This case was last updated from Dallas County District Courts on 12/03/2023 at 01:11:54 (UTC).

DALLAS COUNTY et al vs. BYRD FAMILY TRUST et al

Case Summary

On 09/14/2023 DALLAS COUNTY filed a Tax - Other Tax lawsuit against BYRD FAMILY TRUST. This case was filed in Dallas County District Courts, Dallas County Civil District Courts located in Dallas, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is GINSBERG, CARL. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1570

  • Filing Date:

    09/14/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Tax - Other Tax

  • County, State:

    Dallas, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

GINSBERG, CARL

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

DALLAS COUNTY

DALLAS INDEPENDENT SCHOOL DISTRICT

CITY OF DALLAS

PARKLAND HOSPITAL DISTRICT

DALLAS COLLEGE

DALLAS COUNTY SCHOOL EQUALIZATION FUND

Defendants

THE UNKNOWN TRUSTEES, SUCCESSORS, AND ASSIGNS OF BYRD FAMILY TRUST

BYRD, LAWRENCE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ATKINS, ASHLY STEELE

Defendant Attorney

SABERRE, JOANNE THERESA

 

Court Documents

ORIGINAL PETITION

ORIGINAL PETITION; Comment: - REAL PROPERTY

Non Jury Trial

NOTICE OF TRIAL; Comment: LINEBARGER

REQUEST FOR SERVICE

REQUEST FOR SERVICE; Comment: 1 CITATION

LAWRENCE BYRD

ISSUE CITATION

MOTION TO APPOINT ATTORNEY AD LITEM

MOTION - ATTORNEY AD LITEM

PROPOSED ORDER TO APPOINT ATTORNEY AD LITEM

NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT; Comment: PROPOSED ORDER TO APPOINT ATTORNEY AD LITEM

CBP - THE UNKNOWN TRUSTEES, SUCCESSORS, AND ASSIGNS OF BYRD FAMILY TRUST

AFFIDAVIT; Comment: CBP - THE UNKNOWN TRUSTEES, SUCCESSORS, AND ASSIGNS OF BYRD FAMILY TRUST

Non Jury Trial

NOTICE OF TRIAL; Comment: SABERRE (AAL)

ORDER - APPOINTING AN ATTORNEY AD LITEM

ORDER - APPOINTING AN ATTORNEY AD LITEM

E-SERVICE ORDERS COVER LETTER

MISCELLANOUS EVENT; Comment: ESERVICE ORDER - APPT ATTY AD-LITEM

TX-23-01570 ESERVICE ORDER - APPT ATTY AD-LITEM

MISCELLANOUS EVENT; Comment: ESERVICE ORDER - APPT ATTY AD-LITEM

ISSUE CITATION BY POSTING - BYRD FAMILY TRUST

ISSUE CITATION

FOR COST OF ABSTRACT

AFFIDAVIT; Comment: FOR COST OF ABSTRACT

EXECUTED CITATION BY POSTING - BYRD FAMILY TRUST

RETURN OF SERVICE; Comment: EXECUTED CITATION BY POSTING - BYRD FAMILY TRUST

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

06/18/2024
View Court Documents

DocketNon Jury Trial; Judicial Officer: GINSBERG, CARL; Hearing Time: 10:05 AM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/16/2023
View Court Documents

DocketRETURN OF SERVICE; Comment: EXECUTED CITATION BY POSTING - BYRD FAMILY TRUST

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/26/2023
View Court Documents

DocketAFFIDAVIT; Comment: FOR COST OF ABSTRACT

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/25/2023

DocketCITATION BY POSTING; Served: 11/13/2023; Anticipated Server: CONSTABLE 1; Anticipated Method: Comment; 1 - CIT BY POSTING

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/25/2023
View Court Documents

DocketISSUE CITATION

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/22/2023
View Court Documents

DocketMISCELLANOUS EVENT; Comment: ESERVICE ORDER - APPT ATTY AD-LITEM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/20/2023
View Court Documents

DocketORDER - APPOINTING AN ATTORNEY AD LITEM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/20/2023
View Court Documents

DocketNOTICE OF TRIAL; Comment: SABERRE (AAL)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/18/2023

DocketCITATION; Unserved: Anticipated Server; PRIVATE PROCESS SERVER: Anticipated Method; Comment: 1 TRC

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/18/2023
View Court Documents

DocketAFFIDAVIT; Comment: CBP - THE UNKNOWN TRUSTEES, SUCCESSORS, AND ASSIGNS OF BYRD FAMILY TRUST

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/18/2023
View Court Documents

DocketNON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT; Comment: PROPOSED ORDER TO APPOINT ATTORNEY AD LITEM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/18/2023
View Court Documents

DocketMOTION - ATTORNEY AD LITEM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/18/2023
View Court Documents

DocketISSUE CITATION

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/15/2023
View Court Documents

DocketREQUEST FOR SERVICE; Comment: 1 CITATION

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/15/2023
View Court Documents

DocketNOTICE OF TRIAL; Comment: LINEBARGER

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/14/2023
View Court Documents

DocketORIGINAL PETITION; Comment: - REAL PROPERTY

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/14/2023

DocketNEW CASE FILED (OCA) - CIVIL

[+] Read More [-] Read Less