This case was last updated from Dallas County District Courts on 09/12/2023 at 19:09:50 (UTC).

DALLAS COUNTY et al vs. SKYBRIDGE HOMES, LLC et al

Case Summary

On 05/31/2023 DALLAS COUNTY filed a Tax - Other Tax lawsuit against SKYBRIDGE HOMES, LLC. This case was filed in Dallas County District Courts, Dallas County Civil District Courts located in Dallas, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is GINSBERG, CARL. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1064

  • Filing Date:

    05/31/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Tax - Other Tax

  • County, State:

    Dallas, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

GINSBERG, CARL

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

DALLAS COUNTY

DALLAS INDEPENDENT SCHOOL DISTRICT

CITY OF DALLAS

PARKLAND HOSPITAL DISTRICT

DALLAS COUNTY COMMUNITY COLLEGE DISTRICT N/K/A DALLAS COLLEGE

DALLAS COUNTY SCHOOL EQUALIZATION FUND

Defendants

SKYBRIDGE HOMES, LLC

LOAN RANGER CAPITAL INVESTMENTS, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ATKINS, ASHLY STEELE

 

Court Documents

ORIGINAL PETITION

ORIGINAL PETITION; Comment: - REAL PROPERTY

REQUEST FOR SERVICE

REQUEST FOR SERVICE; Comment: ISSUE CITATIONS -2

LOAN RANGER CAPITAL INVESTMENTS LLC -CITATION

ISSUE CITATION

SKYBRIDGE HOMES LLC - CITATION

ISSUE CITATION

Non Jury Trial

NOTICE OF TRIAL; Comment: LINEBARGER

FOR COST OF ABSTRACT

AFFIDAVIT; Comment: FOR COST OF ABSTRACT

EXECUTED CITATION - LOAN RANGER CAPITAL INVESTMENT

RETURN OF SERVICE; Comment: EXECUTED CITATION - LOAN RANGER CAPITAL INVESTMENT

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/27/2024
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNon Jury Trial; Judicial Officer: GINSBERG, CARL; Hearing Time: 10:05 AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/11/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE; Comment: EXECUTED CITATION - LOAN RANGER CAPITAL INVESTMENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/22/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT; Comment: FOR COST OF ABSTRACT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/06/2023
  • FinancialFinancial info for SKYBRIDGE HOMES, LLC : Transaction Assessment; ; $16.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/06/2023
  • DocketCITATION; Served: 08/08/2023; Anticipated Server: ATTORNEY; Anticipated Method: Unserved; Anticipated Server: PRIVATE PROCESS SERVER; Anticipated Method: Comment; 1 M/A & 1 TJRC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/06/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF TRIAL; Comment: LINEBARGER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/06/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketISSUE CITATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/05/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR SERVICE; Comment: ISSUE CITATIONS -2

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/31/2023
  • FinancialFinancial info for SKYBRIDGE HOMES, LLC : Transaction Assessment; ; $350.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/31/2023
  • FinancialFinancial: SKYBRIDGE HOMES, LLC ; Total Financial Assessment $366.00 ; Total Payments and Credits $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/31/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORIGINAL PETITION; Comment: - REAL PROPERTY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/31/2023
  • DocketNEW CASE FILED (OCA) - CIVIL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less