This case was last updated from Dallas County District Courts on 12/03/2023 at 03:06:48 (UTC).

JULIE SANDOVAL vs. FREDDIE & MARTIN TRUCKING, LLC, et al

Case Summary

On 09/19/2023 JULIE SANDOVAL filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against FREDDIE MARTIN TRUCKING, LLC,. This case was filed in Dallas County District Courts, Dallas County Civil District Courts located in Dallas, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is ACEVES, MARIA. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******6116

  • Filing Date:

    09/19/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Dallas, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

ACEVES, MARIA

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SANDOVAL, JULIE

Defendants

FREDDIE & MARTIN TRUCKING, LLC

ID TRANSPORTATION, INC.

PENSKE LEASING AND RENTAL COMPANY

PENSKE TRUCK LEASING CO., L.P.

PENSKE VEHICLE SERVICES, INC.

KENDRICKS , MITCHELL LEE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BARTON, STEFANI W.

Defendant Attorneys

FLETCHER, DOUGLAS D

SCUDDER, MARK S.

COX, CLINTON V., IV

 

Court Documents

SCHEDULING ORDER

SCHEDULING ORDER

192nd Trial Reset Letter Tenesa

Jury Trial - Civil; Judicial Officer: ACEVES, MARIA; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM

192nd Trial Reset Letter Tenesa

Jury Trial - Civil; Judicial Officer: ACEVES, MARIA; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM

192nd Trial Reset Letter Tenesa

Jury Trial - Civil; Judicial Officer: ACEVES, MARIA; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM

ORIGINAL ANSWER-FREDDIE & MARTIN TRUCKING LLC

ORIGINAL ANSWER - GENERAL DENIAL

JURY DEMAND FORM

JURY DEMAND

ORIGINAL ANSWER

- GENERAL DENIAL; ORIGINAL ANSWER

2023-11-09 Def ID Transportation, Inc.'s Original Answer.pdf

ORIGINAL ANSWER - GENERAL DENIAL; Comment: Defendant ID Transportation, Inc.'s Original Answer

SANDOVAL - 2023 1108 Penske Vehicle Services, Inc. Original Answer.pdf

ORIGINAL ANSWER - GENERAL DENIAL; Comment: 2023 1106 Penske Vehicle Services, Inc. Original Answer

SANDOVAL - 2023 1108 Penske Truck Leasing Co., LP Original Answer.pdf

ORIGINAL ANSWER - GENERAL DENIAL; Comment: 2023 1108 Penske Truck Leasing Co., LP Original Answer

SANDOVAL - 2023 1108 Penske Leasing and Rental Company Original Answer.pdf

ORIGINAL ANSWER - GENERAL DENIAL; Comment: 2023 1108 Penske Leasing and Rental Company's Original Answer

ISSUE CITATION COMM OF INS OR SOS-ID TRANPORTATION INC

ISSUE CITATION COMM OF INS OR SOS

ISSUE CITATION-FREDDIE&MARTIN TRUCKING LLC

ISSUE CITATION

ISSUE CITATION-PENSKE LEASING AND RENTAL COMPANY

ISSUE CITATION

ISSUE CITATION-PENSKE TRUCK LEASING CO. LP

ISSUE CITATION

ISSUE CITATION-PENSKE VEHICLE SERVICES INC

ISSUE CITATION

ISSUE CITATION-MITCHELL LEE KENDRICKS

ISSUE CITATION

PLAINTIFFS ORIGINAL PETITION

ORIGINAL PETITION

12 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

05/05/2025
View Court Documents

DocketJury Trial - Civil; Judicial Officer: ACEVES, MARIA; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/28/2023
View Court Documents

DocketSCHEDULING ORDER

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/16/2023
View Court Documents

DocketORIGINAL ANSWER - GENERAL DENIAL

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/10/2023
View Court Documents

DocketJURY DEMAND

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/10/2023
View Court Documents

Docket- GENERAL DENIAL; ORIGINAL ANSWER

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/09/2023
View Court Documents

Docket- GENERAL DENIAL; ORIGINAL ANSWER

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/08/2023
View Court Documents

Docket- GENERAL DENIAL; ORIGINAL ANSWER

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/08/2023
View Court Documents

Docket- GENERAL DENIAL; ORIGINAL ANSWER

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/08/2023
View Court Documents

Docket- GENERAL DENIAL; ORIGINAL ANSWER

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/18/2023
View Court Documents

DocketRETURN OF SERVICE; Comment: EXECUTED CITATION - PENSKE VEHICLE SERVICES, INC

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
3 More Docket Entries
09/28/2023

DocketCITATION; Served: 10/17/2023; Anticipated Server: ESERVE; Anticipated Method: Actual Server; PRIVATE PROCESS SERVER: Returned; 10/18/2023: Comment; MITCHELL LEE KENDRICKS

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/28/2023

DocketCITATION; Served: 10/17/2023; Anticipated Server: ESERVE; Anticipated Method: Actual Server; PRIVATE PROCESS SERVER: Returned; 10/18/2023: Comment; PENSKE VEHICLE SERVICES, INC.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/28/2023

DocketCITATION; Unserved: Anticipated Server; ESERVE: Anticipated Method; Comment: PENSKE TRUCKLEASING CO., L.P.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/28/2023

DocketCITATION; Unserved: Anticipated Server; ESERVE: Anticipated Method; Comment: PENSKE LEASING AND RENTAL COMPANY

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/28/2023

DocketCITATION; Unserved: Anticipated Server; ESERVE: Anticipated Method; Comment: FREDDIE & MARTIN TRUCKING LLC

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/21/2023

DocketCORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE; Comment: RE: FEES PAID

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/19/2023
View Court Documents

DocketISSUE CITATION COMM OF INS OR SOS

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/19/2023
View Court Documents

DocketISSUE CITATION

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/19/2023
View Court Documents

DocketORIGINAL PETITION

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/19/2023

DocketNEW CASE FILED (OCA) - CIVIL

[+] Read More [-] Read Less