This case was last updated from Dallas County District Courts on 02/04/2023 at 03:16:29 (UTC).

CARROLLTON-FARMERS BRANCH INDEPENDENT SCHOOL DISTRICT vs. 1925 BELT LINE ROAD HOLDING LLC et al

Case Summary

On 08/17/2022 CARROLLTON-FARMERS BRANCH INDEPENDENT SCHOOL DISTRICT filed a Tax - Other Tax lawsuit against 1925 BELT LINE ROAD HOLDING LLC. This case was filed in Dallas County District Courts, Dallas County Civil District Courts located in Dallas, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is GINSBERG, CARL. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1205

  • Filing Date:

    08/17/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Tax - Other Tax

  • County, State:

    Dallas, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

GINSBERG, CARL

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CARROLLTON-FARMERS BRANCH INDEPENDENT SCHOOL DISTRICT

Defendants

1925 BELT LINE ROAD HOLDING LLC

1925 BELT LINE ROAD LLC

GRAND PACIFIC FINANCING CORPORATION

THE ED RACHAL FOUNDATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

REECE, LINDA D.

Defendant Attorneys

MARAIST, KEVIN M

AVOTS, PETER E

 

Court Documents

ORIGINAL PETITION - REAL

ORIGINAL PETITION; Comment: REAL

Non Jury Trial

NOTICE OF TRIAL; Comment: PERDUE

COVER LETTER

REQUEST FOR SERVICE; Comment: CITATIONS 4

CIT - 1925 BELT LINE

ISSUE CITATION

THE ED RACHAL FOUNDATION

ISSUE CITATION

CIT - 1925 BELT LINE HOLDING

ISSUE CITATION

CIT - GRAND PACIFIC

ISSUE CITATION

1925 BELT LINE RD HOLDING

RETURN OF SERVICE; Comment: EXECUTED - 1925 BELT LINE ROAD HOLDING

EXECUTED CITATION - THE ED RACHAL FOUNDATION

RETURN OF SERVICE; Comment: CITATION - EXECUTED - THE ED RACHAL

ANSWER/AVOTS

ORIGINAL ANSWER - GENERAL DENIAL

Non Jury Trial

NOTICE OF TRIAL; Comment: PETER AVOTS

EXEX - 1925 BELTLINE RD LLC

RETURN OF SERVICE; Comment: EXECUTED CITATION - 1925 BELTLINE RD LLC

ANSWER/MARAIST

ORIGINAL ANSWER - GENERAL DENIAL

Non Jury Trial

NOTICE OF TRIAL; Comment: KEVIN MARAIST

NON-SUIT/DISMISSAL BY PLAINTIFF / PETITIONER

Disposition: Judgment; Judicial Officer; GINSBERG, CARL; Judgment Type; NON-SUIT/DISMISSAL BY PLAINTIFF / PETITIONER; Judgment; Total Judgment:; of $0.00; Awarded To:; CARROLLTON-FARMERS BRANCH INDEPENDENT SCHOOL DISTRICT; Awarded Against:; 1925 BELT LINE ROAD HOLDING LLC

MOTION DISMISSAL

MOTION - DISMISS

NONSIGNED ORDER -DISMISSAL(FINAL)

NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT; Comment: ORDER DISMISSAL(FINAL)

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

01/25/2023
View Court Documents

DocketNon Jury Trial; Judicial Officer: GINSBERG, CARL; Hearing Time: 10:05 AM; Cancel Reason: CASE CLOSED

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/28/2022
View Court Documents

DispositionDisposition: Judgment; Judicial Officer: GINSBERG, CARL; Judgment Type: NON-SUIT/DISMISSAL BY PLAINTIFF / PETITIONER; Judgment: Total Judgment:; of $0.00: Awarded To:; CARROLLTON-FARMERS BRANCH INDEPENDENT SCHOOL DISTRICT: Awarded Against:; 1925 BELT LINE ROAD HOLDING LLC

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/21/2022

FinancialFinancial info for 1925 BELT LINE ROAD HOLDING LLC : PAYMENT (CASE FEES); Receipt # 73642-2022-DCLK; JULIO ANLEU $762.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/15/2022
View Court Documents

DocketNON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT; Comment: ORDER DISMISSAL(FINAL)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/15/2022
View Court Documents

DocketMOTION - DISMISS

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/20/2022
View Court Documents

DocketNOTICE OF TRIAL; Comment: KEVIN MARAIST

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/19/2022
View Court Documents

DocketORIGINAL ANSWER - GENERAL DENIAL

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/09/2022
View Court Documents

DocketRETURN OF SERVICE; Comment: EXECUTED CITATION - 1925 BELTLINE RD LLC

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/09/2022
View Court Documents

DocketNOTICE OF TRIAL; Comment: PETER AVOTS

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/08/2022
View Court Documents

DocketORIGINAL ANSWER - GENERAL DENIAL

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
1 More Docket Entries
09/01/2022
View Court Documents

DocketRETURN OF SERVICE; Comment: EXECUTED - 1925 BELT LINE ROAD HOLDING

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/19/2022

FinancialFinancial info for 1925 BELT LINE ROAD HOLDING LLC : Transaction Assessment; ; $32.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/19/2022

DocketCITATION; Served: 08/25/2022; Anticipated Server: ATTORNEY; Anticipated Method: Served; 08/25/2022: Anticipated Server; ATTORNEY: Anticipated Method; Unserved: Anticipated Server; CERTIFIED MAIL: Anticipated Method; Served: 08/25/2022; Anticipated Server: ATTORNEY; Anticipated Method: Comment; 4-CIT

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/19/2022
View Court Documents

DocketISSUE CITATION

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/18/2022
View Court Documents

DocketREQUEST FOR SERVICE; Comment: CITATIONS 4

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/18/2022
View Court Documents

DocketNOTICE OF TRIAL; Comment: PERDUE

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/17/2022

FinancialFinancial info for 1925 BELT LINE ROAD HOLDING LLC : Transaction Assessment; ; $350.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/17/2022

FinancialFinancial: 1925 BELT LINE ROAD HOLDING LLC ; Total Financial Assessment $382.00 ; Total Payments and Credits $762.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/17/2022
View Court Documents

DocketORIGINAL PETITION; Comment: REAL

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/17/2022

DocketNEW CASE FILED (OCA) - CIVIL

[+] Read More [-] Read Less