This case was last updated from Dallas County District Courts on 10/12/2023 at 21:54:59 (UTC).

DALLAS COUNTY et al vs. ANIBAL A. GARCIA

Case Summary

On 07/11/2023 DALLAS COUNTY filed a Tax - Other Tax lawsuit against ANIBAL A GARCIA. This case was filed in Dallas County District Courts, Dallas County Civil District Courts located in Dallas, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is GINSBERG, CARL. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1319

  • Filing Date:

    07/11/2023

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Tax - Other Tax

  • County, State:

    Dallas, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

GINSBERG, CARL

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

DALLAS COUNTY

IRVING INDEPENDENT SCHOOL DISTRICT

CITY OF IRVING

PARKLAND HOSPITAL DISTRICT

DALLAS COUNTY COMMUNITY COLLEGE DISTRICT N/K/A DALLAS COLLEGE

DALLAS COUNTY SCHOOL EQUALIZATION FUND

Defendant

GARCIA, ANIBAL A.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ATKINS, ASHLY STEELE

 

Court Documents

ORIGINAL PETITION

ORIGINAL PETITION; Comment: - REAL PROPERTY

Non Jury Trial

NOTICE OF TRIAL; Comment: PLAINTIFF

ORIGINAL PETITION

ORIGINAL PETITION; Comment: - REAL PROPERTY

Non Jury Trial

NOTICE OF TRIAL; Comment: PLAINTIFF

REQUEST FOR SERVICE

REQUEST FOR SERVICE; Comment: CITATION - 1

ANIBAL A. GARCIA

ISSUE CITATION

FOR COST OF ABSTRACT

AFFIDAVIT; Comment: FOR COST OF ABSTRACT

EXECUTED CITATION - ANIBAL A. GARCIA

RETURN OF SERVICE; Comment: EXECUTED CITATION - ANIBAL A. GARCIA

MOTION TO DISMISS

MOTION - DISMISS

PROPOSED ORDER GRANTING DISMISSAL (FINAL)

NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT; Comment: PROPOSED ORDER GRANTING DISMISSAL (FINAL)

 

Docket Entries

04/15/2024
View Court Documents

DocketNon Jury Trial; Judicial Officer: GINSBERG, CARL; Hearing Time: 10:05 AM; Cancel Reason: CASE CLOSED

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/12/2023

DispositionDisposition: Judgment; Judicial Officer: GINSBERG, CARL; Judgment Type: NON-SUIT/DISMISSAL BY PLAINTIFF / PETITIONER; Judgment: Total Judgment:; of $0.00: Awarded To:; DALLAS COUNTY: Awarded Against:; GARCIA, ANIBAL A.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/11/2023
View Court Documents

DocketNON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT; Comment: PROPOSED ORDER GRANTING DISMISSAL (FINAL)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/11/2023
View Court Documents

DocketMOTION - DISMISS

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/06/2023

FinancialFinancial info for GARCIA, ANIBAL A. : PAYMENT (CASE FEES); Receipt # 68732-2023-DCLK; GARCIA, ANIBAL A. $788.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/08/2023
View Court Documents

DocketRETURN OF SERVICE; Comment: EXECUTED CITATION - ANIBAL A. GARCIA

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/22/2023
View Court Documents

DocketAFFIDAVIT; Comment: FOR COST OF ABSTRACT

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/18/2023

FinancialFinancial info for GARCIA, ANIBAL A. : Transaction Assessment; ; $8.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/18/2023

DocketCITATION; Served: 08/24/2023; Anticipated Server: ATTORNEY; Anticipated Method: Comment; 1 - TJRC

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/18/2023
View Court Documents

DocketISSUE CITATION

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/17/2023
View Court Documents

DocketREQUEST FOR SERVICE; Comment: CITATION - 1

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/11/2023

FinancialFinancial info for GARCIA, ANIBAL A. : Transaction Assessment; ; $350.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/11/2023

FinancialFinancial: GARCIA, ANIBAL A. ; Total Financial Assessment $358.00 ; Total Payments and Credits $788.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/11/2023
View Court Documents

DocketNOTICE OF TRIAL; Comment: PLAINTIFF

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/11/2023
View Court Documents

DocketORIGINAL PETITION; Comment: - REAL PROPERTY

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/11/2023

DocketNEW CASE FILED (OCA) - CIVIL

[+] Read More [-] Read Less