This case was last updated from Dallas County District Courts on 09/10/2023 at 23:07:41 (UTC).

DALLAS COUNTY et al vs. LARRY L. LOVE et al

Case Summary

On 07/11/2023 DALLAS COUNTY filed a Tax - Other Tax lawsuit against LARRY L LOVE. This case was filed in Dallas County District Courts, Dallas County Civil District Courts located in Dallas, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is GINSBERG, CARL. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1316

  • Filing Date:

    07/11/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Tax - Other Tax

  • County, State:

    Dallas, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

GINSBERG, CARL

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

DALLAS COUNTY

CEDAR HILL INDEPENDENT SCHOOL DISTRICT

CITY OF GRAND PRAIRIE

PARKLAND HOSPITAL DISTRICT

DALLAS COUNTY COMMUNITY COLLEGE DISTRICT N/K/A DALLAS COLLEGE

DALLAS COUNTY SCHOOL EQUALIZATION FUND

Defendants

LOVE, LARRY L.

LOVE, ANDREA

FIRST UNITED BANK AND TRUST COMPANY

CREDIT SUPPLIERS XCHANGE LLC

LAS COLINAS FEDERAL CREDIT UNION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MAYERS, TSHOMBA LAMONT

 

Court Documents

ORIGINAL PETITION

ORIGINAL PETITION; Comment: - REAL PROPERTY

Non Jury Trial

NOTICE OF TRIAL; Comment: PLAINTIFF

ORIGINAL PETITION

ORIGINAL PETITION; Comment: - REAL PROPERTY

Non Jury Trial

NOTICE OF TRIAL; Comment: PLAINTIFF

DAL ISSUANCE REQUEST

REQUEST FOR SERVICE; Comment: CITATION 5

FIRST UNITED BANK AND TRUST CO

ISSUE CITATION

CREDIT SUPPLIERS XCHANGE LLC

ISSUE CITATION

ANDREA LOVE

ISSUE CITATION

LARRY L LOVE

ISSUE CITATION

LAS COLINAS FEDERAL CREDIT UNION

ISSUE CITATION

FOR COST OF ABSTRACT

AFFIDAVIT; Comment: FOR COST OF ABSTRACT

 

Docket Entries

04/15/2024
View Court Documents

DocketNon Jury Trial; Judicial Officer: GINSBERG, CARL; Hearing Time: 10:05 AM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/22/2023
View Court Documents

DocketAFFIDAVIT; Comment: FOR COST OF ABSTRACT

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/18/2023

FinancialFinancial info for LOVE, LARRY L. : Transaction Assessment; ; $40.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/18/2023

DocketCITATION; Unserved: Anticipated Server; PRIVATE PROCESS SERVER: Anticipated Method; Comment: 1-TJRC

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/18/2023

DocketCITATION; Unserved: Anticipated Server; PRIVATE PROCESS SERVER: Anticipated Method; Comment: 1-TJRC

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/18/2023

DocketCITATION; Unserved: Anticipated Server; PRIVATE PROCESS SERVER: Anticipated Method; Comment: 1-TJRC

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/18/2023

DocketCITATION; Unserved: Anticipated Server; PRIVATE PROCESS SERVER: Anticipated Method; Comment: 1-TJRC

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/18/2023

DocketCITATION; Unserved: Anticipated Server; PRIVATE PROCESS SERVER: Anticipated Method; Comment: 1-TJRC

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/18/2023
View Court Documents

DocketISSUE CITATION

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/18/2023
View Court Documents

DocketISSUE CITATION

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/18/2023
View Court Documents

DocketISSUE CITATION

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/18/2023
View Court Documents

DocketISSUE CITATION

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/18/2023
View Court Documents

DocketISSUE CITATION

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/17/2023
View Court Documents

DocketREQUEST FOR SERVICE; Comment: CITATION 5

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/11/2023

FinancialFinancial info for LOVE, LARRY L. : Transaction Assessment; ; $350.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/11/2023

FinancialFinancial: LOVE, LARRY L. ; Total Financial Assessment $390.00 ; Total Payments and Credits $0.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/11/2023
View Court Documents

DocketNOTICE OF TRIAL; Comment: PLAINTIFF

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/11/2023
View Court Documents

DocketORIGINAL PETITION; Comment: - REAL PROPERTY

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/11/2023

DocketNEW CASE FILED (OCA) - CIVIL

[+] Read More [-] Read Less