This case was last updated from Dallas County District Courts on 11/12/2023 at 19:12:03 (UTC).

DALLAS COUNTY et al vs. JIMMY D. CRISP et al

Case Summary

On 05/26/2023 DALLAS COUNTY filed a Tax - Other Tax lawsuit against JIMMY D CRISP. This case was filed in Dallas County District Courts, Dallas County Civil District Courts located in Dallas, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is GINSBERG, CARL. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1036

  • Filing Date:

    05/26/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Tax - Other Tax

  • County, State:

    Dallas, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

GINSBERG, CARL

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

DALLAS COUNTY

GRAND PRAIRIE INDEPENDENT SCHOOL DISTRICT

CITY OF GRAND PRAIRIE

PARKLAND HOSPITAL DISTRICT

DALLAS COUNTY COMMUNITY COLLEGE DISTRICT N/K/A DALLAS COLLEGE

DALLAS COUNTY SCHOOL EQUALIZATION FUND

Defendants

CRISP, JIMMY D.

CRISP, LOUANNE

CRISP, PHILLIP BRYAN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ATKINS, ASHLY STEELE

Defendant Attorneys

KIM, KATHERINE ANNE-GRAWL

DEFORD, TERESA L.

 

Court Documents

Non Jury Trial

NOTICE OF TRIAL; Comment: LINEBARGER, KIM, DEFORD

Non Jury Trial AAL

NOTICE OF TRIAL; Comment: LINEBARGER, KIM, DEFORD

Non Jury Trial LGBS

NOTICE OF TRIAL; Comment: LINEBARGER, KIM, DEFORD

ORIGINAL ANSWER GENERAL DENIAL

ORIGINAL ANSWER - GENERAL DENIAL

EXECUTED CITATION - PHILLIP BRYAN CRISP

RETURN OF SERVICE; Comment: EXECUTED CITATION - PHILLIP BRYAN CRISP

EXECUTED CITATION - LOUANNE CRISP

RETURN OF SERVICE; Comment: EXECUTED CITATION - LOUANNE CRISP

EXECUTED CITATION BY POSTING - JIMMY D. CRISP

RETURN OF SERVICE; Comment: EXECUTED CITATION BY POSTING - JIMMY D. CRISP

ANSWER AD LITEM

ORIGINAL ANSWER - GENERAL DENIAL

PHILLIP BRYAN CRISP

ISSUE CITATION

AFFIDAVIT COST OF ABSTRACT

AFFIDAVIT; Comment: COST OF ABSTRACT-TEXS

Non Jury Trial

NOTICE OF TRIAL; Comment: KIM (AAL)

PROPOSED ORDER TO APPT AAL

NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT; Comment: PROPOSED ORDER TO APPOINT ATTY AD LITEM

CBP - JIMMY D CRISP

AFFIDAVIT; Comment: CBP - JIMMY D CRISP

MOT APPOINT ATTY ADLITEM-NO CERT.pdf

MOTION - ATTORNEY AD LITEM; Comment: TO APPOINT ATTORNEY AD LITEM

Non Jury Trial

NOTICE OF TRIAL; Comment: LINEBARGER

LOUANNE CRISP

ISSUE CITATION

REQUEST FOR SERVICE

REQUEST FOR SERVICE; Comment: CITATION ISSUANCE - 1

ORIGINAL PETITION

ORIGINAL PETITION; Comment: - REAL PROPERTY

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

03/27/2024
View Court Documents

DocketNon Jury Trial; Judicial Officer: GINSBERG, CARL; Hearing Time: 01:15 PM; Comment: MEETING ID 873 3846 6400

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/27/2024
View Court Documents

DocketNon Jury Trial; Judicial Officer: GINSBERG, CARL; Hearing Time: 10:05 AM; Cancel Reason: HEARING RESCHEDULED

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/16/2023
View Court Documents

DocketNOTICE OF TRIAL; Comment: LINEBARGER, KIM, DEFORD

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/16/2023
View Court Documents

DocketORIGINAL ANSWER - GENERAL DENIAL

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/04/2023
View Court Documents

DocketRETURN OF SERVICE; Comment: EXECUTED CITATION - PHILLIP BRYAN CRISP

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/24/2023
View Court Documents

DocketRETURN OF SERVICE; Comment: EXECUTED CITATION - LOUANNE CRISP

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/03/2023
View Court Documents

DocketRETURN OF SERVICE; Comment: EXECUTED CITATION BY POSTING - JIMMY D. CRISP

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/18/2023
View Court Documents

DocketORIGINAL ANSWER - GENERAL DENIAL

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/22/2023
View Court Documents

DocketAFFIDAVIT; Comment: COST OF ABSTRACT-TEXS

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/12/2023

DocketCITATION BY POSTING; Served: 07/31/2023; Anticipated Server: CONSTABLE 1; Anticipated Method: Comment; 1 - CIT BY POSTING

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
2 More Docket Entries
06/12/2023
View Court Documents

DocketNOTICE OF TRIAL; Comment: KIM (AAL)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/09/2023
View Court Documents

DocketNON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT; Comment: PROPOSED ORDER TO APPOINT ATTY AD LITEM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/09/2023
View Court Documents

DocketAFFIDAVIT; Comment: CBP - JIMMY D CRISP

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/09/2023
View Court Documents

DocketMOTION - ATTORNEY AD LITEM; Comment: TO APPOINT ATTORNEY AD LITEM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/06/2023
View Court Documents

DocketNOTICE OF TRIAL; Comment: LINEBARGER

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/02/2023

DocketCITATION; Served: 08/04/2023; Anticipated Server: PRIVATE PROCESS SERVER; Anticipated Method: Served; 09/25/2023: Anticipated Server; ATTORNEY: Anticipated Method; Comment: 1 M/A; 1 TJRC

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/02/2023
View Court Documents

DocketISSUE CITATION

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/01/2023
View Court Documents

DocketREQUEST FOR SERVICE; Comment: CITATION ISSUANCE - 1

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/26/2023
View Court Documents

DocketORIGINAL PETITION; Comment: - REAL PROPERTY

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/26/2023

DocketNEW CASE FILED (OCA) - CIVIL

[+] Read More [-] Read Less