This case was last updated from Dallas County District Courts on 11/29/2023 at 15:18:03 (UTC).

DALLAS COUNTY et al vs. GERARDO ALFARO et al

Case Summary

On 09/28/2023 DALLAS COUNTY filed a Tax - Other Tax lawsuit against GERARDO ALFARO. This case was filed in Dallas County District Courts, Dallas County Civil District Courts located in Dallas, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is GINSBERG, CARL. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1722

  • Filing Date:

    09/28/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Tax - Other Tax

  • County, State:

    Dallas, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

GINSBERG, CARL

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

DALLAS COUNTY

DALLAS INDEPENDENT SCHOOL DISTRICT

CITY OF HUTCHINS

PARKLAND HOSPITAL DISTRICT

DALLAS COLLEGE

DALLAS COUNTY SCHOOL EQUALIZATION FUND

Defendants

ALFARO, GERARDO

BARRON, JAIME, Jr

ALFARO, NORMA

UNITED STTES OF AMERICA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BEARDEN, DANIEL K.

 

Court Documents

ORIGINAL PETITION

ORIGINAL PETITION; Comment: - REAL PROPERTY

Non Jury Trial

NOTICE OF TRIAL; Comment: LINEBARGER

AFFIDAVIT COST OF ABSTRACT

AFFIDAVIT; Comment: FOR COST OF ABSTRACT

REQUEST FOR SERVICE

REQUEST FOR SERVICE; Comment: ISSUE CITATIONS -4

THE USA -IRS -CITATION

ISSUE CITATION

GERARDO ALFARO -CITATION

ISSUE CITATION

NORMA ALFARO -CITATION

ISSUE CITATION

JAIME BARRON JR -CITATION

ISSUE CITATION

 

Docket Entries

07/15/2024
View Court Documents

DocketNon Jury Trial; Judicial Officer: GINSBERG, CARL; Hearing Time: 10:05 AM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/07/2023

DocketCITATION; Unserved: Anticipated Server; ATTORNEY: Anticipated Method; Unserved: Anticipated Server; PRIVATE PROCESS SERVER: Anticipated Method; Unserved: Anticipated Server; PRIVATE PROCESS SERVER: Anticipated Method; Unserved: Anticipated Server; PRIVATE PROCESS SERVER: Anticipated Method; Comment: 3 TJRCS & 1 M/A

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/07/2023
View Court Documents

DocketISSUE CITATION

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/06/2023
View Court Documents

DocketREQUEST FOR SERVICE; Comment: ISSUE CITATIONS -4

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/02/2023
View Court Documents

DocketAFFIDAVIT; Comment: FOR COST OF ABSTRACT

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/29/2023
View Court Documents

DocketNOTICE OF TRIAL; Comment: LINEBARGER

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/28/2023
View Court Documents

DocketORIGINAL PETITION; Comment: - REAL PROPERTY

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/28/2023

DocketNEW CASE FILED (OCA) - CIVIL

[+] Read More [-] Read Less