This case was last updated from Dallas County District Courts on 11/19/2023 at 18:04:05 (UTC).

DALLAS COUNTY et al vs. PEDRO GOMEZ SALAZAR, SR. et al

Case Summary

On 07/11/2023 DALLAS COUNTY filed a Tax - Other Tax lawsuit against PEDRO GOMEZ SALAZAR, SR. This case was filed in Dallas County District Courts, Dallas County Civil District Courts located in Dallas, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is GINSBERG, CARL. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1318

  • Filing Date:

    07/11/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Tax - Other Tax

  • County, State:

    Dallas, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

GINSBERG, CARL

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

DALLAS COUNTY

DALLAS INDEPENDENT SCHOOL DISTRICT

CITY OF DALLAS

PARKLAND HOSPITAL DISTRICT

DALLAS COUNTY COMMUNITY COLLEGE DISTRICT N/K/A DALLAS COLLEGE

DALLAS COUNTY SCHOOL EQUALIZATION FUND

Defendants

SALAZAR, PEDRO GOMEZ, Sr.

SALAZAR, CATHERINE RIOS

SALAZAR, PETE, Jr

GARAY, TERESA

SALAZAR, JULIA

SALAZAR, STEVEN, Sr.

SALAZAR, DAVID

OJEDA, IRENE

HERNANDEZ, HORTENSE

SALAZAR, DANIEL

SALAZAR, RALPH, Jr

SALAZAR, RICKY

SALAZAR, ROBERT

7 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ATKINS, ASHLY STEELE

Defendant Attorney

ALAND, RONALD Z

 

Court Documents

UNEXECUTED CITATION - STEVEN SALAZAR, SR.

RETURN OF SERVICE; Comment: UNEXECUTED CITATION - STEVEN SALAZAR, SR.

UNEXECUTED CITATION - RICKY SALAZAR

RETURN OF SERVICE; Comment: UNEXECUTED CITATION - RICKY SALAZAR

UNEXECUTED CITATION - IRENE OJEDA

RETURN OF SERVICE; Comment: UNEXECUTED CITATION - IRENE OJEDA

RALPH SALAZAR JR - CITATION

ISSUE CITATION

JULIE ANN MIRANDA -CITATION

ISSUE CITATION

PATTY ANN SALAZAR-MARTEL -CITATION

ISSUE CITATION

REQUEST FOR SERVICE

REQUEST FOR SERVICE; Comment: ISSUE CITATIONS -3

EXECUTED CITATION - THE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA

RETURN OF SERVICE; Comment: EXECUTED CITATION - THE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA

Non Jury Trial

NOTICE OF TRIAL; Comment: ALAND (AAL)

HORTENSE HERNANDEZ

ISSUE CITATION

RICKY SALAZAR

ISSUE CITATION

RALPH SALAZAR JR.

ISSUE CITATION

SOS SANDY ANN COOPER

ISSUE CITATION COMM OF INS OR SOS

DAL ISSUANCE REQUEST

REQUEST FOR SERVICE; Comment: CITATION 10

DAL ISSUANCE REQUEST

REQUEST FOR SERVICE; Comment: CITATION 2 CIT; 1 SOS

AFFIDAVIT FOR COST OF ABSTRACT

AFFIDAVIT; Comment: FOR COST OF ABSTRACT

Non Jury Trial

NOTICE OF TRIAL; Comment: PLAINTIFF

ORIGINAL PETITION

ORIGINAL PETITION; Comment: - REAL PROPERTY

46 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

04/15/2024
View Court Documents

DocketNon Jury Trial; Judicial Officer: GINSBERG, CARL; Hearing Time: 10:05 AM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/12/2023
View Court Documents

DocketRETURN OF SERVICE; Comment: UNEXECUTED CITATION - STEVEN SALAZAR, SR.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/12/2023
View Court Documents

DocketRETURN OF SERVICE; Comment: UNEXECUTED CITATION - RICKY SALAZAR

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/12/2023
View Court Documents

DocketRETURN OF SERVICE; Comment: UNEXECUTED CITATION - IRENE OJEDA

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/05/2023

DocketCITATION; Unserved: Anticipated Server; ATTORNEY: Anticipated Method; Unserved: Anticipated Server; ATTORNEY: Anticipated Method; Unserved: Anticipated Server; ATTORNEY: Anticipated Method; Comment: 3 M/AS

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/05/2023
View Court Documents

DocketISSUE CITATION

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/04/2023
View Court Documents

DocketREQUEST FOR SERVICE; Comment: ISSUE CITATIONS -3

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/29/2023
View Court Documents

DocketRETURN OF SERVICE; Comment: EXECUTED CITATION - THE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/21/2023
View Court Documents

DocketRETURN OF SERVICE; Comment: UNEXECUTED CITATION - RALPH SALAZAR, JR.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/21/2023
View Court Documents

DocketRETURN OF SERVICE; Comment: UNEXECUTED CITATION - PATTY ANN SALAZAR-MATEL

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
50 More Docket Entries
07/18/2023
View Court Documents

DocketISSUE CITATION

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/18/2023
View Court Documents

DocketISSUE CITATION

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/18/2023
View Court Documents

DocketISSUE CITATION

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/18/2023
View Court Documents

DocketISSUE CITATION COMM OF INS OR SOS

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/17/2023
View Court Documents

DocketREQUEST FOR SERVICE; Comment: CITATION 10

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/17/2023
View Court Documents

DocketREQUEST FOR SERVICE; Comment: CITATION 2 CIT; 1 SOS

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/12/2023
View Court Documents

DocketAFFIDAVIT; Comment: FOR COST OF ABSTRACT

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/11/2023
View Court Documents

DocketNOTICE OF TRIAL; Comment: PLAINTIFF

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/11/2023
View Court Documents

DocketORIGINAL PETITION; Comment: - REAL PROPERTY

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/11/2023

DocketNEW CASE FILED (OCA) - CIVIL

[+] Read More [-] Read Less