This case was last updated from Dallas County District Courts on 09/02/2023 at 02:01:14 (UTC).

DALLAS COUNTY et al vs. LESTER CLAUD LOFTICE et al

Case Summary

On 05/31/2023 DALLAS COUNTY filed a Tax - Other Tax lawsuit against LESTER CLAUD LOFTICE. This case was filed in Dallas County District Courts, Dallas County Civil District Courts located in Dallas, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is GINSBERG, CARL. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1065

  • Filing Date:

    05/31/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Tax - Other Tax

  • County, State:

    Dallas, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

GINSBERG, CARL

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

DALLAS COUNTY

DALLAS INDEPENDENT SCHOOL DISTRICT

CITY OF DALLAS

PARKLAND HOSPITAL DISTRICT

DALLAS COUNTY COMMUNITY COLLEGE DISTRICT N/K/A DALLAS COLLEGE

DALLAS COUNTY SCHOOL EQUALIZATION FUND

Defendants

LOFTICE, LESTER CLAUD

LOFTICE, MARY C.

CLAUDIE GAYLE LOFTICE A/K/A CLAUDIA L. RAWLINGS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ATKINS, ASHLY STEELE

Defendant Attorney

GRIGGS, WILLIAM

 

Court Documents

ORIGINAL PETITION

ORIGINAL PETITION; Comment: - REAL PROPERTY

FOR COST OF ABSTRACT

AFFIDAVIT; Comment: FOR COST OF ABSTRACT

REQUEST FOR SERVICE

REQUEST FOR SERVICE; Comment: CITATION - 1

Non Jury Trial

NOTICE OF TRIAL; Comment: LINEBARGER

SOS - CLAUDIE GAYLE LOFTICE A/K/A CALUDIA L. RAWLINGS

ISSUE CITATION COMM OF INS OR SOS

MOT -APPT AAL

MOTION - ATTORNEY AD LITEM; Comment: TO APPOINT ATTORNEY AD LITEM

CBP - LESTER CLAUD LOFTICE

AFFIDAVIT; Comment: CBP - LESTER CLAUD LOFTICE

CBP - MARY C LOFTICE

AFFIDAVIT; Comment: CBP - MARY C. LOFTICE

PROPOSED O/APPT AAL

NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT; Comment: PROPOSED ORDER TO APPT ATY AD LITEM

ISSUE CITATION BY POSTING - 2 DEF

ISSUE CITATION

Non Jury Trial

NOTICE OF TRIAL; Comment: GRIGGS (AAL)

ORDER - APPOINTING AN ATTORNEY AD LITEM

ORDER - APPOINTING AN ATTORNEY AD LITEM

EXECUTED CITATION BY POSTING - 2 DEF

RETURN OF SERVICE; Comment: EXECUTED CITATION BY POSTING - 2 DEF

EXECUTED SOS CITATION - CLAUDIE GAYLE LOFTICE A/K/A CLAUDIA L. RAWLINGS

RETURN OF SERVICE; Comment: EXECUTED SOS CITATION - CLAUDIE GAYLE LOFTICE A/K/A CLAUDIA L. RAWLINGS

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/27/2024
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNon Jury Trial; Judicial Officer: GINSBERG, CARL; Hearing Time: 10:05 AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/02/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE; Comment: EXECUTED SOS CITATION - CLAUDIE GAYLE LOFTICE A/K/A CLAUDIA L. RAWLINGS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/27/2023
  • FinancialFinancial info for LOFTICE, LESTER CLAUD : Transaction Assessment; ; $160.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/27/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE; Comment: EXECUTED CITATION BY POSTING - 2 DEF

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/12/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - APPOINTING AN ATTORNEY AD LITEM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/12/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF TRIAL; Comment: GRIGGS (AAL)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/08/2023
  • FinancialFinancial info for LOFTICE, LESTER CLAUD : Transaction Assessment; ; $16.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/08/2023
  • DocketCITATION BY POSTING; Served: 07/24/2023; Anticipated Server: CONSTABLE 1; Anticipated Method: Served; 07/24/2023: Anticipated Server; CONSTABLE 1: Anticipated Method; Comment: 2 - CIT BY POSTING

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/08/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketISSUE CITATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/07/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT; Comment: PROPOSED ORDER TO APPT ATY AD LITEM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 06/06/2023
  • FinancialFinancial info for LOFTICE, LESTER CLAUD : Transaction Assessment; ; $12.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/06/2023
  • DocketCITATION SOS/COI/COH/HAG; Served: 07/25/2023; Anticipated Server: ATTORNEY; Anticipated Method: Comment; 1 - SOS - M/A

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/06/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketISSUE CITATION COMM OF INS OR SOS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/06/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF TRIAL; Comment: LINEBARGER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/05/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR SERVICE; Comment: CITATION - 1

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/02/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT; Comment: FOR COST OF ABSTRACT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/31/2023
  • FinancialFinancial info for LOFTICE, LESTER CLAUD : Transaction Assessment; ; $350.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/31/2023
  • FinancialFinancial: LOFTICE, LESTER CLAUD ; Total Financial Assessment $538.00 ; Total Payments and Credits $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/31/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORIGINAL PETITION; Comment: - REAL PROPERTY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/31/2023
  • DocketNEW CASE FILED (OCA) - CIVIL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less