This case was last updated from Dallas County District Courts on 06/26/2022 at 06:11:09 (UTC).

AT&T SERVICES, INC. vs. EAST WEST BANK

Case Summary

On 05/12/2022 AT T SERVICES, INC filed an Other - Other Judgment lawsuit against EAST WEST BANK. This case was filed in Dallas County District Courts, Dallas County Civil District Courts located in Dallas, Texas. The Judges overseeing this case are SLAUGHTER, GENA and WHITMORE, BRIDGETT. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4961

  • Filing Date:

    05/12/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Judgment

  • County, State:

    Dallas, Texas

Judge Details

Judges

SLAUGHTER, GENA

WHITMORE, BRIDGETT

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

AT&T SERVICES, INC.

Defendant

EAST WEST BANK

1999 Bryan Street Ste 900

Dallas, TX 75201

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

JONES, CHRISTIN J

 

Court Documents

APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF GARNISHMENT

APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF GARNISHMENT

CIVIL CASE INFORMATION SHEET

CASE FILING COVER SHEET

193RD Initial Dismissal Notice

DISMISSAL FOR WANT OF PROSECUTION; Judicial Officer: WHITMORE, BRIDGETT; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM

ISSUE WRIT OF GARNISHMENT AFTER JUDGMENT - EAST WEST BANK

ISSUE WRIT OF GARNISHMENT AND NOTICE

ISSUE NOTICE - GENESIS NETWORKS TELECOM SERVICES LLC

ISSUE WRIT OF GARNISHMENT AND NOTICE

EXECUTED WRIT OF GARNISHMENT AFTER JUDGMENT - EAST WEST BANK

RETURN OF SERVICE; Comment: EXECUTED WRIT OF GARNISHMENT AFTER JUDGMENT - EAST WEST BANK

NOTICE OF NONSUIT AS TO GARNISHEE EAST WEST BANK

NOTICE OF NONSUIT; Comment: AS TO GARNISHEE EAST WEST BANK

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDISMISSAL FOR WANT OF PROSECUTION; Judicial Officer: WHITMORE, BRIDGETT; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF NONSUIT; Comment: AS TO GARNISHEE EAST WEST BANK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE; Comment: EXECUTED WRIT OF GARNISHMENT AFTER JUDGMENT - EAST WEST BANK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2022
  • DocketNOTICE; Unserved: Anticipated Server; ESERVE: Anticipated Method; Comment: GENESIS NETWORKS TELECOM SERVICES LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2022
  • DocketWRIT OF GARNISHMENT AFTER JUDGMENT; Served: 06/01/2022; Anticipated Server: ESERVE; Anticipated Method: Actual Server; PRIVATE PROCESS SERVER: Returned; 06/02/2022: Comment; EAST WEST BANK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2022
  • FinancialFinancial info for AT&T SERVICES, INC. : STATE CREDIT; ; $137.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2022
  • FinancialFinancial info for AT&T SERVICES, INC. : CREDIT CARD - TEXFILE (DC); Receipt # 28893-2022-DCLK; AT&T SERVICES, INC. $229.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2022
  • FinancialFinancial info for AT&T SERVICES, INC. : Transaction Assessment; ; $366.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2022
  • FinancialFinancial: AT&T SERVICES, INC. ; Total Financial Assessment $366.00 ; Total Payments and Credits $366.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCASE FILING COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketISSUE WRIT OF GARNISHMENT AND NOTICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPLICATION FOR WRIT OF GARNISHMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2022
  • DocketNEW CASE FILED (OCA) - CIVIL

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where EAST WEST BANK is a litigant

Latest cases where AT&T Corp. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer JONES CHRISTIN JEFFREY