This case was last updated from Dallas County District Courts on 08/19/2023 at 16:07:26 (UTC).

DALLAS COUNTY et al vs. JUNIOR DENNIS JAMES SCALES, A/K/A DENNIS JAMES SCALES JUNIOR et al

Case Summary

On 06/01/2023 DALLAS COUNTY filed a Tax - Other Tax lawsuit against JUNIOR DENNIS JAMES SCALES, A/K/A DENNIS JAMES SCALES JUNIOR. This case was filed in Dallas County District Courts, Dallas County Civil District Courts located in Dallas, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is GINSBERG, CARL. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1067

  • Filing Date:

    06/01/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Tax - Other Tax

  • County, State:

    Dallas, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

GINSBERG, CARL

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

DALLAS COUNTY

DALLAS INDEPENDENT SCHOOL DISTRICT

CITY OF DALLAS

PARKLAND HOSPITAL DISTRICT

DALLAS COUNTY COMMUNITY COLLEGE DISTRICT N/K/A DALLAS COLLEGE

DALLAS COUNTY SCHOOL EQUALIZATION FUND

Defendants

SCALES, JUNIOR DENNIS JAMES

DALLAS AREA HABIT FOR HUMANITY INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ATKINS, ASHLY STEELE

 

Court Documents

ORIGINAL PETITION

ORIGINAL PETITION; Comment: - REAL PROPERTY

DAL ISSUANCE REQUEST

REQUEST FOR SERVICE; Comment: CITATION 2

DALLAS AREA HABIT FOR HUMANITY INC

ISSUE CITATION

JUNIOR DENNIS JAMES SCALES

ISSUE CITATION

Non Jury Trial

NOTICE OF TRIAL; Comment: LINEBARGER

FOR COST OF ABSTRACT

AFFIDAVIT; Comment: FOR COST OF ABSTRACT

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/27/2024
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNon Jury Trial; Judicial Officer: GINSBERG, CARL; Hearing Time: 10:05 AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/22/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT; Comment: FOR COST OF ABSTRACT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/06/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF TRIAL; Comment: LINEBARGER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/05/2023
  • FinancialFinancial info for SCALES, JUNIOR DENNIS JAMES : Transaction Assessment; ; $16.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/05/2023
  • DocketCITATION; Unserved: Anticipated Server; PRIVATE PROCESS SERVER: Anticipated Method; Comment: 1-TJRC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/05/2023
  • DocketCITATION; Unserved: Anticipated Server; PRIVATE PROCESS SERVER: Anticipated Method; Comment: 1-TJRC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/05/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketISSUE CITATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/05/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketISSUE CITATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/02/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR SERVICE; Comment: CITATION 2

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/01/2023
  • FinancialFinancial info for SCALES, JUNIOR DENNIS JAMES : Transaction Assessment; ; $350.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/01/2023
  • FinancialFinancial: SCALES, JUNIOR DENNIS JAMES ; Total Financial Assessment $366.00 ; Total Payments and Credits $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/01/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORIGINAL PETITION; Comment: - REAL PROPERTY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/01/2023
  • DocketNEW CASE FILED (OCA) - CIVIL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less