This case was last updated from Dallas County Texas Courts on 09/22/2023 at 14:15:07 (UTC).

RICARDO ESPINOZA vs.CHIPOTLE MEXICAN GRILL, INC. D/B/A CHIPOTLE #1889

Case Summary

On 04/12/2023 RICARDO ESPINOZA filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against CHIPOTLE MEXICAN GRILL, INC D/B/A CHIPOTLE 1889. This case was filed in Dallas County Texas Courts, Dallas County Texas Courts At Law located in Dallas, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is BENSON, D'METRIA. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********52-A

  • Filing Date:

    04/12/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Dallas, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

BENSON, D'METRIA

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ESPINOZA, RICARDO

Defendant

CHIPOTLE MEXICAN GRILL, INC. D/B/A CHIPOTLE #1889

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BENJAMIN, LAYLA

Defendant Attorney

RIDLEY, BARTON LANCE

 

Court Documents

JURY DEMAND

JURY DEMAND

ORIGINAL ANSWER

ORIGINAL ANSWER; Comment: ORIGINAL ANSWER OF DEFENDANT CHIPOTLE MEXICAN GRILL, INC.

PLAINTIFF S ORIGINAL PETITION

ORIGINAL PETITION

SUBPOENA-SEDGWICK CLAIMS MANAGEMENT SERVICES, INC.

RETURN OF SERVICE; Comment: SUBPOENA-SEDGWICK CLAIMS MANAGEMENT SERVICES, INC.

CERTIFICATE DEPOSITION-SPECIALTY CARE CLINICS - MEDICAL RECORDS

CERTIFICATE - DEPOSITION; Comment: SPECIALTY CARE CLINICS - MEDICAL RECORDS

NOTICE INTENT TAKE DEPOSITION

NOTICE - TAKE DEPOSITION; Comment: NOTICE INTENT TAKE DEPOSITION

RETURN OF SUBPOENA

RETURN OF SERVICE; Comment: RETURN OF SUBPOENA

RETURN OF SUBPOENA

RETURN OF SERVICE; Comment: RETURN OF SUBPOENA

SERVICE OF SUBPOENA DUCES TECUM

RETURN OF SERVICE; Comment: SERVICE OF SUBPOENA DUCES TECUM

SERVICE OF SUBPOENA DUCES TECUM

RETURN OF SERVICE; Comment: SERVICE OF SUBPOENA DUCES TECUM

SERVICE OF SUBPOENA DUCES TECUM

RETURN OF SERVICE; Comment: SERVICE OF SUBPOENA DUCES TECUM

NOTICE OF INTENTION TO TAKE DEPOSITION

NOTICE - TAKE DEPOSITION

NOTICE OF INTENTION TO TAKE DEPOSITION

NOTICE - TAKE DEPOSITION; Comment: NOTICE OF INTENTION TO TAKE DEPOSITION

NOTICE OF INTENTION TO TAKE DEPOSITION

NOTICE - TAKE DEPOSITION

17 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/15/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE; Comment: SUBPOENA-SEDGWICK CLAIMS MANAGEMENT SERVICES, INC.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/13/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE - DEPOSITION; Comment: SPECIALTY CARE CLINICS - MEDICAL RECORDS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/29/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE - TAKE DEPOSITION; Comment: NOTICE INTENT TAKE DEPOSITION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/23/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE; Comment: RETURN OF SUBPOENA

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/23/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE; Comment: RETURN OF SUBPOENA

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/23/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE; Comment: SERVICE OF SUBPOENA DUCES TECUM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/23/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE; Comment: SERVICE OF SUBPOENA DUCES TECUM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/23/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE; Comment: SERVICE OF SUBPOENA DUCES TECUM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/22/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE - TAKE DEPOSITION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/17/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE - TAKE DEPOSITION; Comment: NOTICE OF INTENTION TO TAKE DEPOSITION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
13 More Docket Entries
  • 04/13/2023
  • FinancialFinancial info for ESPINOZA, RICARDO : STATE CREDIT; ; $137.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/13/2023
  • FinancialFinancial info for ESPINOZA, RICARDO : CREDIT CARD - TEXFILE (CC); Receipt # CV-2023-03766; ESPINOZA, RICARDO $221.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/13/2023
  • FinancialFinancial info for ESPINOZA, RICARDO : Transaction Assessment; ; $358.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/13/2023
  • FinancialFinancial: ESPINOZA, RICARDO ; Total Financial Assessment $358.00 ; Total Payments and Credits $358.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/13/2023
  • DocketCITATION (SERVICE); Unserved: Anticipated Server; ATTORNEY: Anticipated Method; Comment: CHIPOTLE MEXICAN GRILL, INC.D/B/A CHIPOTLE #1889

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/13/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketISSUE CITATION; Comment: ESERVE- ENV. #74606929

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/12/2023
  • FinancialFinancial: ; CHIPOTLE MEXICAN GRILL, INC. D/B/A CHIPOTLE #1889 ; Total Financial Assessment $0.00 ; Total Payments and Credits $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/12/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJURY DEMAND

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/12/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORIGINAL PETITION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/12/2023
  • DocketNEW CASE FILED (OCA)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less