This case was last updated from Dallas County District Courts on 11/27/2022 at 02:21:19 (UTC).

CARROLLTON-FARMERS BRANCH INDEPENDENT SCHOOL DISTRICT vs. LVA MANAGEMENT TX, LLC et al

Case Summary

On 09/01/2022 CARROLLTON-FARMERS BRANCH INDEPENDENT SCHOOL DISTRICT filed a Tax - Other Tax lawsuit against LVA MANAGEMENT TX, LLC. This case was filed in Dallas County District Courts, Dallas County Civil District Courts located in Dallas, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is GINSBERG, CARL. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1339

  • Filing Date:

    09/01/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Tax - Other Tax

  • County, State:

    Dallas, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

GINSBERG, CARL

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CARROLLTON-FARMERS BRANCH INDEPENDENT SCHOOL DISTRICT

Defendants

LVA MANAGEMENT TX, LLC

CARLA RINCON (IN REM ONLY)

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

REECE, LINDA D.

 

Court Documents

ORIGINAL PETITION

ORIGINAL PETITION; Comment: - REAL PROPERTY

Non Jury Trial

NOTICE OF TRIAL; Comment: PERDUE

COVER LETTER

REQUEST FOR SERVICE; Comment: CITATIONS 2

CIT - LVA MANAGEMENT TX LLC

ISSUE CITATION

CIT - CARLA RINCON

ISSUE CITATION

MOT - DISMISS

MOTION - DISMISS

PROPOSED O/DX

NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT; Comment: PROPOSED ORDER TO DISMISS (FINAL)

NON-SUIT/DISMISSAL BY PLAINTIFF / PETITIONER

Disposition: Judgment; Judicial Officer; GINSBERG, CARL; Judgment Type; NON-SUIT/DISMISSAL BY PLAINTIFF / PETITIONER; Judgment; Total Judgment:; of $0.00; Awarded To:; CARROLLTON-FARMERS BRANCH INDEPENDENT SCHOOL DISTRICT; Awarded Against:; LVA MANAGEMENT TX, LLC

EXEC - LVA MANAGEMENT TX, LLC - CITATION

RETURN OF SERVICE; Comment: EXECUTED CITATION - LVA MANAGEMENT TX LLC

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/14/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNon Jury Trial; Judicial Officer: GINSBERG, CARL; Hearing Time: 10:05 AM; Cancel Reason: CASE CLOSED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/17/2022
  • FinancialFinancial info for LVA MANAGEMENT TX, LLC : CHARGE / BALANCE REDUCTION; ; $8.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/07/2022
  • FinancialFinancial info for LVA MANAGEMENT TX, LLC : PAYMENT (CASE FEES); Receipt # 64024-2022-DCLK; LVA MANAGEMENT TX, LLC $438.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DispositionDisposition: Judgment; Judicial Officer: GINSBERG, CARL; Judgment Type: NON-SUIT/DISMISSAL BY PLAINTIFF / PETITIONER; Judgment: Total Judgment:; of $0.00: Awarded To:; CARROLLTON-FARMERS BRANCH INDEPENDENT SCHOOL DISTRICT: Awarded Against:; LVA MANAGEMENT TX, LLC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT; Comment: PROPOSED ORDER TO DISMISS (FINAL)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION - DISMISS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/29/2022
  • FinancialFinancial info for LVA MANAGEMENT TX, LLC : Transaction Assessment; ; $80.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE; Comment: EXECUTED CITATION - LVA MANAGEMENT TX LLC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/12/2022
  • FinancialFinancial info for LVA MANAGEMENT TX, LLC : Transaction Assessment; ; $16.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/12/2022
  • DocketCITATION; Served: 09/26/2022; Anticipated Server: CONSTABLE 1; Anticipated Method: Unserved; Anticipated Server: CONSTABLE 5; Anticipated Method: Comment; 2- CIT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketISSUE CITATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR SERVICE; Comment: CITATIONS 2

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/08/2022
  • FinancialFinancial info for LVA MANAGEMENT TX, LLC : Transaction Assessment; ; $350.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/08/2022
  • FinancialFinancial: LVA MANAGEMENT TX, LLC ; Total Financial Assessment $438.00 ; Total Payments and Credits $438.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF TRIAL; Comment: PERDUE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORIGINAL PETITION; Comment: - REAL PROPERTY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/01/2022
  • DocketNEW CASE FILED (OCA) - CIVIL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CARROLLTON-FARMERS BRANCH INDEPENDENT SCHOOL DISTRICT is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer REECE, LINDA D.