This case was last updated from Dallas County District Courts on 06/22/2022 at 06:29:30 (UTC).

AT&T SERVICES, INC vs. THE BANK OF SAN ANTONIO

Case Summary

On 05/12/2022 AT T SERVICES, INC filed an Other - Other Judgment lawsuit against THE BANK OF SAN ANTONIO. This case was filed in Dallas County District Courts, Dallas County Civil District Courts located in Dallas, Texas. The Judges overseeing this case are WHITMORE, BRIDGETT and SLAUGHTER, GENA. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4963

  • Filing Date:

    05/12/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Judgment

  • County, State:

    Dallas, Texas

Judge Details

Judges

WHITMORE, BRIDGETT

SLAUGHTER, GENA

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

AT&T SERVICES, INC

Defendant

THE BANK OF SAN ANTONIO

1900 Nw Loop 410, San

Antonio, TX 78213

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

JONES, CHRISTIN J

Defendant Attorney

DEKAT, GUILLERMO S.

 

Court Documents

APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF GARNISHMENT

APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF GARNISHMENT

CIVIL CASE INFORMATION SHEET

CASE FILING COVER SHEET

193RD Initial Dismissal Notice

DISMISSAL FOR WANT OF PROSECUTION; Judicial Officer: WHITMORE, BRIDGETT; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM

ISSUE WRIT OF GARNISHMENT AFTER JUDGMENT - THE BANK OF SAN ANTONIO

ISSUE WRIT OF GARNISHMENT AND NOTICE

ISSUE NOTICE - GENESIS NETWORKS TELECOM SERVICES LLC

ISSUE WRIT OF GARNISHMENT AND NOTICE

ORIGINAL ANSWER - BANK OF SAN ANTONIO

ORIGINAL ANSWER - GENERAL DENIAL

EXECUTED WRIT OF GARNISHMENT - THE BANK OF SAN ANTONIO

RETURN OF SERVICE; Comment: EXECUTED WRIT OF GARNISHMENT - THE BANK OF SAN ANTONIO

193rd Non Jury Trial Notice

Non Jury Trial; Judicial Officer: WHITMORE, BRIDGETT; Hearing Time: 9:30 AM

193rd Non Jury Trial Notice

Non Jury Trial; Judicial Officer: WHITMORE, BRIDGETT; Hearing Time: 9:30 AM

SCHEDULING ORDER

SCHEDULING ORDER; Comment: (LEVEL 2)

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/21/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNon Jury Trial; Judicial Officer: WHITMORE, BRIDGETT; Hearing Time: 9:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDISMISSAL FOR WANT OF PROSECUTION; Judicial Officer: WHITMORE, BRIDGETT; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Cancel Reason: BY COURT ADMINISTRATOR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSCHEDULING ORDER; Comment: (LEVEL 2)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE; Comment: EXECUTED WRIT OF GARNISHMENT - THE BANK OF SAN ANTONIO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORIGINAL ANSWER - GENERAL DENIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2022
  • DocketNOTICE; Unserved: Anticipated Server; ESERVE: Anticipated Method; Comment: GENESIS NETWORKS TELECOM SERVICES LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2022
  • DocketWRIT OF GARNISHMENT AFTER JUDGMENT; Served: 06/01/2022; Anticipated Server: ESERVE; Anticipated Method: Actual Server; OUT OF COUNTY: Returned; 06/07/2022: Comment; THE BANK OF SAN ANTONIO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2022
  • FinancialFinancial info for AT&T SERVICES, INC : STATE CREDIT; ; $137.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2022
  • FinancialFinancial info for AT&T SERVICES, INC : CREDIT CARD - TEXFILE (DC); Receipt # 28901-2022-DCLK; AT&T SERVICES, INC $229.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2022
  • FinancialFinancial info for AT&T SERVICES, INC : Transaction Assessment; ; $366.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2022
  • FinancialFinancial: AT&T SERVICES, INC ; Total Financial Assessment $366.00 ; Total Payments and Credits $366.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCASE FILING COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketISSUE WRIT OF GARNISHMENT AND NOTICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPLICATION FOR WRIT OF GARNISHMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2022
  • DocketNEW CASE FILED (OCA) - CIVIL

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where AT&T Corp. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer DEKAT, GUILLERMO SEBASTIAN