This case was last updated from Dallas County District Courts on 07/05/2023 at 15:43:19 (UTC).

FIDELITY NATIONAL TITLE INSURANCE COMPANY vs. OLAJUMOKE OLAKANWA AKENROYE

Case Summary

On 05/16/2023 FIDELITY NATIONAL TITLE INSURANCE COMPANY filed an Other lawsuit against OLAJUMOKE OLAKANWA AKENROYE. This case was filed in Dallas County District Courts, Dallas County Civil District Courts located in Dallas, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is REDMOND, AIESHA. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******6431

  • Filing Date:

    05/16/2023

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Dallas, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

REDMOND, AIESHA

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

FIDELITY NATIONAL TITLE INSURANCE COMPANY

Defendant

AKENROYE, OLAJUMOKE OLAKANWA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

TORRES-RODRIGUEZ, J. MANUEL

Defendant Attorney

SPRIGG, JEFFREY HILL

 

Court Documents

PLAINTIFFS ORIGINAL PETITION

ORIGINAL PETITION

PLAINTIFFS ORIGINAL PETITION

ORIGINAL PETITION

1ST AMENDED PETITION

AMENDED PETITION; Comment: 1ST

160th Dismissal

DISMISSAL FOR WANT OF PROSECUTION; Judicial Officer: REDMOND, AIESHA; Hearing Time: 3:00 PM; Comment: CASE FILED 5-16-23; DEFS UNSERVED

ORIGINAL ANSWER

- GENERAL DENIAL; ORIGINAL ANSWER

MOTION TO RETAIN

MOTION - RETAIN

Final Disposition Notice

Final Disposition Hearing; Judicial Officer: REDMOND, AIESHA; Hearing Time: 3:00 PM; Comment: EMAIL SENT 6/28/23

Final Disposition Notice

Final Disposition Hearing; Judicial Officer: REDMOND, AIESHA; Hearing Time: 3:00 PM; Comment: EMAIL SENT 6/28/23

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/08/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFinal Disposition Hearing; Judicial Officer: REDMOND, AIESHA; Hearing Time: 3:00 PM; Comment: EMAIL SENT 6/28/23

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/18/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDISMISSAL FOR WANT OF PROSECUTION; Judicial Officer: REDMOND, AIESHA; Hearing Time: 3:00 PM; Cancel Reason: CASE SETTLED; Comment: CASE FILED 5-16-23; DEFS UNSERVED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/28/2023
  • DocketINACTIVATE CASE (OCA)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/28/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION - RETAIN

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/26/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket- GENERAL DENIAL; ORIGINAL ANSWER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/17/2023
  • FinancialFinancial info for FIDELITY NATIONAL TITLE INSURANCE COMPANY : STATE CREDIT; ; $137.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/17/2023
  • FinancialFinancial info for FIDELITY NATIONAL TITLE INSURANCE COMPANY : CREDIT CARD - TEXFILE (DC); Receipt # 32011-2023-DCLK; FIDELITY NATIONAL TITLE INSURANCE COMPANY $213.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/17/2023
  • FinancialFinancial info for FIDELITY NATIONAL TITLE INSURANCE COMPANY : Transaction Assessment; ; $350.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/17/2023
  • FinancialFinancial: FIDELITY NATIONAL TITLE INSURANCE COMPANY ; Total Financial Assessment $350.00 ; Total Payments and Credits $350.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/17/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAMENDED PETITION; Comment: 1ST

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/16/2023
  • DocketISSUE CITATION; Comment: PLAINTIFF'S FIRST AMENDED PETITION - FEES NOT PAID

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/16/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORIGINAL PETITION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/16/2023
  • DocketNEW CASE FILED (OCA) - CIVIL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less