This case was last updated from Dallas County District Courts on 11/21/2023 at 10:00:26 (UTC).

DALLAS COUNTY et al vs. RICHARD EDWARD BENNERS et al

Case Summary

On 09/14/2023 DALLAS COUNTY filed a Tax - Other Tax lawsuit against RICHARD EDWARD BENNERS. This case was filed in Dallas County District Courts, Dallas County Civil District Courts located in Dallas, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is GINSBERG, CARL. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1574

  • Filing Date:

    09/14/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Tax - Other Tax

  • County, State:

    Dallas, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

GINSBERG, CARL

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

DALLAS COUNTY

DALLAS INDEPENDENT SCHOOL DISTRICT

CITY OF DALLAS

PARKLAND HOSPITAL DISTRICT

DALLAS COLLEGE

DALLAS COUNTY SCHOOL EQUALIZATION FUND

Defendants

BENNERS, RICHARD EDWARD

DENNIS EDWARD BENNERS A/K/A DENNIS BENNERS, SR.

BENNERS, RICHARD CHARLES

LORI ELIZABETH BENNERS A/K/A LORI HERNANDEZ A/K/A LORI BEDOLLA

BENNERS, DENNIS EDWARD, Jr

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ATKINS, ASHLY STEELE

Defendant Attorney

GRADNEY, ASHLEI DIOR

 

Court Documents

Non Jury Trial

NOTICE OF TRIAL; Comment: LINEBARGER

Non Jury Trial

NOTICE OF TRIAL; Comment: LINEBARGER

ORIGINAL PETITION

ORIGINAL PETITION; Comment: - REAL PROPERTY

UNEXECUTED CITATION - DENNIS EDWARD BENNERS, JR.

RETURN OF SERVICE; Comment: UNEXECUTED CITATION - DENNIS EDWARD BENNERS, JR.

TX-23-01574 ESERVICE ORDER - APPOINTING ATTORNEY AD-LITEM

MISCELLANOUS EVENT; Comment: ESERVICE COVER LETTER - ORDER APPOINTING ATTORNEY AD-LITEM

E-SERVICE ORDERS COVER LETTER.

MISCELLANOUS EVENT; Comment: ESERVICE COVER LETTER - ORDER APPOINTING ATTORNEY AD-LITEM

Non Jury Trial

Non Jury Trial; Judicial Officer: GINSBERG, CARL; Hearing Time: 10:05 AM

ORDER - APPOINTING AN ATTORNEY AD LITEM

ORDER - APPOINTING AN ATTORNEY AD LITEM

NOTICE OF TRIAL

NOTICE OF TRIAL; Comment: GRADNEY (AAL)

CBP- DENNIS EDWARDS BENNERS A/K/A DENNIS BENNERS, SR.

AFFIDAVIT; Comment: CBP- DENNIS EDWARDS BENNERS A/K/A DENNIS BENNERS, SR.

CBP- RICHARD EDWARD BENNERS

AFFIDAVIT; Comment: CBP- RICHARD EDWARD BENNERS

PROPOSED ORDER APPOINTING ATTORNEY AD LITEM

NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT; Comment: PROPOSED ORDER APPOINTING ATTORNEY AD LITEM

MOTION TO APPOINT ATTORNEY AD LITEM

MOTION - ATTORNEY AD LITEM

AFFIDAVIT COST OF ABSTRACT

AFFIDAVIT; Comment: FOR COST OF ABSTRACT-TEXS

DENNIS EDWARD BENNERS JR -CITATON

ISSUE CITATION

LORI ELIZABETH BENNERS - CITATION

ISSUE CITATION

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

06/18/2024
View Court Documents

DocketNon Jury Trial; Judicial Officer: GINSBERG, CARL; Hearing Time: 10:05 AM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/25/2023
View Court Documents

DocketRETURN OF SERVICE; Comment: UNEXECUTED CITATION - DENNIS EDWARD BENNERS, JR.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/17/2023

DocketCITATION BY POSTING; Unserved: Anticipated Server; CONSTABLE 1: Anticipated Method; Unserved: Anticipated Server; CONSTABLE 1: Anticipated Method; Comment: 2 - CIT BY POSTING

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/17/2023

DocketISSUE CITATION

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/17/2023
View Court Documents

DocketMISCELLANOUS EVENT; Comment: ESERVICE COVER LETTER - ORDER APPOINTING ATTORNEY AD-LITEM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/11/2023
View Court Documents

DocketORDER - APPOINTING AN ATTORNEY AD LITEM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/11/2023
View Court Documents

DocketNOTICE OF TRIAL; Comment: GRADNEY (AAL)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/04/2023
View Court Documents

DocketAFFIDAVIT; Comment: CBP- DENNIS EDWARDS BENNERS A/K/A DENNIS BENNERS, SR.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/04/2023
View Court Documents

DocketAFFIDAVIT; Comment: CBP- RICHARD EDWARD BENNERS

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/04/2023
View Court Documents

DocketNON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT; Comment: PROPOSED ORDER APPOINTING ATTORNEY AD LITEM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/04/2023
View Court Documents

DocketMOTION - ATTORNEY AD LITEM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/29/2023
View Court Documents

DocketAFFIDAVIT; Comment: FOR COST OF ABSTRACT-TEXS

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/27/2023

DocketCITATION; Unserved: Anticipated Server; ATTORNEY: Anticipated Method; Unserved: Anticipated Server; ATTORNEY: Anticipated Method; Unserved: Anticipated Server; ATTORNEY: Anticipated Method; Return Unserved: 10/25/2023; Anticipated Server: ATTORNEY; Anticipated Method: Comment; 3 M/AS

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/27/2023
View Court Documents

DocketISSUE CITATION

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/26/2023
View Court Documents

DocketREQUEST FOR SERVICE; Comment: ISSUE CITATIONS -3

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/15/2023
View Court Documents

DocketNOTICE OF TRIAL; Comment: LINEBARGER

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/14/2023
View Court Documents

DocketORIGINAL PETITION; Comment: - REAL PROPERTY

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/14/2023

DocketNEW CASE FILED (OCA) - CIVIL

[+] Read More [-] Read Less