This case was last updated from Dallas County Texas Courts on 05/18/2023 at 18:09:23 (UTC).

BMH AS-BUILT USA, INC, LAMAR SCHOOL RESIDENCES, LLC vs. GRAHAM MORTGAGE CORPORATION,

Case Summary

On 01/27/2022 BMH AS-BUILT USA, INC, LAMAR SCHOOL RESIDENCES, LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against GRAHAM MORTGAGE CORPORATION,. This case was filed in Dallas County Texas Courts, Dallas County Texas Courts At Law located in Dallas, Texas. The Judges overseeing this case are TAYLOR, NICOLE, GREENBERG, MARK and RENTERIA, JUAN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********24-E

  • Filing Date:

    01/27/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Dallas, Texas

Judge Details

Judges

TAYLOR, NICOLE

GREENBERG, MARK

RENTERIA, JUAN

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

BMH AS-BUILT USA, INC

LAMAR SCHOOL RESIDENCES, LLC

Defendant

GRAHAM MORTGAGE CORPORATION,

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LINDAUER, JOYCE WILLIAMS

Defendant Attorney

BURGER, NEIL R

 

Court Documents

PLAINTIFFS ORIGINAL PETITION

ORIGINAL PETITION; Comment: PLAINTIFFS ORIGINAL PETITION- OWES $8 ISSUANCE FEE-GUISLA

CIVIL CASE INFORMATION SHEET

CIVIL CASE INFORMATION SHEET

LETTER REQUESTING ISSUANCE

CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE; Comment: LETTER REQUESTING ISSUANCE

PLAINTIFFS ORIGINAL PETITION

ORIGINAL PETITION; Comment: PLAINTIFFS ORIGINAL PETITION- OWES $8 ISSUANCE FEE-GUISLA

CIVIL CASE INFORMATION SHEET

CIVIL CASE INFORMATION SHEET

LETTER REQUESTING ISSUANCE

CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE; Comment: LETTER REQUESTING ISSUANCE

ISSUE CITATION

ISSUE CITATION; Comment: E-SERVE ENV# 61259952

ORIGINAL ANSWER

- GENERAL DENIAL; ORIGINAL ANSWER

1 CCL#5 Y LETTER

DISMISSAL HEARING; Judicial Officer: GREENBERG, MARK; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM

PLAINTIFF'S EXPERT WITNESS DESIGNATION

DESIGNATION - EXPERT WITNESS; Comment: PLAINTIFF'S EXPERT WITNESS DESIGNATION

3 CCL#5 NON-JURY TRIAL LETTER

NON JURY TRIAL; Judicial Officer: RENTERIA, JUAN; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM

3 CCL#5 NON-JURY TRIAL LETTER

NON JURY TRIAL; Judicial Officer: RENTERIA, JUAN; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM

3 CCL#5 NON-JURY TRIAL LETTER

NON JURY TRIAL; Judicial Officer: TAYLOR, NICOLE; Hearing Time: 10:30 AM

3 CCL#5 NON-JURY TRIAL LETTER

NON JURY TRIAL; Judicial Officer: TAYLOR, NICOLE; Hearing Time: 10:30 AM

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/12/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNON JURY TRIAL; Judicial Officer: TAYLOR, NICOLE; Hearing Time: 10:30 AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/11/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNON JURY TRIAL; Judicial Officer: RENTERIA, JUAN; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Cancel Reason: BY COURT ADMINISTRATOR

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDESIGNATION - EXPERT WITNESS; Comment: PLAINTIFF'S EXPERT WITNESS DESIGNATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDISMISSAL HEARING; Judicial Officer: GREENBERG, MARK; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Cancel Reason: BY COURT ADMINISTRATOR

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket- GENERAL DENIAL; ORIGINAL ANSWER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/28/2022
  • DocketCITATION (SERVICE); Unserved: Anticipated Server; ATTORNEY: Anticipated Method

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2022
  • FinancialFinancial info for BMH AS-BUILT USA, INC : CREDIT CARD - TEXFILE (CC); Receipt # CV-2022-00762; BMH AS-BUILT USA, INC $8.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2022
  • FinancialFinancial info for BMH AS-BUILT USA, INC : Transaction Assessment; ; $8.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2022
  • FinancialFinancial info for BMH AS-BUILT USA, INC : STATE CREDIT; ; $137.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2022
  • FinancialFinancial info for BMH AS-BUILT USA, INC : CREDIT CARD - TEXFILE (CC); Receipt # CV-2022-00745; BMH AS-BUILT USA, INC $213.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2022
  • FinancialFinancial info for BMH AS-BUILT USA, INC : Transaction Assessment; ; $350.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2022
  • FinancialFinancial: BMH AS-BUILT USA, INC ; Total Financial Assessment $358.00 ; Total Payments and Credits $358.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketISSUE CITATION; Comment: E-SERVE ENV# 61259952

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE; Comment: LETTER REQUESTING ISSUANCE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL CASE INFORMATION SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORIGINAL PETITION; Comment: PLAINTIFFS ORIGINAL PETITION- OWES $8 ISSUANCE FEE-GUISLA

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2022
  • DocketNEW CASE FILED (OCA)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less