This case was last updated from Dallas County District Courts on 03/31/2022 at 04:23:38 (UTC).

ANNETTE MOOREHEAD vs. CAROLYN SIMON JONES, et al

Case Summary

On 08/11/2021 ANNETTE MOOREHEAD filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against CAROLYN SIMON JONES. This case was filed in Dallas County District Courts, Dallas County Civil District Courts located in Dallas, Texas. The Judges overseeing this case are SMITH, CRAIG and WILLIAMS, KRISTINA M. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0688

  • Filing Date:

    08/11/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Dallas, Texas

Judge Details

Judges

SMITH, CRAIG

WILLIAMS, KRISTINA M

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MOOREHEAD, ANNETTE

Defendants

JONES, CAROLYN SIMON

Desoto, TX 75115

GEICO INSURANCE AGENCY, LLC

1999 Bryan Street, Suite 900

Dallas, TX 75201

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

POLK, JAMES E

Defendant Attorney

SPEER, GARY R., Jr.

 

Court Documents

SCHEDULING ORDER

SCHEDULING ORDER; Comment: - UNIFORM / LEVEL 3

192nd Trial Reset Letter Tenesa

Jury Trial - Civil; Judicial Officer: SMITH, CRAIG; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM

192nd Cover Letter

Jury Trial - Civil; Judicial Officer: SMITH, CRAIG; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM

JURY DEMAND

JURY DEMAND

EXECUTED CITATION - GEICO INSURANCE AGENCY, LLC

RETURN OF SERVICE; Comment: EXECUTED CITATION - GEICO INSURANCE AGENCY, LLC

ISSUE CITATION - CAROLYN SIMON JONES

ISSUE CITATION

EXECUTED CITATION - CAROLYN SIMON JONES

RETURN OF SERVICE; Comment: EXECUTED CITATION - CAROLYN SIMON JONES

192nd Trial Reset Letter Tenesa

Jury Trial - Civil; Judicial Officer: SMITH, CRAIG; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM

192nd Trial Reset Letter Tenesa

Jury Trial - Civil; Judicial Officer: SMITH, CRAIG; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM

192nd Trial Reset Letter Tenesa

Jury Trial - Civil; Judicial Officer: SMITH, CRAIG; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM

192nd Trial Reset Letter Tenesa

Jury Trial - Civil; Judicial Officer: SMITH, CRAIG; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM

192nd Trial Reset Letter Tenesa

Jury Trial - Civil; Judicial Officer: SMITH, CRAIG; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM

192nd Cover Letter

Jury Trial - Civil; Judicial Officer: SMITH, CRAIG; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM

192nd Cover Letter

Jury Trial - Civil; Judicial Officer: SMITH, CRAIG; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM

192nd Cover Letter

Jury Trial - Civil; Judicial Officer: SMITH, CRAIG; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM

SCHEDULING ORDER

SCHEDULING ORDER; Comment: - UNIFORM / LEVEL 3

192 DWOPNO ACTION Notice

DISMISSAL FOR WANT OF PROSECUTION; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Cancel Reason: REQUESTED BY ATTORNEY/PRO SE

JURY DEMAND

JURY DEMAND

20 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/03/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJury Trial - Civil; Judicial Officer: SMITH, CRAIG; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSCHEDULING ORDER; Comment: - UNIFORM / LEVEL 3

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDISMISSAL FOR WANT OF PROSECUTION; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Cancel Reason: REQUESTED BY ATTORNEY/PRO SE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/11/2021
  • FinancialFinancial info for GEICO INSURANCE AGENCY, LLC : CREDIT CARD - TEXFILE (DC); Receipt # 75467-2021-DCLK; GEICO INSURANCE AGENCY, LLC $40.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/11/2021
  • FinancialFinancial info for GEICO INSURANCE AGENCY, LLC : Transaction Assessment; ; $40.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/11/2021
  • FinancialFinancial: GEICO INSURANCE AGENCY, LLC ; Total Financial Assessment $40.00 ; Total Payments and Credits $40.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJURY DEMAND

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket- GENERAL DENIAL; ORIGINAL ANSWER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE; Comment: EXECUTED CITATION - GEICO INSURANCE AGENCY, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2021
  • DocketCITATION; Unserved: Anticipated Server; ESERVE: Anticipated Method; Served: 10/20/2021; Anticipated Server: ESERVE; Anticipated Method: Actual Server; PRIVATE PROCESS SERVER: Returned; 11/01/2021: Comment; GEICO INSURANCE AGENCY, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 10/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketISSUE CITATION; Comment: PLAINTIFF'S AMENDED PETITION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAMENDED PETITION; Comment: PLAINTIFF'S AMENDED PETITION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE; Comment: EXECUTED CITATION - CAROLYN SIMON JONES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2021
  • DocketCITATION; Served: 09/03/2021; Anticipated Server: ESERVE; Anticipated Method: Actual Server; PRIVATE PROCESS SERVER: Returned; 09/23/2021: Comment; CAROLYN SIMON JONES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2021
  • FinancialFinancial info for MOOREHEAD, ANNETTE : CREDIT CARD - TEXFILE (DC); Receipt # 52597-2021-DCLK; MOOREHEAD, ANNETTE $300.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2021
  • FinancialFinancial info for MOOREHEAD, ANNETTE : Transaction Assessment; ; $300.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2021
  • FinancialFinancial: MOOREHEAD, ANNETTE ; Total Financial Assessment $308.00 ; Total Payments and Credits $308.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketISSUE CITATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORIGINAL PETITION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2021
  • DocketNEW CASE FILED (OCA) - CIVIL

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where GEICO Insurance Agency, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SPEER, GARY R., Jr.