This case was last updated from Dallas County Texas Courts on 09/24/2023 at 08:14:33 (UTC).

MARIA SANCHEZ-SANCHEZ vs.KEURIG DR PEPPER INC.

Case Summary

On 03/15/2023 MARIA SANCHEZ-SANCHEZ filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against KEURIG DR PEPPER INC. This case was filed in Dallas County Texas Courts, Dallas County Texas Courts At Law located in Dallas, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is MONTGOMERY, SALLY. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********70-C

  • Filing Date:

    03/15/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Dallas, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

MONTGOMERY, SALLY

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SANCHEZ-SANCHEZ, MARIA

Defendant

KEURIG DR PEPPER INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

VERICH, RACHEL M

Defendant Attorney

MARLIN, JASON ROBERT

 

Court Documents

PLAINTIFF S ORIGINAL PETITION

ORIGINAL PETITION; Comment: PLAINTIFF'S ORIGINAL PETITION

CITATION 2012

ISSUE CITATION; Comment: ESERVE- ENV. #73753075

KEURIG DR PEPPER INC.

RETURN OF SERVICE; Comment: KEURIG DR PEPPER INC.

PLAINTIFF S MOTION FOR SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL

MOTION - SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL

PROPOSED ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF S MOTION TO SUBSTITUTE COUNSEL

PROPOSED ORDER; Comment: PROPOSED ORDER ON PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL

ORIGINAL ANSWER

ORIGINAL ANSWER

ORDER - SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL

ORDER - SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL

MOTION - SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL

MOTION - SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL

PROPOSED ORDER ON MOTION TO SUBSTITUTE COUNSEL

PROPOSED ORDER; Comment: PROPOSED ORDER ON PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL

PLAINTIFF S FIRST AMENDED PETITION

AMENDED PETITION; Comment: PLAINTIFF S FIRST AMENDED PETITION

DEFS NOTICE TAKE DEPOSITION

NOTICE; Comment: NOTICE OF INTENTION TO SERVE SUBPOENA FOR THE PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS

PLAINTIFF S NOTICE OF FILING OF BUSINESS RECORD AFFIDAVIT

NOTICE OF FILING BUSINESS RECORDS AFFIDAVITS; Comment: PLAINTIFF S NOTICE OF FILING OF BUSINESS RECORD AFFIDAVIT

DEFS NOTICE OF INTENTION

NOTICE; Comment: NOTICE OF INTENTION TO SERVE SUBPOENA FOR THE PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS

RETURN OF SERVICE -ABM INDUSTRIES

RETURN OF SERVICE; Comment: ABM INDUSTRIES

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE; Comment: ABM INDUSTRIES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/08/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE; Comment: NOTICE OF INTENTION TO SERVE SUBPOENA FOR THE PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/11/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING BUSINESS RECORDS AFFIDAVITS; Comment: PLAINTIFF S NOTICE OF FILING OF BUSINESS RECORD AFFIDAVIT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/01/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE; Comment: NOTICE OF INTENTION TO SERVE SUBPOENA FOR THE PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/22/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAMENDED PETITION; Comment: PLAINTIFF S FIRST AMENDED PETITION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/18/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/13/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORIGINAL ANSWER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/06/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROPOSED ORDER; Comment: PROPOSED ORDER ON PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/06/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION - SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE; Comment: KEURIG DR PEPPER INC.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/15/2023
  • FinancialFinancial info for SANCHEZ-SANCHEZ, MARIA : STATE CREDIT; ; $137.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/15/2023
  • FinancialFinancial info for SANCHEZ-SANCHEZ, MARIA : CREDIT CARD - TEXFILE (CC); Receipt # CV-2023-02675; SANCHEZ-SANCHEZ, MARIA $221.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/15/2023
  • FinancialFinancial info for SANCHEZ-SANCHEZ, MARIA : Transaction Assessment; ; $358.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/15/2023
  • FinancialFinancial: SANCHEZ-SANCHEZ, MARIA ; Total Financial Assessment $358.00 ; Total Payments and Credits $358.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/15/2023
  • DocketCITATION (SERVICE); Served: 03/21/2023; Anticipated Server: ATTORNEY; Anticipated Method: Actual Server; PRIVATE PROCESS SERVER: Returned; 03/24/2023: Comment; KEURIG DR PEPPER INC.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/15/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketISSUE CITATION; Comment: ESERVE- ENV. #73753075

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/15/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORIGINAL PETITION; Comment: PLAINTIFF'S ORIGINAL PETITION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/15/2023
  • DocketNEW CASE FILED (OCA)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less