This case was last updated from Dallas County District Courts on 10/14/2023 at 02:11:45 (UTC).

DALLAS COUNTY et al vs. KLS TEXAS PROPERTIES LLC

Case Summary

On 06/08/2023 DALLAS COUNTY filed a Tax - Other Tax lawsuit against KLS TEXAS PROPERTIES LLC. This case was filed in Dallas County District Courts, Dallas County Civil District Courts located in Dallas, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is GINSBERG, CARL. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1103

  • Filing Date:

    06/08/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Tax - Other Tax

  • County, State:

    Dallas, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

GINSBERG, CARL

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

DALLAS COUNTY

GRAND PRAIRIE INDEPENDENT SCHOOL DISTRICT

CITY OF GRAND PRAIRIE

PARKLAND HOSPITAL DISTRICT

DALLAS COUNTY COMMUNITY COLLEGE DISTRICT N/K/A DALLAS COLLEGE

DALLAS COUNTY SCHOOL EQUALIZATION FUND

Defendant

KLS TEXAS PROPERTIES LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ATKINS, ASHLY STEELE

 

Court Documents

ORIGINAL PETITION

ORIGINAL PETITION; Comment: - REAL PROPERTY

Non Jury Trial

NOTICE OF TRIAL; Comment: LINEBARGER

REQUEST FOR SERVICE

REQUEST FOR SERVICE; Comment: CITATION - 1

KLS TEXAS PROPERTIES, LLC

ISSUE CITATION

AFFIDAVIY COST OF ABSTRACT

AFFIDAVIT; Comment: FOR COST OF ABSTRACT(TEXS)

UNEXECUTED CITATION - KLS TEXAS PROPERTIES LLC

RETURN OF SERVICE; Comment: UNEXECUTED CITATION - KLS TEXAS PROPERTIES LLC

 

Docket Entries

03/04/2024
View Court Documents

DocketNon Jury Trial; Judicial Officer: GINSBERG, CARL; Hearing Time: 10:05 AM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/12/2023
View Court Documents

DocketRETURN OF SERVICE; Comment: UNEXECUTED CITATION - KLS TEXAS PROPERTIES LLC

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/28/2023
View Court Documents

DocketAFFIDAVIT; Comment: FOR COST OF ABSTRACT(TEXS)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/09/2023

FinancialFinancial info for KLS TEXAS PROPERTIES LLC : Transaction Assessment; ; $8.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/09/2023

DocketCITATION; Return Unserved: 09/12/2023; Anticipated Server: PRIVATE PROCESS SERVER; Anticipated Method: Comment; 1 - TJRC

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/09/2023
View Court Documents

DocketISSUE CITATION

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/09/2023
View Court Documents

DocketREQUEST FOR SERVICE; Comment: CITATION - 1

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/08/2023

FinancialFinancial info for KLS TEXAS PROPERTIES LLC : Transaction Assessment; ; $350.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/08/2023

FinancialFinancial: KLS TEXAS PROPERTIES LLC ; Total Financial Assessment $358.00 ; Total Payments and Credits $0.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/08/2023
View Court Documents

DocketNOTICE OF TRIAL; Comment: LINEBARGER

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/08/2023
View Court Documents

DocketORIGINAL PETITION; Comment: - REAL PROPERTY

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/08/2023

DocketNEW CASE FILED (OCA) - CIVIL

[+] Read More [-] Read Less