This case was last updated from Dallas County Texas Courts on 09/24/2022 at 19:23:52 (UTC).

ANIDA NICOLE MARTIN vs.NABU AFRICAN HAIR BRAIDING, LLC

Case Summary

On 08/03/2022 ANIDA NICOLE MARTIN filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against NABU AFRICAN HAIR BRAIDING, LLC. This case was filed in Dallas County Texas Courts, Dallas County Texas Courts At Law located in Dallas, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is ROSALES, PAULA. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********21-D

  • Filing Date:

    08/03/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Dallas, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

ROSALES, PAULA

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MARTIN, ANIDA NICOLE

Defendant

NABU AFRICAN HAIR BRAIDING, LLC

2902 S. Buckner Blvd, Suite 240

Dallas, TX 75227

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SERCELY, MATTHEW D

 

Court Documents

PLAINTIFF'S ORIGINAL PETITION

ORIGINAL PETITION; Comment: PLAINTIFF'S ORIGINAL PETITION

CITATION 2012

ISSUE CITATION; Comment: E-SERVE, ENV#66981602

3 CCL#4 Y LETTER

DISMISSAL HEARING; Judicial Officer: ROSALES, PAULA; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM

MOTION - SUBSTITUTE SERVICE

MOTION - SUBSTITUTE SERVICE; Comment: WITH PROPOSED ORDER FOR SUBSTITUTE SERVICE

PROPOSED ORDER

PROPOSED ORDER; Comment: PROPOSED ORDER FOR SUBSTITUTE SERVICE

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDISMISSAL HEARING; Judicial Officer: ROSALES, PAULA; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROPOSED ORDER; Comment: PROPOSED ORDER FOR SUBSTITUTE SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION - SUBSTITUTE SERVICE; Comment: WITH PROPOSED ORDER FOR SUBSTITUTE SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2022
  • DocketCITATION (SERVICE); Unserved: Anticipated Server; ATTORNEY: Anticipated Method

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2022
  • FinancialFinancial info for MARTIN, ANIDA NICOLE : STATE CREDIT; ; $137.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2022
  • FinancialFinancial info for MARTIN, ANIDA NICOLE : CREDIT CARD - TEXFILE (CC); Receipt # CV-2022-07400; MARTIN, ANIDA NICOLE $221.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2022
  • FinancialFinancial info for MARTIN, ANIDA NICOLE : Transaction Assessment; ; $358.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2022
  • FinancialFinancial: MARTIN, ANIDA NICOLE ; Total Financial Assessment $358.00 ; Total Payments and Credits $358.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketISSUE CITATION; Comment: E-SERVE, ENV#66981602

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORIGINAL PETITION; Comment: PLAINTIFF'S ORIGINAL PETITION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2022
  • DocketNEW CASE FILED (OCA)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Matthew Sercely