This case was last updated from Dallas County District Courts on 11/28/2022 at 04:14:24 (UTC).

CARROLLTON-FARMERS BRANCH INDEPENDENT SCHOOL DISTRICT vs. KAMIS HOLDINGS, LLC, A DEFUNCT COMPANY et al

Case Summary

On 08/24/2022 CARROLLTON-FARMERS BRANCH INDEPENDENT SCHOOL DISTRICT filed a Tax - Other Tax lawsuit against KAMIS HOLDINGS, LLC, A DEFUNCT COMPANY. This case was filed in Dallas County District Courts, Dallas County Civil District Courts located in Dallas, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is GINSBERG, CARL. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1232

  • Filing Date:

    08/24/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Tax - Other Tax

  • County, State:

    Dallas, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

GINSBERG, CARL

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CARROLLTON-FARMERS BRANCH INDEPENDENT SCHOOL DISTRICT

Defendants

KAMIS HOLDINGS, LLC, A DEFUNCT COMPANY

JPMORGAN CHASE BANK, NA (IN REM ONLY)

THE LAS COLINAS ASSOCIATION (IN REM ONLY)

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

REECE, LINDA D.

 

Court Documents

ORIGINAL PETITION

ORIGINAL PETITION; Comment: - REAL PROPERTY

Non Jury Trial

NOTICE OF TRIAL; Comment: PERDUE

KAMIS HOLDINGS LLC CITATION

REQUEST FOR SERVICE; Comment: ISSUE CITATION 3

THE LAS COLINAS ASSOCIATION -CITATION

REQUEST FOR SERVICE; Comment: ISSUE CITATION 3

JPMORGAN CHASE CITATION

REQUEST FOR SERVICE; Comment: ISSUE CITATION 3

REQUEST FOR SERVICE

REQUEST FOR SERVICE; Comment: ISSUE CITATION 3

EXEC - THE LAS COLINAS ASSOCIATION (IN REM ONLY) - CITATION

RETURN OF SERVICE; Comment: EXECUTED CITATION - THE LAS COLINAS ASSOC.

EXEC - JPMORGAN CHASE BANK, NA (IN REM ONLY) - CITATION

RETURN OF SERVICE; Comment: EXECUTED CITATION - JPMORGAN CHASE BANK

UNEX - KAMIS HOLDINGS, LLC, A DEFUNCT COMPANY - CITATION

RETURN OF SERVICE; Comment: UNEXECUTED CITATION - KAMIS HOLDINGS LLC

REQUEST FOR SERVICE

REQUEST FOR SERVICE; Comment: KAMIS HOLDINGS LLC - M/A

KAMIS HOLDINGS LLC CITATON

ISSUE CITATION

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/30/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNon Jury Trial; Judicial Officer: GINSBERG, CARL; Hearing Time: 10:05 AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/15/2022
  • FinancialFinancial info for CARROLLTON-FARMERS BRANCH INDEPENDENT SCHOOL DISTRICT : Transaction Assessment; ; $8.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/15/2022
  • FinancialFinancial: CARROLLTON-FARMERS BRANCH INDEPENDENT SCHOOL DISTRICT ; Total Financial Assessment $8.00 ; Total Payments and Credits $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/15/2022
  • DocketCITATION; Unserved: Anticipated Server; ATTORNEY: Anticipated Method; Comment: 1 M/A

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketISSUE CITATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR SERVICE; Comment: KAMIS HOLDINGS LLC - M/A

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/19/2022
  • FinancialFinancial info for KAMIS HOLDINGS, LLC, A DEFUNCT COMPANY : Transaction Assessment; ; $80.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE; Comment: UNEXECUTED CITATION - KAMIS HOLDINGS LLC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/14/2022
  • FinancialFinancial info for KAMIS HOLDINGS, LLC, A DEFUNCT COMPANY : Transaction Assessment; ; $80.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE; Comment: EXECUTED CITATION - JPMORGAN CHASE BANK

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 09/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE; Comment: EXECUTED CITATION - THE LAS COLINAS ASSOC.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/29/2022
  • FinancialFinancial info for KAMIS HOLDINGS, LLC, A DEFUNCT COMPANY : Transaction Assessment; ; $24.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/29/2022
  • DocketCITATION; Served: 09/08/2022; Anticipated Server: CONSTABLE 1; Anticipated Method: Served; 09/07/2022: Anticipated Server; CONSTABLE 4: Anticipated Method; Return Unserved: 09/19/2022; Anticipated Server: CONSTABLE 4; Anticipated Method: Comment; DC CONSTABLE PCT 1 2 DC CONSTABLE PCT 4

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketISSUE CITATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/25/2022
  • FinancialFinancial info for KAMIS HOLDINGS, LLC, A DEFUNCT COMPANY : Transaction Assessment; ; $350.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/25/2022
  • FinancialFinancial: KAMIS HOLDINGS, LLC, A DEFUNCT COMPANY ; Total Financial Assessment $614.00 ; Total Payments and Credits $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR SERVICE; Comment: ISSUE CITATION 3

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF TRIAL; Comment: PERDUE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORIGINAL PETITION; Comment: - REAL PROPERTY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/24/2022
  • DocketNEW CASE FILED (OCA) - CIVIL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where THE LAS COLINAS ASSOCIATION is a litigant

Latest cases where CARROLLTON-FARMERS BRANCH INDEPENDENT SCHOOL DISTRICT is a litigant

Latest cases where JPMorgan Chase Bank NA is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer REECE, LINDA D.