This case was last updated from Dallas County District Courts on 08/11/2022 at 02:14:34 (UTC).

ANGELOS KOLOBOTOS vs. HAL O. COLLIER

Case Summary

On 06/01/2021 ANGELOS KOLOBOTOS filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against HAL O COLLIER. This case was filed in Dallas County District Courts, Dallas County Civil District Courts located in Dallas, Texas. The Judges overseeing this case are WILLIAMS, KRISTINA M., WADE, KRISTIN and WILLIAMS, KRISTINA M. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******6895

  • Filing Date:

    06/01/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • County, State:

    Dallas, Texas

Judge Details

Judges

WILLIAMS, KRISTINA M.

WADE, KRISTIN

WILLIAMS, KRISTINA M

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

KOLOBOTOS, ANGELOS

Dallas, TX 75219

Defendant

COLLIER, HAL O.

Camarillo, CA 93010

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

RAMIREZ, RAUL

ALTICK, MATTHEW J.

CLARK, STEVEN EUGENE

Defendant Attorney

HUBBARD, RODNEY L

 

Court Documents

192ND TRIAL RESET LETTER NON-JURY

Non Jury Trial; Judicial Officer: WILLIAMS, KRISTINA M; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Cancel Reason: CASE CLOSED

192ND TRIAL RESET LETTER NON-JURY

Non Jury Trial; Judicial Officer: WILLIAMS, KRISTINA M; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Cancel Reason: CASE CLOSED

192nd Cover Letter

Non Jury Trial; Judicial Officer: WILLIAMS, KRISTINA M; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Cancel Reason: CASE CLOSED

192nd Cover Letter

Non Jury Trial; Judicial Officer: WILLIAMS, KRISTINA M; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Cancel Reason: CASE CLOSED

PLEA TO JURISDICTION

PLEA TO JURISDICTION; Comment: PLAINTIFF

DEFENDANT NOTICE OF MOTION TO CONSOLIDATE IN DC-20-01856

MISCELLANOUS EVENT; Comment: NOTICE OF MOTION TO CONSOLIDATE IN DC-20-01856

ORDER - SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL

ORDER - SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL

PROPOSED ORDER - SUBTITUTE COUNSEL

NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT; Comment: - GRANTING SUBSTITUTE COUNSEL

PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO SUBSTITUTE COUNSEL

MOTION - SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL

PROPOSED ORDER - GRANTING WITHDRAWAL OF COUNSEL

NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT; Comment: - GRANTING WITHDRAWAL OF COUNSEL

TO PLAINTIFF REGARDING MOTION FOR WITHDRAWAL OF COUNSEL

CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE; Comment: - TO PLAINTIFF REGARDING MOTION FOR WITHDRAWAL OF COUNSEL

NOTICE OF HEARING RE: EXPUNDGE LIS PENDENS

NOTICE OF HEARING / FIAT; Comment: RE: DEFENDANT EXPUNDGE LIS PENDENS

CERTIFICAT CONFERENCE/MOTION EXPUNGE NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS

CERTIFICATE OF CONFERENCE; Comment: MOTION EXPUNGE NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS

DEFENDANT MOTION TO EXPUNGE LIS PENDENS

MOTION - MISCELLANOUS; Comment: - TO EXPUNDGE LIS PENDENS

DEFENDANT ORIGINAL ANSWER-HAL O. COLLIER

ORIGINAL ANSWER - GENERAL DENIAL

PROPOSED TRO

NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT; Comment: PROPOSED TRO

ORIGINAL PETITION AND APPLICATION FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER

ORIGINAL PETITION; Comment: AND APPLICATION FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER

ALL OTHER DISPOSITIONS

Disposition: Judgment; Judicial Officer; WILLIAMS, KRISTINA M; Judgment Type; ALL OTHER DISPOSITIONS; Judgment; Total Judgment:; of $0.00; Awarded To:; COLLIER, HAL O.; Awarded Against:; KOLOBOTOS, ANGELOS

39 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNon Jury Trial; Judicial Officer: WILLIAMS, KRISTINA M; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Cancel Reason: CASE CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPLEA TO JURISDICTION; Comment: PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DispositionDisposition: Judgment; Judicial Officer: WILLIAMS, KRISTINA M; Judgment Type: ALL OTHER DISPOSITIONS; Judgment: Total Judgment:; of $0.00: Awarded To:; COLLIER, HAL O.: Awarded Against:; KOLOBOTOS, ANGELOS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMISCELLANOUS EVENT; Comment: NOTICE OF MOTION TO CONSOLIDATE IN DC-20-01856

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT; Comment: - GRANTING SUBSTITUTE COUNSEL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION - SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT; Comment: - GRANTING WITHDRAWAL OF COUNSEL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE; Comment: - TO PLAINTIFF REGARDING MOTION FOR WITHDRAWAL OF COUNSEL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION - WITHDRAW ATTORNEY; Comment: **Hearing requested by the court**

    Read MoreRead Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 06/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF HEARING / FIAT; Comment: RE: DEFENDANT EXPUNDGE LIS PENDENS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF CONFERENCE; Comment: MOTION EXPUNGE NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION - MISCELLANOUS; Comment: - TO EXPUNDGE LIS PENDENS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORIGINAL ANSWER - GENERAL DENIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2021
  • FinancialFinancial info for KOLOBOTOS, ANGELOS : CREDIT CARD - TEXFILE (DC); Receipt # 34159-2021-DCLK; KOLOBOTOS, ANGELOS $292.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2021
  • FinancialFinancial info for KOLOBOTOS, ANGELOS : Transaction Assessment; ; $292.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2021
  • FinancialFinancial: KOLOBOTOS, ANGELOS ; Total Financial Assessment $292.00 ; Total Payments and Credits $292.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT; Comment: PROPOSED TRO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORIGINAL PETITION; Comment: AND APPLICATION FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2021
  • DocketNEW CASE FILED (OCA) - CIVIL

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer HUBBARD, RODNEY L