This case was last updated from Dallas County District Courts on 02/06/2023 at 08:13:28 (UTC).

BRIAN WARBURTON vs. CLASSIC PROPERTY MANAGEMENT, et al

Case Summary

On 09/14/2021 BRIAN WARBURTON filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against CLASSIC PROPERTY MANAGEMENT,. This case was filed in Dallas County District Courts, Dallas County Civil District Courts located in Dallas, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is REDMOND, AIESHA. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3647

  • Filing Date:

    09/14/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • County, State:

    Dallas, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

REDMOND, AIESHA

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

WARBURTON, BRIAN

Dallas, TX 75201

Defendants

CLASSIC PROPERTY MANAGEMENT

2415 Avenue J, Suite 100

Arlington, TX 76006

GLEN OAKS ASSOCIATION, INC.

2415 Avenue J, Suite 100

Arlington, TX 76006

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KHIRALLAH, RACHEL E

Defendant Attorney

MILLER, DAVID LESTER

 

Court Documents

160th Scheduling Conference Notice

Scheduling Conference; Judicial Officer: REDMOND, AIESHA; Hearing Time: 3:00 PM

160th Scheduling Conference Notice

Scheduling Conference; Judicial Officer: REDMOND, AIESHA; Hearing Time: 3:00 PM

CORRESPONDENCE LETTER-CERTIFICATE

CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE; Comment: CERTIFICATE

DEFENDANT-CERTIFICATE OF WRITTEN DISCOVERY

CERTIFICATE OF WRITTEN DISCOVERY; Comment: DEFENDANT

160th Dismissal

DISMISSAL FOR WANT OF PROSECUTION; Judicial Officer: REDMOND, AIESHA; Hearing Time: 3:00 PM; Comment: CASE FILED 9-14-21; DEFS UNSERVED

COVER LETTER

CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE; Comment: COVER LETTER

JURY DEMAND

JURY DEMAND

ORIGINAL ANSWER

- GENERAL DENIAL; ORIGINAL ANSWER

EXECUTED CITATION - GLEN OAKS ASSOCIATION, INC.

RETURN OF SERVICE; Comment: EXECUTED CITATION - GLEN OAKS ASSOCIATION, INC.

COVER SHEET

NOTE - CLERKS; Comment: MAILED COVER SHEETS AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL TO PLAINTIFF/DEFENDANTS' ATTORNEYS

COVER SHEET

NOTE - CLERKS; Comment: MAILED COVER SHEETS AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL TO PLAINTIFF/DEFENDANTS' ATTORNEYS

NON SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER-ORDER OF DISMISSAL

NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT; Comment: AGREED ORDER OF DISMISSAL

JOINT MOTION TO DISMISS

MOTION - DISMISS; Comment: JOINT

NON-SUIT/DISMISSAL BY PLAINTIFF / PETITIONER

Disposition: Judgment; Judicial Officer; REDMOND, AIESHA; Judgment Type; NON-SUIT/DISMISSAL BY PLAINTIFF / PETITIONER; Judgment; Total Judgment:; of $0.00; Awarded To:; WARBURTON, BRIAN; Awarded Against:; CLASSIC PROPERTY MANAGEMENT, et al

NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT

NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT

CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION

CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION; Comment: LINDA SERGEANT

CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION

CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION; Comment: SHANEA GRISBY

CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION

CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION; Comment: SHARON REYNOLDS

119 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJury Trial - Civil; Judicial Officer: REDMOND, AIESHA; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: CASE CLOSED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DispositionDisposition: Judgment; Judicial Officer: REDMOND, AIESHA; Judgment Type: NON-SUIT/DISMISSAL BY PLAINTIFF / PETITIONER; Judgment: Total Judgment:; of $0.00: Awarded To:; WARBURTON, BRIAN: Awarded Against:; CLASSIC PROPERTY MANAGEMENT, et al

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTE - CLERKS; Comment: MAILED COVER SHEETS AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL TO PLAINTIFF/DEFENDANTS' ATTORNEYS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/12/2022
  • DocketREACTIVATE CASE (OCA)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT; Comment: AGREED ORDER OF DISMISSAL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION - DISMISS; Comment: JOINT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/06/2022
  • DocketINACTIVATE CASE (OCA)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SETTLEMENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION; Comment: LINDA SERGEANT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION; Comment: SHANEA GRISBY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
72 More Docket Entries
  • 09/17/2021
  • FinancialFinancial info for WARBURTON, BRIAN : CREDIT CARD - TEXFILE (DC); Receipt # 62577-2021-DCLK; WARBURTON, BRIAN $4.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • FinancialFinancial info for WARBURTON, BRIAN : Transaction Assessment; ; $4.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/16/2021
  • FinancialFinancial info for WARBURTON, BRIAN : CREDIT CARD - TEXFILE (DC); Receipt # 61888-2021-DCLK; WARBURTON, BRIAN $308.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/16/2021
  • FinancialFinancial info for WARBURTON, BRIAN : Transaction Assessment; ; $308.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/16/2021
  • FinancialFinancial: WARBURTON, BRIAN ; Total Financial Assessment $312.00 ; Total Payments and Credits $312.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketISSUE CITATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketISSUE CITATION COMM OF INS OR SOS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORIGINAL PETITION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/14/2021
  • DocketNEW CASE FILED (OCA) - CIVIL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less