIT; Comment: COST OF ABSTRACT

REQUEST FOR SERVICE

REQUEST FOR SERVICE; Comment: CITATION - 2

INTRUST BANK, INC.

ISSUE CITATION

MILES CASA, LLC

ISSUE CITATION

UNEXECUTED CITATION - MILES CASA, LLC

RETURN OF SERVICE; Comment: UNEXECUTED CITATION - MILES CASA, LLC

 

Docket Entries

06/18/2024
View Court Documents

DocketNon Jury Trial; Judicial Officer: GINSBERG, CARL; Hearing Time: 10:05 AM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/16/2023
View Court Documents

DocketRETURN OF SERVICE; Comment: UNEXECUTED CITATION - MILES CASA, LLC

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/05/2023

DocketCITATION; Unserved: Anticipated Server; ATTORNEY: Anticipated Method; Comment: 1 - M/A

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/05/2023

DocketCITATION; Return Unserved: 11/16/2023; Anticipated Server: PRIVATE PROCESS SERVER; Anticipated Method: Comment; 1 - TJRC

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/05/2023
View Court Documents

DocketISSUE CITATION

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/05/2023
View Court Documents

DocketREQUEST FOR SERVICE; Comment: CITATION - 2

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/18/2023
View Court Documents

DocketAFFIDAVIT; Comment: COST OF ABSTRACT

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/15/2023
View Court Documents

DocketNOTICE OF TRIAL; Comment: LINEBARGER

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/14/2023
View Court Documents

DocketORIGINAL PETITION; Comment: - REAL PROPERTY

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/14/2023

DocketNEW CASE FILED (OCA) - CIVIL

[+] Read More [-] Read Less