This case was last updated from Dallas County District Courts on 08/08/2022 at 02:39:18 (UTC).

BRENDA UVALLE PASILLAS , et al vs. MARIA TAPIA , et al

Case Summary

On 05/02/2022 BRENDA UVALLE PASILLAS filed an Other lawsuit against MARIA TAPIA . This case was filed in Dallas County District Courts, Dallas County Civil District Courts located in Dallas, Texas. The Judges overseeing this case are MCFARLIN, SHERYL, SLAUGHTER, GENA and SLAUGHTER, GENA. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4520

  • Filing Date:

    05/02/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Dallas, Texas

Judge Details

Judges

MCFARLIN, SHERYL, SLAUGHTER, GENA

SLAUGHTER, GENA

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

UVALLE PASILLAS , BRENDA

TAPIA , CATALINA

Defendants

TAPIA , MARIA

Dallas, TX 75243

WELLS FARGO NA

101 N Phillips Ave, Sioux

Falls, SD 57104

WELLS FARGO HOME MORTGAGE

7001 Westown Parkway, West Des

Moines, IA 59266

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KRICKEN, WADE

Defendant Attorney

MOWREY, ROBERT T

 

Court Documents

PROPOSED TRO

NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT; Comment: PROPOSED TRO

PARTIAL SETTLEMENT

MISCELLANOUS EVENT; Comment: PARTIAL SETTLEMENT

ORDER - TEMPORARY INJUNCTION

ORDER - TEMPORARY INJUNCTION

NOTICE OF HEARING

/ FIAT; NOTICE OF HEARING: Comment; ON MTN FOR ENTRY OF ORDER

PROPOSED TEMP INJ ORDER - PLAINTIFF'S

NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT; Comment: PROPOSED TEMP INJ ORDER

MTN FOR ENTRY OF ORDER

MOTION - ENTER ORDER

191st NON-JURY TRIAL LETTER

Non Jury Trial; Judicial Officer: SLAUGHTER, GENA; Hearing Time: 9:30 AM

191st NON-JURY TRIAL LETTER

Non Jury Trial; Judicial Officer: SLAUGHTER, GENA; Hearing Time: 9:30 AM

191st NON-JURY TRIAL LETTER

Non Jury Trial; Judicial Officer: SLAUGHTER, GENA; Hearing Time: 9:30 AM

191st NON-JURY TRIAL LETTER

Non Jury Trial; Judicial Officer: SLAUGHTER, GENA; Hearing Time: 9:30 AM

ORDER - MEDIATION

ORDER - MEDIATION

ORIGINAL ANSWER - GENERAL DENIAL

ORIGINAL ANSWER - GENERAL DENIAL

ISSUE EXTENDED TRO - MARIA TAPIA

ISSUE TRO

ISSUE NOTICE - MARIA TAPIA

ISSUE NOTICE

ISSUE CITATION - MARIA TAPIA

ISSUE CITATION; Comment: PLAINTIFF'S SECOND AMENDED PETITION

REQUEST FOR SERVICE

REQUEST FOR SERVICE

ORDER - MEDIATION

ORDER - MEDIATION

ORDER - EXTEND TRO

ORDER - EXTEND TRO

17 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/30/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNon Jury Trial; Judicial Officer: SLAUGHTER, GENA; Hearing Time: 9:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMISCELLANOUS EVENT; Comment: PARTIAL SETTLEMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - TEMPORARY INJUNCTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION HEARING; Judicial Officer: SLAUGHTER, GENA; Hearing Time: 10:15 AM; Comment: 15 MINS - P/M/ENTRY OF ORDER - WADE 214 418 1187 - IN PERSON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket/ FIAT; NOTICE OF HEARING: Comment; ON MTN FOR ENTRY OF ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT; Comment: PROPOSED TEMP INJ ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION - ENTER ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - MEDIATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2022
  • DocketTemporary Injunction; Judicial Officer: SLAUGHTER, GENA; Hearing Time: 11:00 AM; Comment: PER ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORIGINAL ANSWER - GENERAL DENIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
26 More Docket Entries
  • 05/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT; Comment: PROPOSED TRO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAMENDED PETITION; Comment: FIRST / AND REQ FOR TRO & APPL/TEMP INJ

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketTRO HEARING; Judicial Officer(s): MCFARLIN, SHERYL, SLAUGHTER, GENA; Hearing Time: 11:30 AM; Cancel Reason: REQUESTED BY ATTORNEY/PRO SE; Comment: JUDGE MERRITT - IN PERSON HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2022
  • FinancialFinancial info for UVALLE PASILLAS , BRENDA : STATE CREDIT; ; $137.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2022
  • FinancialFinancial info for UVALLE PASILLAS , BRENDA : CREDIT CARD - TEXFILE (DC); Receipt # 26093-2022-DCLK; UVALLE PASILLAS , BRENDA $213.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2022
  • FinancialFinancial info for UVALLE PASILLAS , BRENDA : Transaction Assessment; ; $350.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2022
  • FinancialFinancial: UVALLE PASILLAS , BRENDA ; Total Financial Assessment $395.00 ; Total Payments and Credits $395.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT; Comment: PROPOSED TRO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORIGINAL PETITION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2022
  • DocketNEW CASE FILED (OCA) - CIVIL

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where WELLS FARGO HOME MORTGAGE is a litigant

Latest cases where WELLS FARGO NA REGISTERED AGENT OR OWNER CORPORATION SERVICE CO is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Robert T Mowrey