This case was last updated from Dallas County Texas Courts on 05/17/2022 at 00:57:56 (UTC).

CAPITAL ONE AUTO FINANCE vs. ALEXIA P. WILIAMS

Case Summary

On 12/21/2021 CAPITAL ONE AUTO FINANCE filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against ALEXIA P WILIAMS. This case was filed in Dallas County Texas Courts, Dallas County Texas Courts At Law located in Dallas, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is MONTGOMERY, SALLY. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********10-C

  • Filing Date:

    12/21/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Dallas, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

MONTGOMERY, SALLY

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CAPITAL ONE AUTO FINANCE

Defendant

WILIAMS, ALEXIA P.

Dallas, TX 75240

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DANNER, R. DWAYNE

 

Court Documents

APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF SEQUESTRATION

APPLICATION - WRIT OF SEQUESTRATION; Comment: APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF SEQUESTRATION

PLAINTIFF S ORIGINAL PETITION

ORIGINAL PETITION; Comment: PLAINTIFF S ORIGINAL PETITION

ORDER FOR ISSUANCE OF WRIT OF SEQUESTRATION

APPLICATION - WRIT OF SEQUESTRATION; Comment: APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF SEQUESTRATION

NOTICE OF REMOVAL TO FEDERAL COURT

NOTICE OF REMOVAL TO FEDERAL COURT; Comment: C/O R. DWAYNE DANNER MCGLINCHEY STAFFORD PLLC

NOTICE OF REMOVAL TO FEDERAL COURT

NOTICE OF REMOVAL TO FEDERAL COURT; Comment: C/O ALEXIA P. WILLIAMS

ORDER - REMOVAL (FEDERAL COURT)

ORDER - REMOVAL (FEDERAL COURT)

PROPOSED ORDER ON PLAINTIFF S NOTICE OF NONSUIT WITHOUT PREJUDICE

PROPOSED ORDER; Comment: PROPOSED ORDER ON PLAINTIFF S NOTICE OF NONSUIT WITHOUT PREJUDICE

PLAINTIFF S NOTICE OF NONSUIT WITHOUT PREJUDICE

NOTICE - NONSUIT; Comment: PLAINTIFF S NOTICE OF NONSUIT WITHOUT PREJUDICE

SUGGESTION OF BANKRUPTCY

SUGGESTION OF BANKRUPTCY

RETURN OF SERVICE - ALEXIA P. WILIAMS

RETURN OF SERVICE; Comment: RETURN OF SERVICE - ALEXIA P. WILIAMS

RETURN OF SERVICE

RETURN OF SERVICE; Comment: ALEXIA P WILIAMS

SEQUESTRATION BOND

SEQUESTRATION BOND

CCL#3 DWOP 165a

DISMISSAL HEARING; Judicial Officer: MONTGOMERY, SALLY; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM

CCL#3 DWOP 165a

DISMISSAL HEARING; Judicial Officer: MONTGOMERY, SALLY; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM

CCL#3 DWOP 165a

DISMISSAL HEARING; Judicial Officer: MONTGOMERY, SALLY; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM

CCL#3 DWOP 165a

DISMISSAL HEARING; Judicial Officer: MONTGOMERY, SALLY; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM

LETTER REQUESTING ISSUANCE

CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE; Comment: LETTER REQUESTING ISSUANCE

SEQUESTRATION BOND

SEQUESTRATION BOND; Comment: SEQUESTRATION BOND $9100.00

17 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDISMISSAL HEARING; Judicial Officer: MONTGOMERY, SALLY; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Cancel Reason: CASE CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF REMOVAL TO FEDERAL COURT; Comment: C/O R. DWAYNE DANNER MCGLINCHEY STAFFORD PLLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF REMOVAL TO FEDERAL COURT; Comment: C/O ALEXIA P. WILLIAMS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROPOSED ORDER; Comment: PROPOSED ORDER ON PLAINTIFF S NOTICE OF NONSUIT WITHOUT PREJUDICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE - NONSUIT; Comment: PLAINTIFF S NOTICE OF NONSUIT WITHOUT PREJUDICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - REMOVAL (FEDERAL COURT)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUGGESTION OF BANKRUPTCY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE; Comment: RETURN OF SERVICE - ALEXIA P. WILIAMS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE; Comment: ALEXIA P WILIAMS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2022
  • FinancialFinancial info for CAPITAL ONE AUTO FINANCE : CREDIT CARD - TEXFILE (CC); Receipt # CV-2022-02865; CAPITAL ONE AUTO FINANCE $25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
9 More Docket Entries
  • 03/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketISSUE CITATION; Comment: PCT 3 PICK UP

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE; Comment: LETTER REQUESTING ISSUANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - WRIT OF SEQUESTRATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2022
  • DocketMOTION - HEARING; Original Type: MOTION - HEARING; Judicial Officer: MONTGOMERY, SALLY; Hearing Time: 10:45 AM; Result: HEARING HELD; Comment: APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF SEQUESTRATION FILED 12/21/22 LINDA 214-445-2433 *VIA COURT CALL*

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2021
  • FinancialFinancial info for CAPITAL ONE AUTO FINANCE : CREDIT CARD - TEXFILE (CC); Receipt # CV-2021-13563; CAPITAL ONE AUTO FINANCE $277.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2021
  • FinancialFinancial info for CAPITAL ONE AUTO FINANCE : Transaction Assessment; ; $277.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2021
  • FinancialFinancial: CAPITAL ONE AUTO FINANCE ; Total Financial Assessment $548.00 ; Total Payments and Credits $548.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPLICATION - WRIT OF SEQUESTRATION; Comment: APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF SEQUESTRATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORIGINAL PETITION; Comment: PLAINTIFF'S ORIGINAL PETITION -ISSUANCE OF CITATION NOT REQUESTED AT THIS TIME -MB

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2021
  • DocketNEW CASE FILED (OCA)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CAPITAL ONE AUTO FINANCE is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer DANNER RICHARD DWAYNE