This case was last updated from Dallas County District Courts on 09/18/2022 at 21:08:22 (UTC).

CARROLLTON-FARMERS BRANCH INDEPENDENT SCHOOL DISTRICT vs. ALL PURPOSE LANDSCAPE & MANAGEMENT, LLC.

Case Summary

On 07/12/2022 CARROLLTON-FARMERS BRANCH INDEPENDENT SCHOOL DISTRICT filed a Tax - Other Tax lawsuit against ALL PURPOSE LANDSCAPE MANAGEMENT, LLC. This case was filed in Dallas County District Courts, Dallas County Civil District Courts located in Dallas, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is GINSBERG, CARL. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1118

  • Filing Date:

    07/12/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Tax - Other Tax

  • County, State:

    Dallas, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

GINSBERG, CARL

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CARROLLTON-FARMERS BRANCH INDEPENDENT SCHOOL DISTRICT

Defendant

ALL PURPOSE LANDSCAPE & MANAGEMENT, LLC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

REECE, LINDA D.

 

Court Documents

APPLICATION FOR TAX WARRANT

ORIGINAL PETITION; Comment: APPLICATION FOR TAX WARRANT

PROPOSED ORDER - APPLICATION FOR TAX WARRANT

NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT; Comment: PROPOSED ORDER - APPLICATION FOR TAX WARRANT

PROPOSED TAX WARRANT AND RETURN

NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT; Comment: PROPOSED TAX WARRANT AND RETURN

ORDER - MISC. -TAX WARRANT

ORDER - MISC.; Comment: TAX WARRANT

ORDER - TAX WARRANT

ORDER - TAX WARRANT

PROPOSED TAX WARRANT

NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT; Comment: PROPOSED TAX WARRANT

NON-SUIT/DISMISSAL BY PLAINTIFF / PETITIONER

Disposition: Judgment; Judicial Officer; GINSBERG, CARL; Judgment Type; NON-SUIT/DISMISSAL BY PLAINTIFF / PETITIONER; Judgment; Total Judgment:; of $0.00; Awarded To:; CARROLLTON-FARMERS BRANCH INDEPENDENT SCHOOL DISTRICT; Awarded Against:; ALL PURPOSE LANDSCAPE & MANAGEMENT, LLC.

RETURN OF SERVICE

RETURN OF SERVICE; Comment: UNEXECUTED TAX WARRANT

MOTION NON-SUIT

MOTION - NONSUIT

NONSIGNED ORDER - (NON-SUIT)

NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT; Comment: ORDER NONSUIT(FINAL)

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DispositionDisposition: Judgment; Judicial Officer: GINSBERG, CARL; Judgment Type: NON-SUIT/DISMISSAL BY PLAINTIFF / PETITIONER; Judgment: Total Judgment:; of $0.00: Awarded To:; CARROLLTON-FARMERS BRANCH INDEPENDENT SCHOOL DISTRICT: Awarded Against:; ALL PURPOSE LANDSCAPE & MANAGEMENT, LLC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT; Comment: ORDER NONSUIT(FINAL)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION - NONSUIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2022
  • FinancialFinancial info for ALL PURPOSE LANDSCAPE & MANAGEMENT, LLC. : Transaction Assessment; ; $150.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE; Comment: UNEXECUTED TAX WARRANT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT; Comment: PROPOSED TAX WARRANT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2022
  • FinancialFinancial info for ALL PURPOSE LANDSCAPE & MANAGEMENT, LLC. : Transaction Assessment; ; $350.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2022
  • FinancialFinancial: ALL PURPOSE LANDSCAPE & MANAGEMENT, LLC. ; Total Financial Assessment $500.00 ; Total Payments and Credits $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - TAX WARRANT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - MISC.; Comment: TAX WARRANT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT; Comment: PROPOSED TAX WARRANT AND RETURN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT; Comment: PROPOSED ORDER - APPLICATION FOR TAX WARRANT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORIGINAL PETITION; Comment: APPLICATION FOR TAX WARRANT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2022
  • DocketNEW CASE FILED (OCA) - CIVIL

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CARROLLTON-FARMERS BRANCH INDEPENDENT SCHOOL DISTRICT is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer REECE, LINDA D.