This case was last updated from Dallas County District Courts on 11/22/2022 at 00:31:40 (UTC).

CARROLLTON-FARMERS BRANCH INDEPENDENT SCHOOL DISTRICT vs. RIVER ROAD DEVELOPMENT, LLC, A DEFUNCT COMPANY et al

Case Summary

On 09/06/2022 CARROLLTON-FARMERS BRANCH INDEPENDENT SCHOOL DISTRICT filed a Tax - Other Tax lawsuit against RIVER ROAD DEVELOPMENT, LLC, A DEFUNCT COMPANY. This case was filed in Dallas County District Courts, Dallas County Civil District Courts located in Dallas, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is GINSBERG, CARL. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1329

  • Filing Date:

    09/06/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Tax - Other Tax

  • County, State:

    Dallas, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

GINSBERG, CARL

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CARROLLTON-FARMERS BRANCH INDEPENDENT SCHOOL DISTRICT

Defendants

RIVER ROAD DEVELOPMENT, LLC, A DEFUNCT COMPANY

CEASONS HOLDINGS, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

REECE, LINDA D.

 

Court Documents

ORIGINAL PETITION

ORIGINAL PETITION; Comment: - REAL PROPERTY

Non Jury Trial

NOTICE OF TRIAL; Comment: PERDUE

COVER LETTER

REQUEST FOR SERVICE; Comment: CITATIONS 2

CIT - CEASONS HOLDINGS

ISSUE CITATION

CIT - RIVER ROAD

ISSUE CITATION

EXEC - RIVER RD DEVELOPMENT

RETURN OF SERVICE; Comment: EXECUTED CITATION - RIVER ROAD DEVELOPMENT LLC

EXEC - CEASONS HOLDINGS, LLC - CITATION

RETURN OF SERVICE; Comment: EXECUTED CITATION - CEASONS HOLDINGS LLC

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/13/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNon Jury Trial; Judicial Officer: GINSBERG, CARL; Hearing Time: 10:05 AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE; Comment: EXECUTED CITATION - RIVER ROAD DEVELOPMENT LLC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE; Comment: EXECUTED CITATION - CEASONS HOLDINGS LLC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/08/2022
  • FinancialFinancial info for RIVER ROAD DEVELOPMENT, LLC, A DEFUNCT COMPANY : Transaction Assessment; ; $16.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/08/2022
  • DocketCITATION; Served: 09/27/2022; Anticipated Server: ATTORNEY; Anticipated Method: Served; 09/14/2022: Anticipated Server; ATTORNEY: Anticipated Method; Comment: 2-M/A

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketISSUE CITATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/07/2022
  • FinancialFinancial info for RIVER ROAD DEVELOPMENT, LLC, A DEFUNCT COMPANY : Transaction Assessment; ; $350.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/07/2022
  • FinancialFinancial: RIVER ROAD DEVELOPMENT, LLC, A DEFUNCT COMPANY ; Total Financial Assessment $366.00 ; Total Payments and Credits $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR SERVICE; Comment: CITATIONS 2

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF TRIAL; Comment: PERDUE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORIGINAL PETITION; Comment: - REAL PROPERTY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/06/2022
  • DocketNEW CASE FILED (OCA) - CIVIL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CEASONS HOLDINGS, LLC (IN REM ONLY) is a litigant

Latest cases where RIVER ROAD DEVELOPMENT, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where CARROLLTON-FARMERS BRANCH INDEPENDENT SCHOOL DISTRICT is a litigant