This case was last updated from Dallas County District Courts on 11/15/2023 at 22:01:34 (UTC).

DALLAS COUNTY et al vs. DAVID MANNING, INC. et al

Case Summary

On 07/11/2023 DALLAS COUNTY filed a Tax - Other Tax lawsuit against DAVID MANNING, INC. This case was filed in Dallas County District Courts, Dallas County Civil District Courts located in Dallas, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is GINSBERG, CARL. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1314

  • Filing Date:

    07/11/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Tax - Other Tax

  • County, State:

    Dallas, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

GINSBERG, CARL

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

DALLAS COUNTY

DALLAS INDEPENDENT SCHOOL DISTRICT

CITY OF DALLAS

PARKLAND HOSPITAL DISTRICT

DALLAS COUNTY COMMUNITY COLLEGE DISTRICT N/K/A DALLAS COLLEGE

DALLAS COUNTY SCHOOL EQUALIZATION FUND

Defendants

DAVID MANNING, INC.

INDEPENDENT BANK F/K/A NORTHSTAR BANK OF TEXAS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ATKINS, ASHLY STEELE

Defendant Attorney

MCKITT, STEPHEN PHILLIP

 

Court Documents

ORIGINAL PETITION

ORIGINAL PETITION; Comment: - REAL PROPERTY

Non Jury Trial

NOTICE OF TRIAL; Comment: PLAINTIFF

ORIGINAL PETITION

ORIGINAL PETITION; Comment: - REAL PROPERTY

Non Jury Trial

NOTICE OF TRIAL; Comment: PLAINTIFF

DAL ISSUANCE REQUEST

REQUEST FOR SERVICE; Comment: CITATION 2

DAVID MANNING INC.

ISSUE CITATION

INDEPENDENT BANK

ISSUE CITATION

FOR COST OF ABSTRACT

AFFIDAVIT; Comment: FOR COST OF ABSTRACT

ORIGINAL ANSWER - GENERAL DENIAL - DAVID MANNING, INC.

ORIGINAL ANSWER - GENERAL DENIAL

Non Jury Trial LGBS

NOTICE OF TRIAL; Comment: LINEBARGER. LISA MANNING

Non Jury Trial

NOTICE OF TRIAL; Comment: LINEBARGER. LISA MANNING

EXECUTED CITATION - INDEPENDENT BANK

RETURN OF SERVICE; Comment: EXECUTED CITATION - INDEPENDENT BANK

EXECUTED CITATION - DAVID MANNING, INC.

RETURN OF SERVICE; Comment: EXECUTED CITATION - DAVID MANNING, INC.

NOTICE OF HEARING - LISA MANNING

RETURNED MAIL; Comment: NOTICE OF HEARING - LISA MANNING

Non Jury Trial

NOTICE OF TRIAL; Comment: LISA MANNING

ORIGINAL ANSWER GENERAL DENIAL

ORIGINAL ANSWER - GENERAL DENIAL

Non Jury Trial

NOTICE OF TRIAL; Comment: MCKITT

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

04/15/2024
View Court Documents

DocketNon Jury Trial; Judicial Officer: GINSBERG, CARL; Hearing Time: 10:05 AM; Cancel Reason: HEARING RESCHEDULED

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/25/2024
View Court Documents

DocketNon Jury Trial; Judicial Officer: GINSBERG, CARL; Hearing Time: 10:30 AM; Comment: MEETING ID 822 8654 7673

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/03/2023
View Court Documents

DocketNOTICE OF TRIAL; Comment: MCKITT

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/02/2023
View Court Documents

DocketORIGINAL ANSWER - GENERAL DENIAL

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/26/2023
View Court Documents

DocketNOTICE OF TRIAL; Comment: LISA MANNING

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/26/2023
View Court Documents

DocketRETURNED MAIL; Comment: NOTICE OF HEARING - LISA MANNING

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/12/2023
View Court Documents

DocketRETURN OF SERVICE; Comment: EXECUTED CITATION - DAVID MANNING, INC.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/11/2023
View Court Documents

DocketRETURN OF SERVICE; Comment: EXECUTED CITATION - INDEPENDENT BANK

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/07/2023
View Court Documents

DocketNOTICE OF TRIAL; Comment: LINEBARGER. LISA MANNING

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/06/2023
View Court Documents

DocketORIGINAL ANSWER - GENERAL DENIAL

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/22/2023
View Court Documents

DocketAFFIDAVIT; Comment: FOR COST OF ABSTRACT

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/12/2023

DocketCITATION; Served: 09/05/2023; Anticipated Server: ATTORNEY; Anticipated Method: Comment; 1-M/A

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/12/2023

DocketCITATION; Served: 08/31/2023; Anticipated Server: ATTORNEY; Anticipated Method: Comment; 1-M/A

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/12/2023
View Court Documents

DocketISSUE CITATION

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/12/2023
View Court Documents

DocketISSUE CITATION

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/12/2023
View Court Documents

DocketREQUEST FOR SERVICE; Comment: CITATION 2

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/11/2023
View Court Documents

DocketNOTICE OF TRIAL; Comment: PLAINTIFF

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/11/2023
View Court Documents

DocketORIGINAL PETITION; Comment: - REAL PROPERTY

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/11/2023

DocketNEW CASE FILED (OCA) - CIVIL

[+] Read More [-] Read Less