This case was last updated from Dallas County District Courts on 09/10/2023 at 07:20:02 (UTC).

DALLAS COUNTY et al vs. ALICE DEAN JONES et al

Case Summary

On 06/01/2023 DALLAS COUNTY filed a Tax - Other Tax lawsuit against ALICE DEAN JONES. This case was filed in Dallas County District Courts, Dallas County Civil District Courts located in Dallas, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is GINSBERG, CARL. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1071

  • Filing Date:

    06/01/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Tax - Other Tax

  • County, State:

    Dallas, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

GINSBERG, CARL

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

DALLAS COUNTY

GRAND PRAIRIE INDEPENDENT SCHOOL DISTRICT

CITY OF GRAND PRAIRIE

PARKLAND HOSPITAL DISTRICT

DALLAS COUNTY COMMUNITY COLLEGE DISTRICT N/K/A DALLAS COLLEGE

DALLAS COUNTY SCHOOL EQUALIZATION FUND

Defendants

JONES, ALICE DEAN

GUTIERREZ, RANDALL DEAN

GUTIERREZ, MICHAEL S.

HUMPHREYS, TALLAUAH MARIE

JONES, RENITA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ATKINS, ASHLY STEELE

Defendant Attorney

MCCOOL, GEORGE WALTER

 

Court Documents

ORDER - APPOINTING AN ATTORNEY AD LITEM

ORDER - APPOINTING AN ATTORNEY AD LITEM

Non Jury Trial

NOTICE OF TRIAL; Comment: MCCOOL (AAL)

PROPOSED ORDER APPOINT AD LITEM

NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT; Comment: PROPOSED ORDER APPOINT AD LITEM

MOTION APPOINT ATTY AD LITEM

MOTION - ATTORNEY AD LITEM

Non Jury Trial

NOTICE OF TRIAL; Comment: LINEBARGER

ORIGINAL PETITION

ORIGINAL PETITION; Comment: - REAL PROPERTY

UNEXECUTED CITATION - MICHAEL S GUTIERREZ

RETURN OF SERVICE; Comment: UNEXECUTED CITATION - MICHAEL S GUTIERREZ

EXECUTED CITATION BY POSTING - ALICE DEAN JONES

RETURN OF SERVICE; Comment: EXECUTED CITATION BY POSTING - ALICE DEAN JONES

FOR COST OF ABSTRACT

AFFIDAVIT; Comment: FOR COST OF ABSTRACT

ISSUE CITATION BY POSTING - 1 DEF

ISSUE CITATION

FOR CIT BY POSTING - ALICE DEAN JONES

AFFIDAVIT; Comment: FOR CIT BY POSTING - ALICE DEAN JONES

RENITA JONES

ISSUE CITATION

TALLAUAH MARIE HUMPHREYS

ISSUE CITATION

MICHAEL S. GUTIERREZ

ISSUE CITATION

RANDALL DEAN GUTIERREZ

ISSUE CITATION

REQUEST FOR SERVICE

REQUEST FOR SERVICE; Comment: CITATION - 4

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/28/2024
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNon Jury Trial; Judicial Officer: GINSBERG, CARL; Hearing Time: 10:05 AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/29/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE; Comment: UNEXECUTED CITATION - MICHAEL S GUTIERREZ

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/03/2023
  • FinancialFinancial info for JONES, ALICE DEAN : Transaction Assessment; ; $80.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/03/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE; Comment: EXECUTED CITATION BY POSTING - ALICE DEAN JONES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/22/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT; Comment: FOR COST OF ABSTRACT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/16/2023
  • FinancialFinancial info for JONES, ALICE DEAN : Transaction Assessment; ; $8.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/16/2023
  • DocketCITATION BY POSTING; Served: 07/31/2023; Anticipated Server: CONSTABLE 1; Anticipated Method: Comment; 1 - CIT BY POSTING

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/16/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketISSUE CITATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/13/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - APPOINTING AN ATTORNEY AD LITEM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/13/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF TRIAL; Comment: MCCOOL (AAL)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 06/05/2023
  • DocketCITATION; Unserved: Anticipated Server; PRIVATE PROCESS SERVER: Anticipated Method; Comment: 1 - TJRC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/05/2023
  • DocketCITATION; Unserved: Anticipated Server; PRIVATE PROCESS SERVER: Anticipated Method; Comment: 1 - TJRC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/05/2023
  • DocketCITATION; Return Unserved: 08/29/2023; Anticipated Server: ATTORNEY; Anticipated Method: Comment; 1 - M/A

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/05/2023
  • DocketCITATION; Unserved: Anticipated Server; PRIVATE PROCESS SERVER: Anticipated Method; Comment: 1 - TJRC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/05/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketISSUE CITATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/02/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR SERVICE; Comment: CITATION - 4

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/01/2023
  • FinancialFinancial info for JONES, ALICE DEAN : Transaction Assessment; ; $350.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/01/2023
  • FinancialFinancial: JONES, ALICE DEAN ; Total Financial Assessment $470.00 ; Total Payments and Credits $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/01/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORIGINAL PETITION; Comment: - REAL PROPERTY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/01/2023
  • DocketNEW CASE FILED (OCA) - CIVIL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less