This case was last updated from Dallas County District Courts on 09/03/2023 at 06:06:47 (UTC).

DALLAS COUNTY et al vs. JOSEFITA HERNANDEZ et al

Case Summary

On 06/01/2023 DALLAS COUNTY filed a Tax - Other Tax lawsuit against JOSEFITA HERNANDEZ. This case was filed in Dallas County District Courts, Dallas County Civil District Courts located in Dallas, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is GINSBERG, CARL. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1069

  • Filing Date:

    06/01/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Tax - Other Tax

  • County, State:

    Dallas, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

GINSBERG, CARL

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

DALLAS COUNTY

DALLAS INDEPENDENT SCHOOL DISTRICT

CITY OF DALLAS

PARKLAND HOSPITAL DISTRICT

DALLAS COUNTY COMMUNITY COLLEGE DISTRICT N/K/A DALLAS COLLEGE

DALLAS COUNTY SCHOOL EQUALIZATION FUND

Defendants

HERNANDEZ, JOSEFITA

BENAVIDEZ SANDOVAL, MARGARITA

ADOLPH SANDOVAL A/K/A ADOLFO SANDOVAL

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ATKINS, ASHLY STEELE

Defendant Attorney

MCBETH, HIRAM

 

Court Documents

ORIGINAL PETITION

ORIGINAL PETITION; Comment: - REAL PROPERTY

Non Jury Trial

NOTICE OF TRIAL; Comment: LINEBARGER

MOT - APPT AAL

MOTION - ATTORNEY AD LITEM; Comment: TO APPOINT ATTORNEY AD LITEM

CBP - JOSEFIA HERNANDEZ

AFFIDAVIT; Comment: CBP - JOSEFITA HERNANDEZ

CBP - ADOLPH SANDOVAL

AFFIDAVIT; Comment: CBP - ADOLPH SANDOVAL

CBP - MARGARITA BENAVIDEZ SANDOVAL

AFFIDAVIT; Comment: CBP - MARGARITA BENAVIDEZ SANDOVAL

PROPOSED ORDER APPT AAL

NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT; Comment: PROPOSED ORDER TO APPOINT ATTY AD LITEM

Non Jury Trial

NOTICE OF TRIAL; Comment: MCBETH (AAL)

ISSUE CITATION BY POSTING - 3 DEF

ISSUE CITATION

ORDER - APPOINTING AN ATTORNEY AD LITEM

ORDER - APPOINTING AN ATTORNEY AD LITEM

FOR COST OF ABSTRACT

AFFIDAVIT; Comment: FOR COST OF ABSTRACT

EXECUTED CITATION BY POSTING - 3 DEF

RETURN OF SERVICE; Comment: EXECUTED CITATION BY POSTING - 3 DEF

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/28/2024
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNon Jury Trial; Judicial Officer: GINSBERG, CARL; Hearing Time: 10:05 AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/26/2023
  • FinancialFinancial info for HERNANDEZ, JOSEFITA : Transaction Assessment; ; $240.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/26/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE; Comment: EXECUTED CITATION BY POSTING - 3 DEF

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/22/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT; Comment: FOR COST OF ABSTRACT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/12/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - APPOINTING AN ATTORNEY AD LITEM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/12/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF TRIAL; Comment: MCBETH (AAL)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/09/2023
  • FinancialFinancial info for HERNANDEZ, JOSEFITA : Transaction Assessment; ; $24.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/09/2023
  • DocketCITATION BY POSTING; Served: 07/24/2023; Anticipated Server: CONSTABLE 1; Anticipated Method: Served; 07/24/2023: Anticipated Server; CONSTABLE 1: Anticipated Method; Served: 07/24/2023; Anticipated Server: CONSTABLE 1; Anticipated Method: Comment; 3 - CIT BY POSTING

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/09/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketISSUE CITATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/08/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT; Comment: PROPOSED ORDER TO APPOINT ATTY AD LITEM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/08/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT; Comment: CBP - MARGARITA BENAVIDEZ SANDOVAL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/08/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT; Comment: CBP - ADOLPH SANDOVAL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/08/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT; Comment: CBP - JOSEFITA HERNANDEZ

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/08/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION - ATTORNEY AD LITEM; Comment: TO APPOINT ATTORNEY AD LITEM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/06/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF TRIAL; Comment: LINEBARGER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/01/2023
  • FinancialFinancial info for HERNANDEZ, JOSEFITA : Transaction Assessment; ; $350.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/01/2023
  • FinancialFinancial: HERNANDEZ, JOSEFITA ; Total Financial Assessment $614.00 ; Total Payments and Credits $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/01/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORIGINAL PETITION; Comment: - REAL PROPERTY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/01/2023
  • DocketNEW CASE FILED (OCA) - CIVIL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less